EP1287321 - METHOD FOR SELECTING TIME-TEMPERATURE INDICATORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 02.08.2003 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.03.2010 | Change - representative | published on 21.04.2010 [2010/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2003/10] | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SPEVACEK, John, A. P.O. Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | 02 /
MATNER, Richard, R. P.O. Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [2003/10] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/15] | von Kreisler Selting Werner Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | ||
Former [2010/15] | Hilleringmann, Jochen, et al von Kreisler-Selting-Werner Patentanwälte Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | ||
Former [2003/10] | Hilleringmann, Jochen, et al Bahnhofsvorplatz 1, Deichmannhaus 50667 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 01930772.7 | 25.04.2001 | [2003/10] | WO2001US13376 | Priority number, date | US20000585520 | 01.06.2000 Original published format: US 585520 | [2003/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0192840 | Date: | 06.12.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1287321 | Date: | 05.03.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.12.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.12.2001 | Classification | IPC: | G01K3/04, G06F17/30 | [2003/10] | CPC: |
G01K3/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/10] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR AUSWAHL VON ZEIT-TEMPERATUR-INDIKATOREN | [2003/10] | English: | METHOD FOR SELECTING TIME-TEMPERATURE INDICATORS | [2003/10] | French: | PROCEDE DE SELECTION D'INDICATEURS DE TEMPS/TEMPERATURE | [2003/10] | Entry into regional phase | 16.11.2002 | National basic fee paid | 16.11.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.11.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.11.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 16.11.2002 | Examination requested [2003/10] | 29.07.2003 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2003/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US3967579 (SEITER CHARLES) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]US3561270 (SESSLER DONALD K) [A] 1 * figure 1 *; | [A]JPH10320454 ; | [A]EP0446098 (VALEO) [A] 1-6 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990331), vol. 1999, no. 03, & JP10320454 A 19981204 (HITACHI LTD) [A] 1,3-6 * abstract * |