EP1272259 - METHOD OF FORMING HYDROGEN-SELECTIVE METAL MEMBRANE MODULES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2003/02] | HYDROGEN-SELECTIVE METAL MEMBRANE MODULES AND METHOD OF FORMING THE SAME | ||
[2004/20] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.09.2005 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.06.2008 | Change - representative | published on 09.07.2008 [2008/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IdaTech, LLC. P.O. Box 5339 Bend Oregon 97708-5339 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2003/02] | For all designated states IdaTech, LLC. P.O. Box 5339 Bend, Oregon 97708-5339 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EDLUND, David, J. 1698 Davenport Bend, OR 97701 / US | 02 /
PLEDGER, William, A. 69222 Harness Sisters, OR 97759 / US | 03 /
STUDEBAKER, Todd 3029 N.E. Charleston Court Bend, OR 97701 / US | [2003/02] | Representative(s) | HGF 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/28] | Harrison Goddard Foote Belgrave Hall Belgrave Street Leeds LS2 8DD / GB | ||
Former [2003/02] | Harrison Goddard Foote Belgrave Hall Belgrave Street Leeds LS2 8DD / GB | Application number, filing date | 01931116.6 | 22.03.2001 | [2003/02] | WO2001US40364 | Priority number, date | US20000191891P | 23.03.2000 Original published format: US 191891 P | US20010812499 | 19.03.2001 Original published format: US 812499 | [2003/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0170376 | Date: | 27.09.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1272259 | Date: | 08.01.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.09.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1272259 | Date: | 27.10.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 27.09.2001 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.04.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B01D71/02, B01D69/10, B01D53/22, B01D63/08 | [2003/22] | CPC: |
B01D53/22 (EP,KR,US);
B01D63/08 (EP);
C01B3/503 (EP,US);
H01M8/0612 (EP,US);
B01D2313/22 (EP);
B01D2313/221 (US);
B01D2313/42 (EP,US);
C01B2203/041 (EP,US);
C01B2203/047 (EP,US);
C01B2203/0475 (EP,US);
H01M8/0668 (EP,US);
H01M8/0687 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2003/02] | B01D53/22 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/02] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG WASSERSTOFFSELEKTIVER METALLMEMBRANMODULE | [2004/20] | English: | METHOD OF FORMING HYDROGEN-SELECTIVE METAL MEMBRANE MODULES | [2004/20] | French: | PROCEDE DE FABRICATION DE MODULES DE MEMBRANES METALLIQUES A SELECTIVITE POUR L'HYDROGENE | [2004/20] |
Former [2003/02] | WASSERSTOFFSELEKTIVE METALLMEMBRANMODULEUND VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG | ||
Former [2003/02] | HYDROGEN-SELECTIVE METAL MEMBRANE MODULES AND METHOD OF FORMING THE SAME | ||
Former [2003/02] | MODULES DE MEMBRANES METALLIQUES A SELECTIVITE POUR L'HYDROGENE ET PROCEDES DE FABRICATION | Entry into regional phase | 11.09.2002 | National basic fee paid | 11.09.2002 | Search fee paid | 11.09.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.09.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.10.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 11.09.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.09.2002 | Examination requested [2003/02] | 23.07.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.11.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.04.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.08.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 10.08.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.07.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 27.10.2004 | BE | 27.10.2004 | CH | 27.10.2004 | FI | 27.10.2004 | LI | 27.10.2004 | NL | 27.10.2004 | TR | 27.10.2004 | DK | 27.01.2005 | GR | 27.01.2005 | SE | 27.01.2005 | ES | 07.02.2005 | CY | 22.03.2005 | IE | 22.03.2005 | LU | 22.03.2005 | PT | 27.03.2005 | MC | 31.03.2005 | [2008/03] |
