EP1287558 - COMPONENT ASSEMBLY AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.10.2007 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 14.10.2009 [2009/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dr. Johannes Heidenhain GmbH Postfach 12 60 83292 Traunreut / DE | [2006/50] |
Former [2003/10] | For all designated states Dr. Johannes Heidenhain GmbH Postfach 12 60 83292 Traunreut / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RISSING, Lutz Am Seefeld 12 83358 Seebruck / DE | 02 /
OBERMAYER, Florian Falkenbruch 1 83329 Waging am See / DE | [2003/10] | Application number, filing date | 01927940.5 | 05.05.2001 | [2003/10] | WO2001EP05107 | Priority number, date | DE2000124336 | 17.05.2000 Original published format: DE 10024336 | [2003/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0188978 | Date: | 22.11.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1287558 | Date: | 05.03.2003 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.11.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1287558 | Date: | 13.12.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.11.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H01L23/24 | [2003/10] | CPC: |
H01L23/24 (EP,US);
H01L2224/05599 (EP,US);
H01L2224/45014 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48091 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48227 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48472 (EP,US);
H01L2224/85399 (EP,US);
H01L24/48 (EP,US);
H01L2924/00014 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
H01L2224/05599, H01L2924/00014 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48091, H01L2924/00014 (US,EP);
H01L2224/48472, H01L2224/48091, H01L2924/00 (US,EP);
H01L2224/48472, H01L2224/48227, H01L2924/00 (US,EP);
H01L2224/85399, H01L2924/00014 (EP,US);
H01L2924/00014, H01L2224/45014, H01L2924/206 (EP,US);
H01L2924/00014, H01L2224/45015, H01L2924/207 (EP,US);
H01L2924/00014, H01L2224/45099 (EP,US); | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/10] | Title | German: | BAUELEMENTANORDNUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER BAUELEMENTANORDNUNG | [2003/10] | English: | COMPONENT ASSEMBLY AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING THE SAME | [2003/10] | French: | ENSEMBLE DE COMPOSANTS ET SON PROCEDE DE FABRICATION | [2003/10] | Entry into regional phase | 17.12.2002 | National basic fee paid | 17.12.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.12.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.11.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 17.12.2002 | Examination requested [2003/10] | 25.08.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.09.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 28.09.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.09.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 13.12.2006 | DK | 13.12.2006 | FI | 13.12.2006 | FR | 13.12.2006 | GB | 13.12.2006 | IE | 13.12.2006 | IT | 13.12.2006 | NL | 13.12.2006 | TR | 13.12.2006 | SE | 13.03.2007 | GR | 14.03.2007 | ES | 24.03.2007 | AT | 05.05.2007 | LU | 05.05.2007 | PT | 14.05.2007 | BE | 31.05.2007 | CH | 31.05.2007 | LI | 31.05.2007 | MC | 31.05.2007 | [2009/42] |
Former [2009/37] | CY | 13.12.2006 | |
DK | 13.12.2006 | ||
FI | 13.12.2006 | ||
FR | 13.12.2006 | ||
GB | 13.12.2006 | ||
IE | 13.12.2006 | ||
IT | 13.12.2006 | ||
NL | 13.12.2006 | ||
SE | 13.03.2007 | ||
