EP1280897 - REGULATION OF NF-AT INTERACTING PROTEIN NIP 45 VARIANT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.07.2007 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 14.10.2009 [2009/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bayer HealthCare AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [2006/38] |
Former [2004/01] | For all designated states Bayer HealthCare AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | ||
Former [2003/06] | For all designated states Bayer Aktiengesellschaft 51368 Leverkusen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ENCINAS, Jeffrey 3-17-15, Ayameike-kita Nara, Nara 631-0032 / JP | [2003/06] | Application number, filing date | 01927920.7 | 25.04.2001 | [2003/06] | WO2001EP04635 | Priority number, date | US20000199356P | 25.04.2000 Original published format: US 199356 P | [2003/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0181574 | Date: | 01.11.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/44] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1280897 | Date: | 05.02.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.11.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1280897 | Date: | 20.09.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.04.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/12, C12N15/62, C12N5/10, C07K14/47, C12Q1/68, G01N33/50, G01N33/68, A61K38/17, A61K31/7105, A61K31/713, A61P11/06 | [2003/06] | CPC: |
C07K14/4702 (EP);
A61P11/06 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P31/00 (EP);
A61P37/02 (EP);
A61P37/08 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/06] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | REGULATION EINER NF-AT INTERAGIERENDEN PROTEINVARIANTE NIP 45 | [2003/06] | English: | REGULATION OF NF-AT INTERACTING PROTEIN NIP 45 VARIANT | [2003/06] | French: | REGULATION DE VARIANTE DE PROTEINE NIP 45 A INTERACTION AVEC NF-AT | [2003/06] | Entry into regional phase | 25.11.2002 | National basic fee paid | 25.11.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.11.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.10.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 25.11.2002 | Examination requested [2003/06] | 19.01.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 16.09.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.01.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.04.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.06.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | 20.08.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.09.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 21.10.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.11.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 13.01.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.03.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.08.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 02.08.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.06.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 20.09.2006 | FI | 20.09.2006 | IT | 20.09.2006 | TR | 20.09.2006 | GR | 21.12.2006 | PT | 12.03.2007 | IE | 25.04.2007 | LU | 25.04.2007 | MC | 30.04.2007 | [2009/42] |
Former [2009/37] | CY | 20.09.2006 | |
FI | 20.09.2006 | ||
IT | 20.09.2006 | ||
GR | 21.12.2006 | ||
PT | 12.03.2007 | ||
IE | 25.04.2007 | ||
LU | 25.04.2007 | ||
MC | 30.04.2007 | ||
Former [2009/18] | FI | 20.09.2006 | |
IT | 20.09.2006 | ||
GR | 21.12.2006 | ||
PT | 12.03.2007 | ||
IE | 25.04.2007 | ||
MC | 30.04.2007 | ||
Former [2008/25] | FI | 20.09.2006 | |
IT | 20.09.2006 | ||
GR | 21.12.2006 | ||
PT | 12.03.2007 | ||
IE | 25.04.2007 | ||
Former [2008/19] | FI | 20.09.2006 | |
IT | 20.09.2006 | ||
GR | 21.12.2006 | ||
PT | 12.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/35] | FI | 20.09.2006 | |
IT | 20.09.2006 | ||
PT | 12.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/26] | FI | 20.09.2006 | |
PT | 12.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/10] | FI | 20.09.2006 | Cited in | International search | [DA]WO9739721 (HARVARD COLLEGE [US], et al) [DA] * the whole document *; | [DA]WO9921993 (ZENECA LTD [GB]) [DA] * the whole document *; | [DA] - HODGE M R ET AL, "NF-AT-DRIVEN INTERLEUKIN-4 TRANSCRIPTION POTENTIATED BY NIP45", SCIENCE, AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF SCIENCE,, US, (19961213), vol. 274, no. 5294, ISSN 0036-8075, page 1903, XP002045448 [DA] * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.274.5294.1903 |