EP1283694 - THE USE OF PLANT EXTRACTS IN A COSMETIC COMPOSITION TO PROTECT KERATINOUS FIBERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.03.2006 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.03.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.05.2006 [2006/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states L'OREAL S.A. 14, rue Royale 75008 Paris Cedex / FR | [2003/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CANNELL, David, W. 1314 Highland Avenue Plainfield, NJ 07060 / US | 02 /
FADEEVA, Natalya 219 Lexington Avenue, Apt. 4 Clark, NJ 07066 / US | 03 /
MATHUR, Hitendra 23B Woodbridge Terrace Woodbridge, NJ 07095 / US | 04 /
NGUYEN, Nghi, Van 8 Churchill Road Edison, NJ 08820 / US | [2003/08] | Representative(s) | Bentham, Stephen J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/08] | Bentham, Stephen J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 01929911.4 | 21.05.2001 | [2003/08] | WO2001IB00886 | Priority number, date | US20000576800 | 23.05.2000 Original published format: US 576800 | [2003/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0189459 | Date: | 29.11.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/48] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1283694 | Date: | 19.02.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.11.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.05.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A61K7/06, A61K7/032 | [2003/08] | CPC: |
A61Q5/00 (EP,US);
A61K8/9789 (EP,US);
A61K8/9794 (EP,US);
A61Q5/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2004/21] |
Former [2003/08] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG VON PFLANZENEXTRAKTEN IN KOSMETISCHEN ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ZUM SCHUTZ VON KERATINFASERN | [2003/08] | English: | THE USE OF PLANT EXTRACTS IN A COSMETIC COMPOSITION TO PROTECT KERATINOUS FIBERS | [2003/08] | French: | UTILISATION D'EXTRAITS DE PLANTES DANS UNE COMPOSITION COSMETIQUE POUR PROTEGER LES FIBRES CORNEES | [2003/08] | Entry into regional phase | 09.12.2002 | National basic fee paid | 09.12.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.12.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.12.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 09.12.2002 | Examination requested [2003/08] | 10.11.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.12.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/18] | 01.12.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2006/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2005 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]FR2740331 (SEDERMA SA [FR]) [X] 1-3,10-12,14-17 * page 6; example 3 * * page 7, line 12 - line 19 * * claims 1,3,5-10 *; | [X]WO9960989 (HENKEL KGAA [DE], et al) [X] 1,10-12,14,15 * claims 1-6,13-15 *; | [X]DE2703189 (DIECKMANN GEB HOEGER IDA) [X] 1,10-12 * claim - *; | [X]EP0668072 (RICHTER CHEM LAB [DE]) [X] 1,2,10-12 * page 3, line 27 - line 34 * * page 3, line 38 - line 48 * * page 4, line 38 * * page 6, line 43 - line 49 * * claim - * | [X] - BURMEISTER F ET AL, "VEGETABLE/PLANT PROTEINS IN SHAMPOOS", SOFW-JOURNAL SEIFEN, OELE, FETTE, WACHSE, VERLAG FUR CHEMISCHE INDUSTRIE, H. ZIOLKOWSKY K.G. AUGSBURG, DE, (19920401), vol. 118, no. 6, ISSN 0942-7694, pages 363,366 - 368, XP000246049 [X] 1,10-12,14,15 * page 3, column L * * page 4; example 2 * |