EP2140742 - TRANSPARENT SUBSTRATE PROVIDED WITH ELECTROCONDUCTIVE STRIPS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.04.2012 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.06.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): DK | published on 01.08.2012 [2012/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SAINT-GOBAIN GLASS FRANCE 18, avenue d'Alsace 92400 Courbevoie / FR | [2010/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAHN, Dieter Adolfstrasse 22 52331 Übach-Palenberg / DE | 02 /
SWITALLA, Josef Bendstrasse 5 52531 Übach-Palenberg / DE | 03 /
KUMMUTAT, Rainer Gartenstrasse 11 52134 Herzogenrath / DE | 04 /
BEYRLE, André 760, rue de Coucy F-60170 Tracy-le-Val / FR | 05 /
LEBAIL, Yannick 73, rue du Jeu de l'Arc F-60150 Chevincourt / FR | [2010/01] | Representative(s) | Muller, René SAINT-GOBAIN RECHERCHE 39, quai Lucien Lefranc 93303 Aubervilliers / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2010/01] | Muller, René SAINT-GOBAIN RECHERCHE 39, quai Lucien Lefranc 93303 Aubervilliers / FR | Application number, filing date | 01927980.1 | 17.04.2001 | [2010/01] | WO2001FR01175 | Priority number, date | DE2000118902 | 14.04.2000 Original published format: DE 10018902 | DE2000138768 | 09.08.2000 Original published format: DE 10038768 | DE2000156777 | 16.11.2000 Original published format: DE 10056777 | FR20000016199 | 13.12.2000 Original published format: FR 0016199 | [2010/01] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0180608 | Date: | 25.10.2001 | Language: | FR | [2001/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2140742 | Date: | 06.01.2010 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.10.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2140742 | Date: | 01.06.2011 | Language: | FR | [2011/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.10.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H05K1/09, H01B1/16 | [2010/01] | CPC: |
H05K1/092 (EP,US);
H01B1/22 (EP,KR,US);
H01B1/16 (EP,US);
H05B3/84 (EP,US);
H05B2203/002 (EP,US);
H05B2203/017 (EP,US);
H05K1/0306 (EP,US);
H05K2201/0108 (EP,US);
H05K3/1216 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49155 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2010/01] | Extension states | RO | 26.11.2002 | SI | 26.11.2002 | Title | German: | DURCHSICHTIGES SUBSTRAT MIT ELEKTRISCH LEITENDEN LEITERZÜGEN | [2010/01] | English: | TRANSPARENT SUBSTRATE PROVIDED WITH ELECTROCONDUCTIVE STRIPS | [2010/01] | French: | SUBSTRAT TRANSPARENT POURVU DE PISTES ELECTROCONDUCTRICES | [2010/01] | Entry into regional phase | 26.11.2002 | National basic fee paid | 26.11.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.01.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.09.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 20.12.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time | 20.01.2003 | Examination requested [2010/01] | 20.05.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.09.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.12.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.04.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 16.04.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.05.2010 | Opposition(s) | 02.03.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 06.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 03.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 16.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 20.01.2003 | AT   M06   Fee paid on   20.01.2003 | 20.01.2003 | BE   M06   Fee paid on   20.01.2003 | 20.01.2003 | CH   M06   Fee paid on   20.01.2003 | 20.01.2003 | CY   M06   Fee paid on   20.01.2003 | 20.01.2003 | DE   M06   Fee paid on   20.01.2003 | 20.01.2003 | DK   M06   Fee paid on   20.01.2003 | 20.01.2003 | ES   M06   Fee paid on   20.01.2003 | 20.01.2003 | FI   M06   Fee paid on   20.01.2003 | 20.01.2003 | FR   M06   Fee paid on   20.01.2003 | 20.01.2003 | GB   M06   Fee paid on   20.01.2003 | 20.01.2003 | GR   M06   Fee paid on   20.01.2003 | 20.01.2003 | IE   M06   Fee paid on   20.01.2003 | 20.01.2003 | IT   M06   Fee paid on   20.01.2003 | 20.01.2003 | LU   M06   Fee paid on   20.01.2003 | 20.01.2003 | MC   M06   Fee paid on   20.01.2003 | 20.01.2003 | NL   M06   Fee paid on   20.01.2003 | 20.01.2003 | PT   M06   Fee paid on   20.01.2003 | 20.01.2003 | SE   M06   Fee paid on   20.01.2003 | 20.01.2003 | TR   M06   Fee paid on   20.01.2003 | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 20.01.2003 | M06   Fee paid on   20.01.2003 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 01.06.2011 | CY | 01.06.2011 | DK | 01.06.2011 | FI | 01.06.2011 | IE | 01.06.2011 | NL | 01.06.2011 | GR | 02.09.2011 | [2012/31] |
Former [2012/08] | AT | 01.06.2011 | |
CY | 01.06.2011 | ||
FI | 01.06.2011 | ||
IE | 01.06.2011 | ||
NL | 01.06.2011 | ||
GR | 02.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/01] | AT | 01.06.2011 | |
CY | 01.06.2011 | ||
FI | 01.06.2011 | ||
NL | 01.06.2011 | ||
GR | 02.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | CY | 01.06.2011 | |
FI | 01.06.2011 | ||
GR | 02.09.2011 | Cited in | International search | [XA]US3830651 (MINNEMAN L, et al) [X] 1,2,15 * examples 1-10; claims 1-23 * [A] 3-14,16-20; | [A]EP0527352 (DU PONT [US]) [A] 1-20* the whole document * |