EP1284768 - SAFETY SYRINGE ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.02.2005 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.02.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.04.2005 [2005/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dugmore, Peter Balfour 2 Swanmore Road, Rondebosch 7700 Cape Town / ZA | For all designated states Bull, Anthony Eric 31 Grotto Road Rondebosch 7700 Cape Town / ZA | For all designated states Reynolds, Stanford William Gladwin 18 Hopson Road, Westville 3630 Kwazulu Natal / ZA | [N/P] |
Former [2003/09] | For all designated states Dugmore, Peter Balfour 2 Swanmore Road, Rondebosch 7700 Cape Town / ZA | ||
For all designated states Bull, Anthony Eric 31 Grotto Road Rondebosch, 7700 Cape Town / ZA | |||
For all designated states Reynolds, Stanford William Gladwin 18 Hopson Road, Westville 3630 Kwazulu Natal / ZA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2003/09] | Representative(s) | Piésold, Alexander James Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/09] | Piésold, Alexander J. Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | Application number, filing date | 01928142.7 | 10.05.2001 | [2003/09] | WO2001IB00800 | Priority number, date | ZA20000002283 | 10.05.2000 Original published format: ZA 200002283 | [2003/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0185238 | Date: | 15.11.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/46] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1284768 | Date: | 26.02.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.11.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.03.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A61M5/50, A61M5/32 | [2003/09] | CPC: |
A61M5/322 (EP,US);
A61M2005/3231 (EP,US);
A61M2005/3235 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/09] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SICHERHEITSSPRITZENANORDNUNG | [2003/09] | English: | SAFETY SYRINGE ASSEMBLY | [2003/09] | French: | ENSEMBLE SERINGUE DE SECURITE | [2003/09] | Entry into regional phase | 10.12.2002 | National basic fee paid | 10.12.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.12.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.12.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 10.12.2002 | Examination requested [2003/09] | 18.03.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.09.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/14] | 03.11.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2005/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2003 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   21.11.2003 | 31.05.2004 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]FR2718358 (ELFANDI PATRICE [FR], et al) [X] 1,6 * page 9, line 34 - page 10, line 20 * * page 10, line 27 - line 35 * * figures 2A,2B,4 * [A] 2-5; | [XA]US5658257 (RYLES LOUIS [AU]) [X] 1 * the whole document * [A] 2-5; | [XA]WO9632977 (CURIE NAPOLEON [AU], et al) [X] 1 * page 14, line 39 - page 15, line 28 * * figures 1,2 * [A] 2-5; | [XA]WO9211883 (YULAMI PTY LTD [AU]) [X] 1 * page 6, line 19 - page 7, line 11 * * figures 1A-1C * [A] 2-5; | [XP]WO0041494 (DUGMORE PETER BALFOUR [ZA], et al) [XP] 1-6 * the whole document * | by applicant | US5053018 | US5304149 |