EP1278569 - APPARATUS FOR THE DELIVERY OF MEDICAMENTS TO THE RESPIRATORY SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2003/05] | APPARATUS AND METHODS FOR THE DELIVERY OF MEDICAMENTS TO THE RESPIRATORY SYSTEM | ||
[2006/43] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.09.2008 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.07.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 11.08.2010 [2010/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aerogen (Ireland) Limited Galway Business Park Dangan, Galway / IE | [2003/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
POWER, John, Sylvester 40 Woodland Park Moycullen, County Galway / IE | [2003/05] | Representative(s) | O'Brien, John Augustine, et al John A. O'Brien & Associates Unit 4, The Courtyard Business Centre Orchard Lane Blackrock, County Dublin, A94 NV07 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/05] | O'Brien, John A, et al John A. O'Brien & Associates, Third Floor, Duncairn House, 14 Carysfort Avenue Blackrock, County Dublin / IE | Application number, filing date | 01928171.6 | 04.05.2001 | [2003/05] | WO2001IE00060 | Priority number, date | WO2000IE00051 | 05.05.2000 Original published format: PCT/IE00/00051 | [2003/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0185244 | Date: | 15.11.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1278569 | Date: | 29.01.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.11.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1278569 | Date: | 31.10.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.11.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A61M15/00, A61M16/08 | [2003/05] | CPC: |
A61M16/0833 (EP,US);
A61M15/0085 (EP,US);
A61M2209/082 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/05] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GERÄT ZUM EINBRINGEN EINES MEDIKAMENTES IN DAS RESPIRATORISCHE SYSTEM | [2006/43] | English: | APPARATUS FOR THE DELIVERY OF MEDICAMENTS TO THE RESPIRATORY SYSTEM | [2006/43] | French: | APPAREIL DESTINE A L'ADMINISTRATION DE MEDICAMENTS AU SYSTEME RESPIRATOIRE | [2006/43] |
Former [2003/05] | GERÄT UND METHODE ZUM EINBRINGEN EINES MEDIKAMENTES IN DAS RESPIRATORISCHE SYSTEM | ||
Former [2003/05] | APPARATUS AND METHODS FOR THE DELIVERY OF MEDICAMENTS TO THE RESPIRATORY SYSTEM | ||
Former [2003/05] | APPAREIL ET PROCEDES DESTINES A L'ADMINISTRATION DE MEDICAMENTS AU SYSTEME RESPIRATOIRE | Entry into regional phase | 07.11.2002 | National basic fee paid | 07.11.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.11.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.10.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 07.11.2002 | Examination requested [2003/05] | 09.11.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.03.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.08.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 23.09.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.12.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.06.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.06.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.09.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 10.09.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.08.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 31.10.2007 | DK | 31.10.2007 | FI | 31.10.2007 | NL | 31.10.2007 | SE | 31.01.2008 | LU | 04.05.2008 | MC | 31.05.2008 | [2010/32] |
Former [2009/33] | CY | 31.10.2007 | |
DK | 31.10.2007 | ||
FI | 31.10.2007 | ||
NL | 31.10.2007 | ||
SE | 31.01.2008 | ||
MC | 31.05.2008 | ||
Former [2009/15] | DK | 31.10.2007 | |
FI | 31.10.2007 | ||
NL | 31.10.2007 | ||
SE | 31.01.2008 | ||
MC | 31.05.2008 | ||
Former [2009/04] | DK | 31.10.2007 | |
NL | 31.10.2007 | ||
SE | 31.01.2008 | ||
MC | 31.05.2008 | ||
Former [2008/35] | DK | 31.10.2007 | |
NL | 31.10.2007 | ||
SE | 31.01.2008 | ||
Former [2008/23] | NL | 31.10.2007 | |
SE | 31.01.2008 | Cited in | International search | [A]US3903884 (HUSTON PAUL O, et al) [A] 27,29-33,58,59,76-90 * column A * * column 6, line 8 - line 16; figures 8,9 *; | [A]US4030492 (SIMBRUNER GEORG) [A] 1-4,91-93,107,110,111 * column A; figures 2,3 * * ref. no.: 21, 25 *; | [YA]US4076021 (THOMPSON HARRIS A) [Y] 3,4,103,110-113 * column A; figures 15-18 * [A] 91-97; | [A]US4566452 (FARR JAMES I [US]) [A] 27,29-44 * column A; figure 1 *; | [A]US5022587 (HOCHSTEIN PETER A [US]) [A] 58-75 * column A * * column 1, line 64 - column 2, line 12 * * column 2, line 44 - line 54 * * column 3, line 15 - column 4, line 52; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US5063922 (HAEKKINEN TAISTO [FI]) [A] 58-61,63-75 * column A * * column 1, line 61 - column 2, line 46 * * column 3, line 64 - column 4, line 4 * * column 6, line 1 - line 6; figures 1A,2A,3 *; | [XAY]US5752502 (KING RUSSELL WAYNE [US]) [X] 1,2,5-21,27-29,35-43,45,46,50,56,57,98,100 * column A * * figures 2,6,7,9 * [A] 30-34,44,47-55,94-97 [Y] 3,4,22-26,58-90,99,101,102,104-109,114,117-119; | [YD]US5758637 (IVRI YEHUDA [US], et al) [YD] 22-26,58-90,99,101-114,117-119 * column A * * column 8, line 35 - line 38 * * column 11, line 32 - line 58 * * column 12, line 10 - line 29 * * column 12, line 50 - column 13, line 10 * * column 17, line 43 - line 53 * * column 18, line 7 - line 29; figures 11,12,18-20 *; | [A]EP0933138 (OMRON TATEISI ELECTRONICS CO [JP]) [A] 1,22-27,39,51-53,101,102,104-109 * column A; figures 2,3,8 *; | [A]US6029666 (ALOY ALEXANDER [AT], et al) [A] 1-4,91-93,107,110,111* figure 1 * | Examination | WO0119437 | by applicant | US5164740 | US5586550 | US5758637 | US5938117 | US6085740 |