EP1200197 - A DEVICE FOR MOVING AND ORIENTING SPRAYING NOZZLES IN A COATING PAN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.06.2006 Database last updated on 23.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.06.2009 | Change - representative | published on 15.07.2009 [2009/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states I.M.A. INDUSTRIA MACCHINE AUTOMATICHE S.p.A. Via Emilia 428-442 40064 Ozzano Emilia (Bologna) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2005/29] | For all designated states I.M.A. Industria Macchine Automatiche S.p.A. Via Emilia 428-442 40064 Ozzano Emilia (Bologna) / IT | ||
Former [2002/18] | For all designated states G.S. S.R.L. COATING SYSTEM Via Emilia, 428-442 40064 Ozzano Emilia / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GIOGOLI, Antonio Via Capelli, 7 I-40127 Bologna / IT | [2002/18] | Representative(s) | Dall'Olio, Giancarlo Invention S.r.l. Via delle Armi 1 40137 Bologna / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2009/29] | Dall'Olio, Giancarlo Invention S.r.l. Via delle Armi 1 40137 Bologna / IT | ||
Former [2002/18] | Dall'Olio, Giancarlo c/o INVENTION s.a.s., Via delle Armi, 1 40137 Bologna / IT | Application number, filing date | 01928163.3 | 16.05.2001 | [2002/18] | WO2001IB00872 | Priority number, date | IT2000BO00305 | 19.05.2000 Original published format: IT BO000305 | [2002/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0187497 | Date: | 22.11.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1200197 | Date: | 02.05.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.11.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1200197 | Date: | 10.08.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.11.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B05B13/02, B05B15/08 | [2002/18] | CPC: |
B01J2/006 (EP,US);
B05B13/02 (KR);
B01J2/12 (EP);
B01J2/14 (EP,US);
B05B13/0257 (EP,US);
B05B15/68 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2004/22] |
Former [2002/18] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM BEWEGEN UND ORIENTIEREN VON SPRÜHDÜSEN IN EINER BESCHICHTUNGSTROMMEL | [2002/18] | English: | A DEVICE FOR MOVING AND ORIENTING SPRAYING NOZZLES IN A COATING PAN | [2002/18] | French: | DISPOSITIF POUR DEPLACER ET ORIENTER DES BUSES DE PULVERISATION DANS UNE CUVE D'ENROBAGE | [2002/18] | Entry into regional phase | 12.02.2002 | National basic fee paid | 12.02.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.02.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.02.2002 | Examination requested [2002/18] | 21.02.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.06.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 13.06.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.05.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US5302201 (LUECKE ROLAND [DE]) |