EP1265915 - NOVEL COMPOUNDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.09.2011 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.09.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.10.2011 [2011/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GlaxoSmithKline Biologicals s.a. rue de l'Institut 89 1330 Rixensart / BE | [2010/45] |
Former [2003/03] | For all designated states GlaxoSmithKline Biologicals S.A. Rue de l'Institut 89 1330 Rixensart / BE | ||
Former [2002/51] | For all designated states SMITHKLINE BEECHAM BIOLOGICALS S.A. 89 rue de l'Institut 1330 Rixensart / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CABEZON-SILVA, T.E.V., SmithKline Beecham Bio. SA Rue de l'Institut 89 B-1330 Rixensart / BE | 02 /
CASSART, J.P., SmithKline Beecham Biologicals SA Rue de l'Institut 89 B-1330 Rixensart / BE | 03 /
COCHE, Thierry, SmithKline Beecham Biologicals SA Rue de l'Institut 89 B-1330 Rixensart / BE | 04 /
GAULIS, S.R.J.T., SmithKline Beecham Bio. SA Rue de l'Institut 89 B-1330 Rixensart / BE | 05 /
VINALS Y DE BASSOLS, C., SmithKline Beecham Bio.SA Rue de l'Institut 89 B-1330 Rixensart / BE | [2002/51] | Representative(s) | Dalton, Marcus Jonathan William GlaxoSmithKline Global Patents (CN925.1) 980 Great West Road Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/45] | Dalton, Marcus Jonathan William GlaxoSmithKline Corporate Intellectual Property (CN9.25.1) 980 Great West Road Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB | ||
Former [2002/51] | Dalton, Marcus Jonathan William GlaxoSmithKline Corporate Intellectual Property (CN9.25.1) 980 Great West Road Brentford Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB | Application number, filing date | 01929345.5 | 16.02.2001 | [2002/51] | WO2001EP01779 | Priority number, date | GB20000004269 | 23.02.2000 Original published format: GB 0004269 | GB20000009905 | 20.04.2000 Original published format: GB 0009905 | GB20000021080 | 25.08.2000 Original published format: GB 0021080 | [2002/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0162778 | Date: | 30.08.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/35] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1265915 | Date: | 18.12.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.08.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1265915 | Date: | 10.11.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.04.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C07K14/00 | [2002/51] | CPC: |
C07K14/4748 (EP,US);
C07K14/47 (KR);
A61P1/00 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P37/02 (EP);
A61P37/04 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/51] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | 21.08.2002 | Title | German: | NEUE VERBINDUNGEN | [2010/21] | English: | NOVEL COMPOUNDS | [2002/51] | French: | NOUVEAUX COMPOSES | [2002/51] |
Former [2002/51] | Neue Verbindungen | Entry into regional phase | 21.08.2002 | National basic fee paid | 21.08.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.08.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.09.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 21.08.2002 | Examination requested [2002/51] | 04.05.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.09.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.09.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 28.04.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.08.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 26.08.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Appeal following examination | 18.11.2005 | Appeal received No. T0394/06 | 20.01.2006 | Statement of grounds filed | 28.07.2009 | Result of appeal procedure: remittal for grant | 28.07.2009 | Date of oral proceedings | 07.08.2009 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 28.07.2009 | Date of oral proceedings | 28.07.2009 | Date of oral proceedings | Divisional application(s) | EP06075141.9 / EP1650221 | Opposition(s) | 11.08.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 05.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 08.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 09.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 08.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9315763 (SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORP [US]) [X] 1-11,13-23,26,31,32 * the whole document *; | [PX]WO0053748 (SMITHKLINE BEECHAM BIOLOG [BE], et al) [PX] 1-38* the whole document *; | [XY] - SWISS-PROT, (19971101), XP002173710 [X] 7-12,15-19 * the whole document * [Y] 1-6,13,14,20-23,26,31,32,35,36 | [XY] - EMBL, (19971127), XP002173711 [X] 7-12,15-19 * the whole document * [Y] 1-6,13,14,20-23,26,31,32,35,36 | [XY] - ALDERS ET AL., "The human Achaete-Scute homologue 2 (ASCL2, HASH2) maps to chromosome 11p15.5, close to IGF2 and is expressed in extravillus trophoblasts.", HUMAN MOLECULAR GENETICS, (1997), vol. 6, no. 6, pages 859 - 867, XP002173709 [X] 7-12,15-19 * the whole document * [Y] 1-6,13,14,20-23,26,31,32,35,36 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/hmg/6.6.859 | [XY] - SWISS-PROT, (19991101), XP002173712 [X] 7-12,15-19 * the whole document * [Y] 1-6,13,14,20-23,26,31,32,35,36 | [XY] - SWISS-PROT, (19980101), XP002173713 [X] 7-12,15-19 * the whole document * [Y] 1-6,13,14,20-23,26,31,32,35,36 | [XY] - EMBL, (19971127), XP002173714 [X] 7-12,15-19 * the whole document * [Y] 1-6,13,14,20-23,26,31,32,35,36 | [XY] - EMBL, (19900922), XP002173715 [X] 7-12,15-19 * the whole document * [Y] 1-6,13,14,20-23,26,31,32,35,36 |