Former [2007/26] | AT | 27.10.2004 | |
BE | 27.10.2004 | ||
CH | 27.10.2004 | ||
FI | 27.10.2004 | ||
LI | 27.10.2004 | ||
NL | 27.10.2004 | ||
TR | 27.10.2004 | ||
DK | 27.01.2005 | ||
GR | 27.01.2005 | ||
SE | 27.01.2005 | ||
ES | 07.02.2005 | ||
CY | 22.03.2005 | ||
IE | 22.03.2005 | ||
LU | 22.03.2005 | ||
MC | 31.03.2005 | ||
Former [2007/20] | AT | 27.10.2004 | |
BE | 27.10.2004 | ||
CH | 27.10.2004 | ||
FI | 27.10.2004 | ||
LI | 27.10.2004 | ||
NL | 27.10.2004 | ||
TR | 27.10.2004 | ||
DK | 27.01.2005 | ||
GR | 27.01.2005 | ||
SE | 27.01.2005 | ||
ES | 07.02.2005 | ||
CY | 22.03.2005 | ||
IE | 22.03.2005 | ||
LU | 31.03.2005 | ||
MC | 31.03.2005 | ||
Former [2007/10] | AT | 27.10.2004 | |
BE | 27.10.2004 | ||
CH | 27.10.2004 | ||
FI | 27.10.2004 | ||
LI | 27.10.2004 | ||
NL | 27.10.2004 | ||
TR | 27.10.2004 | ||
DK | 27.01.2005 | ||
GR | 27.01.2005 | ||
SE | 27.01.2005 | ||
ES | 07.02.2005 | ||
IE | 22.03.2005 | ||
LU | 31.03.2005 | ||
MC | 31.03.2005 | ||
Former [2006/51] | AT | 27.10.2004 | |
BE | 27.10.2004 | ||
CH | 27.10.2004 | ||
FI | 27.10.2004 | ||
LI | 27.10.2004 | ||
NL | 27.10.2004 | ||
TR | 27.10.2004 | ||
DK | 27.01.2005 | ||
GR | 27.01.2005 | ||
ES | 07.02.2005 | ||
IE | 22.03.2005 | ||
MC | 31.03.2005 | ||
Former [2006/23] | AT | 27.10.2004 | |
BE | 27.10.2004 | ||
CH | 27.10.2004 | ||
FI | 27.10.2004 | ||
LI | 27.10.2004 | ||
NL | 27.10.2004 | ||
DK | 27.01.2005 | ||
GR | 27.01.2005 | ||
ES | 07.02.2005 | ||
IE | 22.03.2005 | ||
MC | 31.03.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 27.10.2004 | |
BE | 27.10.2004 | ||
CH | 27.10.2004 | ||
FI | 27.10.2004 | ||
LI | 27.10.2004 | ||
NL | 27.10.2004 | ||
DK | 27.01.2005 | ||
GR | 27.01.2005 | ||
ES | 07.02.2005 | ||
MC | 31.03.2005 | ||
Former [2005/51] | AT | 27.10.2004 | |
BE | 27.10.2004 | ||
CH | 27.10.2004 | ||
FI | 27.10.2004 | ||
LI | 27.10.2004 | ||
DK | 27.01.2005 | ||
GR | 27.01.2005 | ||
ES | 07.02.2005 | ||
Former [2005/46] | AT | 27.10.2004 | |
CH | 27.10.2004 | ||
FI | 27.10.2004 | ||
LI | 27.10.2004 | ||
DK | 27.01.2005 | ||
GR | 27.01.2005 | ||
ES | 07.02.2005 | ||
Former [2005/36] | AT | 27.10.2004 | |
CH | 27.10.2004 | ||
FI | 27.10.2004 | ||
LI | 27.10.2004 | ||
GR | 27.01.2005 | ||
ES | 07.02.2005 | ||
Former [2005/27] | CH | 27.10.2004 | |
FI | 27.10.2004 | ||
LI | 27.10.2004 | ||
GR | 27.01.2005 | ||
ES | 07.02.2005 | ||
Former [2005/26] | CH | 27.10.2004 | |
FI | 27.10.2004 | ||
LI | 27.10.2004 | ||
GR | 27.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/25] | CH | 27.10.2004 | |
FI | 27.10.2004 | ||
LI | 27.10.2004 | ||
Former [2005/24] | FI | 27.10.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [PX]WO0027507 (ATI PROPERTIES INC [US], et al) [PX] 1-6 * page 11, line 1 - line 23; figures 9-11; claims 1-10 *; | [E]WO0164321 (ATECS MANNESMANN AG [DE], et al) [E] 1,11,40* page 18, line 4 - line 9; figures 2,4; claims 1,2,5,10,16 * | International search | [A]US2824620 (DE ROSSET ARMAND J); | [A]US3520803 (IACONELLI WILLIAM B); | [A]US3564819 (NEULANDER CHARLES K, et al); | [A]US4999107 (GUERIF GERARD [FR]); | [A]US5126045 (KOHLHEB ROBERT [NL], et al); | [A]US5225080 (KARBACHSCH MASSOUD [DE], et al); | [A]US5536405 (MYRNA ROMAN [US], et al); | [A]US5645626 (EDLUND DAVID J [US], et al); | [A]US5997594 (EDLUND DAVID J [US], et al); | [AP]US6221117 (EDLUND DAVID J [US], et al) | Examination | JPH10263372 |