GR | 14.03.2007 | ||
ES | 24.03.2007 | ||
AT | 05.05.2007 | ||
LU | 05.05.2007 | ||
PT | 14.05.2007 | ||
BE | 31.05.2007 | ||
CH | 31.05.2007 | ||
LI | 31.05.2007 | ||
MC | 31.05.2007 | ||
Former [2008/52] | DK | 13.12.2006 | |
FI | 13.12.2006 | ||
FR | 13.12.2006 | ||
GB | 13.12.2006 | ||
IE | 13.12.2006 | ||
IT | 13.12.2006 | ||
NL | 13.12.2006 | ||
SE | 13.03.2007 | ||
GR | 14.03.2007 | ||
ES | 24.03.2007 | ||
AT | 05.05.2007 | ||
PT | 14.05.2007 | ||
BE | 31.05.2007 | ||
CH | 31.05.2007 | ||
LI | 31.05.2007 | ||
MC | 31.05.2007 | ||
Former [2008/39] | DK | 13.12.2006 | |
FI | 13.12.2006 | ||
GB | 13.12.2006 | ||
IE | 13.12.2006 | ||
IT | 13.12.2006 | ||
NL | 13.12.2006 | ||
SE | 13.03.2007 | ||
GR | 14.03.2007 | ||
ES | 24.03.2007 | ||
AT | 05.05.2007 | ||
PT | 14.05.2007 | ||
BE | 31.05.2007 | ||
CH | 31.05.2007 | ||
LI | 31.05.2007 | ||
MC | 31.05.2007 | ||
FR | 03.08.2007 | ||
Former [2008/23] | DK | 13.12.2006 | |
FI | 13.12.2006 | ||
GB | 13.12.2006 | ||
IE | 13.12.2006 | ||
IT | 13.12.2006 | ||
NL | 13.12.2006 | ||
SE | 13.03.2007 | ||
GR | 14.03.2007 | ||
ES | 24.03.2007 | ||
PT | 14.05.2007 | ||
BE | 31.05.2007 | ||
CH | 31.05.2007 | ||
LI | 31.05.2007 | ||
MC | 31.05.2007 | ||
FR | 03.08.2007 | ||
Former [2008/19] | DK | 13.12.2006 | |
FI | 13.12.2006 | ||
GB | 13.12.2006 | ||
IE | 13.12.2006 | ||
IT | 13.12.2006 | ||
NL | 13.12.2006 | ||
SE | 13.03.2007 | ||
GR | 14.03.2007 | ||
ES | 24.03.2007 | ||
PT | 14.05.2007 | ||
BE | 31.05.2007 | ||
CH | 31.05.2007 | ||
LI | 31.05.2007 | ||
MC | 31.05.2007 | ||
Former [2008/13] | DK | 13.12.2006 | |
FI | 13.12.2006 | ||
GB | 13.12.2006 | ||
IE | 13.12.2006 | ||
IT | 13.12.2006 | ||
NL | 13.12.2006 | ||
SE | 13.03.2007 | ||
ES | 24.03.2007 | ||
PT | 14.05.2007 | ||
CH | 31.05.2007 | ||
LI | 31.05.2007 | ||
MC | 31.05.2007 | ||
Former [2008/09] | DK | 13.12.2006 | |
FI | 13.12.2006 | ||
GB | 13.12.2006 | ||
IE | 13.12.2006 | ||
IT | 13.12.2006 | ||
NL | 13.12.2006 | ||
SE | 13.03.2007 | ||
ES | 24.03.2007 | ||
PT | 14.05.2007 | ||
MC | 31.05.2007 | ||
Former [2007/50] | DK | 13.12.2006 | |
FI | 13.12.2006 | ||
GB | 13.12.2006 | ||
IE | 13.12.2006 | ||
IT | 13.12.2006 | ||
NL | 13.12.2006 | ||
SE | 13.03.2007 | ||
ES | 24.03.2007 | ||
PT | 14.05.2007 | ||
Former [2007/46] | DK | 13.12.2006 | |
FI | 13.12.2006 | ||
IE | 13.12.2006 | ||
IT | 13.12.2006 | ||
NL | 13.12.2006 | ||
SE | 13.03.2007 | ||
ES | 24.03.2007 | ||
PT | 14.05.2007 | ||
Former [2007/42] | FI | 13.12.2006 | |
IE | 13.12.2006 | ||
IT | 13.12.2006 | ||
NL | 13.12.2006 | ||
SE | 13.03.2007 | ||
ES | 24.03.2007 | ||
PT | 14.05.2007 | ||
Former [2007/39] | FI | 13.12.2006 | |
IT | 13.12.2006 | ||
NL | 13.12.2006 | ||
SE | 13.03.2007 | ||
ES | 24.03.2007 | ||
PT | 14.05.2007 | ||
Former [2007/36] | FI | 13.12.2006 | |
IT | 13.12.2006 | ||
NL | 13.12.2006 | ||
SE | 13.03.2007 | ||
PT | 14.05.2007 | ||
Former [2007/28] | FI | 13.12.2006 | |
NL | 13.12.2006 | ||
SE | 13.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/25] | FI | 13.12.2006 | |
SE | 13.03.2007 | Cited in | International search | [X]JPS63137460 ; | [X]DE4408176 (SEL ALCATEL AG [DE]) [X] 1-12,15-21 * the whole document *; | [A]US5861680 (YAMANAKA HIDEO [JP]) [A] 7,9 * the whole document * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19881021), vol. 012, no. 397, Database accession no. (E - 672), & JP63137460 A 19880609 (IBIDEN CO LTD) [X] 1,2,12 * abstract * |