EP1280729 - ELASTIC BODY, METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING THE SAME AND MATTRESS INCLUDING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.10.2006 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 07.01.2009 [2009/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Choi, YounSoo 301-401 Gangseonmaeul, 43, Juyeop-Dong Ilsan-Gu Goyang-Si Gyeonggi-Do 411-370 / KR | [2005/50] |
Former [2003/06] | For all designated states Choi, YounSoo 301-401 Gangseonmaeul, Ilsan-Gu, Goyang-Si Gyeonggi-Do 411-370 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2003/06] | Representative(s) | Prato, Roberto, et al Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2003/06] | Prato, Roberto, et al STUDIO TORTA S.r.l., Via Viotti 9 10121 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 01930288.4 | 09.05.2001 | [2003/06] | WO2001KR00755 | Priority number, date | KR20000025425 | 12.05.2000 Original published format: KR 2000025425 | [2003/06] | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0185598 | Date: | 15.11.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1280729 | Date: | 05.02.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.11.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1280729 | Date: | 14.12.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 15.11.2001 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.12.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B68G5/02, A47C27/14, C08J9/00 | [2005/03] | CPC: |
A47C27/20 (EP,US);
B68G5/02 (KR);
A47C27/15 (EP,US);
A47C27/16 (EP,US);
Y10S5/953 (US)
|
Former IPC [2003/06] | B68G5/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/06] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELASTISCHER KÖRPER, VERFAHREN ZU SEINER HERSTELLUNG UND MATRATZE MIT EINEM SOLCHEN KÖRPER | [2003/06] | English: | ELASTIC BODY, METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING THE SAME AND MATTRESS INCLUDING THE SAME | [2003/06] | French: | CORPS ELASTIQUE, SON PROCEDE DE FABRICATION ET MATELAS LE CONTENANT | [2003/06] | Entry into regional phase | 09.05.2001 | Translation filed | 11.02.2002 | National basic fee paid | 11.02.2002 | Search fee paid | 11.02.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.02.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.02.2002 | Examination requested [2003/06] | 03.05.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.09.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 05.09.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.09.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 14.12.2005 | CY | 14.12.2005 | FI | 14.12.2005 | NL | 14.12.2005 | TR | 14.12.2005 | DK | 14.03.2006 | GR | 14.03.2006 | SE | 14.03.2006 | IE | 09.05.2006 | LU | 09.05.2006 | PT | 15.05.2006 | MC | 31.05.2006 | [2009/02] |
Former [2008/37] | BE | 14.12.2005 | |
FI | 14.12.2005 | ||
NL | 14.12.2005 | ||
TR | 14.12.2005 | ||
DK | 14.03.2006 | ||
GR | 14.03.2006 | ||
SE | 14.03.2006 | ||
IE | 09.05.2006 | ||
LU | 09.05.2006 | ||
PT | 15.05.2006 | ||
MC | 31.05.2006 | ||
Former [2007/45] | BE | 14.12.2005 | |
FI | 14.12.2005 | ||
NL | 14.12.2005 | ||
DK | 14.03.2006 | ||
GR | 14.03.2006 | ||
SE | 14.03.2006 | ||
IE | 09.05.2006 | ||
PT | 15.05.2006 | ||
MC | 31.05.2006 | ||
Former [2007/36] | BE | 14.12.2005 | |
FI | 14.12.2005 | ||
IT | 14.12.2005 | ||
NL | 14.12.2005 | ||
DK | 14.03.2006 | ||
GR | 14.03.2006 | ||
SE | 14.03.2006 | ||
IE | 09.05.2006 | ||
PT | 15.05.2006 | ||
MC | 31.05.2006 | ||
Former [2007/25] | BE | 14.12.2005 | |
FI | 14.12.2005 | ||
NL | 14.12.2005 | ||
DK | 14.03.2006 | ||
GR | 14.03.2006 | ||
SE | 14.03.2006 | ||
IE | 09.05.2006 | ||
PT | 15.05.2006 | ||
MC | 31.05.2006 | ||
Former [2007/07] | BE | 14.12.2005 | |
FI | 14.12.2005 | ||
NL | 14.12.2005 | ||
DK | 14.03.2006 | ||
GR | 14.03.2006 | ||
SE | 14.03.2006 | ||
PT | 15.05.2006 | ||
MC | 31.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/51] | BE | 14.12.2005 | |
FI | 14.12.2005 | ||
NL | 14.12.2005 | ||
DK | 14.03.2006 | ||
GR | 14.03.2006 | ||
SE | 14.03.2006 | ||
PT | 15.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/48] | BE | 14.12.2005 | |
FI | 14.12.2005 | ||
NL | 14.12.2005 | ||
GR | 14.03.2006 | ||
SE | 14.03.2006 | ||
PT | 15.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/45] | BE | 14.12.2005 | |
FI | 14.12.2005 | ||
NL | 14.12.2005 | ||
GR | 14.03.2006 | ||
SE | 14.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/38] | BE | 14.12.2005 | |
FI | 14.12.2005 | ||
GR | 14.03.2006 | ||
SE | 14.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/36] | BE | 14.12.2005 | |
FI | 14.12.2005 | ||
SE | 14.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/27] | FI | 14.12.2005 | |
SE | 14.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/23] | FI | 14.12.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR1434091 (ERIC ORMEROD LTD); | [A]US4670477 (KELLY DAVID J [US], et al) [A] 1 * claims 1-14 *; | [A]EP0686660 (WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORP [US]) | International search | [A]JPS61122885 (HAGIWARA KK); | [A]KR950026532U ; | [A]JPH0956531 (TOKEN JUSHI KAGAKU KK); | [A]KR19980010603U |