EP1269516 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR FORMING INNER MAGNETIC BUCKET TO CONTROL A VOLUME OF A PLASMA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.01.2016 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.01.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.03.2016 [2016/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LAM RESEARCH CORPORATION 4650 Cushing Parkway Fremont, CA 94538-6470 / US | [2003/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BAILEY, Andrew, D., III 5167 Northway Road Pleasanton, CA 94566 / US | [2003/01] | Representative(s) | Kontrus, Gerhard, et al Patent Counsel Lam Research AG SEZ-Strasse 1 9500 Villach / AT | [2012/15] |
Former [2009/44] | Browne, Robin Forsythe, et al Leaman Browne Limited Pearl Chambers 22 East Parade Leeds, Yorkshire LS1 5BY / GB | ||
Former [2006/50] | Browne, Robin Forsythe, et al Leaman Browne 5 South Parade Leeds, LS1 5QX / GB | ||
Former [2006/31] | Browne, Robin Forsythe, et al HLBBshaw 1200 Century Way Thorpe Park Business Park, Colton Leeds LS15 8ZA / GB | ||
Former [2003/01] | Browne, Robin Forsythe, Dr., et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord Tower House Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | Application number, filing date | 01931112.5 | 13.03.2001 | [2003/01] | WO2001US40285 | Priority number, date | US20000536347 | 27.03.2000 Original published format: US 536347 | [2003/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0173812 | Date: | 04.10.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/40] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1269516 | Date: | 02.01.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.10.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.03.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H01J37/32 | [2003/01] | CPC: |
H01J37/321 (EP,US);
H05H1/16 (KR);
H01J37/32623 (EP,US);
H01J37/32688 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/01] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ERZEUGUNG EINER INNEN MAGNETISCHEN FLASCHE ZUR STEUERUNG EINES PLASMAVOLUMENS | [2003/01] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR FORMING INNER MAGNETIC BUCKET TO CONTROL A VOLUME OF A PLASMA | [2003/01] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE SEAU MAGNETIQUE INTERIEUR PLASMAGENE DESTINE A REGULER LE VOLUME D'UN PLASMA | [2003/01] | Entry into regional phase | 24.09.2002 | National basic fee paid | 24.09.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.09.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.09.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 24.09.2002 | Examination requested [2003/01] | 11.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.07.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.12.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.06.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.10.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/09] | 27.10.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2016/09] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.03.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 28.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 26.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 27.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 27.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2015 | 15   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US5464499 (MOSLEHI MEHRDAD M [US], et al) [X] 1-7,12-17 * column 9, line 20 - line 47; figures 5,6 *; | [X]US5346579 (COOK JOEL M [US], et al) [X] 1,12 * column 4, line 49 - column 5, line 38; figure 4 * | Examination | US6015476 | US5980687 | by applicant | US5464499 | US5346579 | US6015476 | US5980687 |