EP1187533 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR REMOVING FAT FROM MEAT CUTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.02.2006 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.06.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 04.07.2007 [2007/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOWNSEND ENGINEERING COMPANY 2425 Hubbell Avenue Des Moines, IA 50317 / US | [2002/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VELDKAMP, Brent, M. 2425 Hubbell Avenue Des Moines, IA 50317 / US | 02 /
SEABERG, Thomas, R. 2425 Hubbell Avenue Des Moines, IA 50317 / US | 03 /
HOLMS, Don, D. 2425 Hubbell Avenue Des Moines, IA 50317 / US | 04 /
MCCLOSKEY, Doug 2425 Hubbell Avenue Des Moines, IA 50317 / US | [2002/12] | Representative(s) | Thomson, Paul Anthony Potts, Kerr & Co. 15, Hamilton Square Birkenhead Merseyside CH41 6BR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/12] | Thomson, Paul Anthony Potts, Kerr & Co., 15, Hamilton Square Birkenhead, Merseyside CH41 6BR / GB | Application number, filing date | 01929078.2 | 19.04.2001 | [2002/12] | WO2001US40559 | Priority number, date | US20000552396 | 19.04.2000 Original published format: US 552396 | US20010835748 | 16.04.2001 Original published format: US 835748 | [2002/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0178515 | Date: | 25.10.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1187533 | Date: | 20.03.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.10.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1187533 | Date: | 06.04.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.10.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A22C17/00, A22B5/00 | [2002/12] | CPC: |
A22C17/0086 (EP,US);
A22B5/0017 (EP,US);
A22B5/0029 (EP,US);
A22B5/0041 (EP,US);
A22B5/0064 (EP,US);
A22B5/166 (EP,US);
A22C17/0006 (EP,US);
A22C17/004 (EP,US);
A22C17/008 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/12] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM ABTRENNEN DES FETTS VON FLEISCHTEILEN | [2002/12] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR REMOVING FAT FROM MEAT CUTS | [2002/12] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL PERMETTANT DE RETIRER LA GRAISSE DE COUPES DE VIANDE | [2002/12] | Entry into regional phase | 13.10.2001 | National basic fee paid | 13.10.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.02.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.02.2002 | Examination requested [2002/18] | 06.08.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.11.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.04.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.08.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.10.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.01.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 28.01.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.01.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 06.04.2005 | BE | 06.04.2005 | CH | 06.04.2005 | FI | 06.04.2005 | LI | 06.04.2005 | TR | 06.04.2005 | CY | 19.04.2005 | IE | 19.04.2005 | LU | 19.04.2005 | MC | 30.04.2005 | GR | 06.07.2005 | SE | 06.07.2005 | ES | 17.07.2005 | PT | 08.09.2005 | [2007/27] |
Former [2007/26] | AT | 06.04.2005 | |
BE | 06.04.2005 | ||
CH | 06.04.2005 | ||
FI | 06.04.2005 | ||
LI | 06.04.2005 | ||
TR | 06.04.2005 | ||
CY | 19.04.2005 | ||
IE | 19.04.2005 | ||
LU | 19.04.2005 | ||
GR | 06.07.2005 | ||
SE | 06.07.2005 | ||
ES | 17.07.2005 | ||
PT | 08.09.2005 | ||
Former [2007/20] | AT | 06.04.2005 | |
BE | 06.04.2005 | ||
CH | 06.04.2005 | ||
FI | 06.04.2005 | ||
LI | 06.04.2005 | ||
TR | 06.04.2005 | ||
CY | 19.04.2005 | ||
IE | 19.04.2005 | ||
LU | 06.06.2005 | ||
GR | 06.07.2005 | ||
SE | 06.07.2005 | ||
ES | 17.07.2005 | ||
PT | 08.09.2005 | ||
Former [2007/10] | AT | 06.04.2005 | |
BE | 06.04.2005 | ||
CH | 06.04.2005 | ||
FI | 06.04.2005 | ||
LI | 06.04.2005 | ||
TR | 06.04.2005 | ||
IE | 19.04.2005 | ||
LU | 06.06.2005 | ||
GR | 06.07.2005 | ||
SE | 06.07.2005 | ||
ES | 17.07.2005 | ||
PT | 08.09.2005 | ||
Former [2006/51] | AT | 06.04.2005 | |
BE | 06.04.2005 | ||
CH | 06.04.2005 | ||
FI | 06.04.2005 | ||
LI | 06.04.2005 | ||
TR | 06.04.2005 | ||
IE | 19.04.2005 | ||
GR | 06.07.2005 | ||
SE | 06.07.2005 | ||
ES | 17.07.2005 | ||
PT | 08.09.2005 | ||
Former [2006/25] | AT | 06.04.2005 | |
BE | 06.04.2005 | ||
CH | 06.04.2005 | ||
FI | 06.04.2005 | ||
LI | 06.04.2005 | ||
IE | 19.04.2005 | ||
GR | 06.07.2005 | ||
SE | 06.07.2005 | ||
ES | 17.07.2005 | ||
PT | 08.09.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 06.04.2005 | |
BE | 06.04.2005 | ||
CH | 06.04.2005 | ||
FI | 06.04.2005 | ||
LI | 06.04.2005 | ||
GR | 06.07.2005 | ||
SE | 06.07.2005 | ||
ES | 17.07.2005 | ||
PT | 08.09.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 06.04.2005 | |
BE | 06.04.2005 | ||
FI | 06.04.2005 | ||
SE | 06.07.2005 | ||
Former [2005/52] | FI | 06.04.2005 | |
SE | 06.07.2005 | ||
Former [2005/50] | SE | 06.07.2005 | Cited in | International search | [XY]GB1494147 (HOFSTETTER K) [X] 13 * page 1, line 31 - line 78; figure - * [Y] 1-11,14-26; | [A]US4209878 (ALBERT HOWARD C [US]) [A] 1-26 * column 1, line 5 - line 33 * * column 3, line 10 - line 31 * * column 5, line 27 - line 59 * * column 6, line 24 - line 35; figure - *; | [Y]US4246837 (CHENERY BRIAN R) [Y] 1-11,14-26 * column 1, line 28 - column 2, line 22 * * column 4, line 64 - line 67; figure - *; | [A]WO9402803 (AEW INT LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1-26 * page 1, line 1 - page 3, line 15 * * page 4, line 5 - page 5, line 3 * * page 8, line 5 - page 10, line 26; figure - *; | [A]WO9919727 (SLAGTERIERNES FORSKNINGSINST [DK], et al) [A] 1-26* the whole document * |