EP1274547 - DEVICE FOR THE TRANSVERSE CUTTING OF AT LEAST ONE WEB IN A FOLDING APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.07.2008 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.02.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 30.03.2011 [2011/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koenig & Bauer Aktiengesellschaft Friedrich-Koenig-Strasse 4 97080 Würzburg / DE | [2003/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HARTMANN, Manfred, Wolfgang Engenthal 68 97725 Elfershausen / DE | 02 /
MICHALIK, Horst, Bernhard Allerseeweg 22 97204 Höchberg / DE | [2003/03] | Application number, filing date | 01931421.0 | 06.04.2001 | [2003/03] | WO2001DE01346 | Priority number, date | DE2000118772 | 15.04.2000 Original published format: DE 10018772 | [2003/03] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0178953 | Date: | 25.10.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/43] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1274547 | Date: | 15.01.2003 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.10.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1274547 | Date: | 19.09.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.04.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B26D1/00 | [2003/03] | CPC: |
B65H35/08 (EP,US);
B65H45/28 (EP,US);
Y10T83/219 (EP,US);
Y10T83/4711 (EP,US);
Y10T83/4812 (EP,US);
Y10T83/4815 (EP,US);
Y10T83/4838 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/03] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM QUERSCHNEIDEN VON MINDESTENS EINER BAHN IN EINEM FALZAPPARAT | [2003/03] | English: | DEVICE FOR THE TRANSVERSE CUTTING OF AT LEAST ONE WEB IN A FOLDING APPARATUS | [2003/03] | French: | DISPOSITIF POUR COUPER TRANSVERSALEMENT UNE BANDE DANS UN APPAREIL DE PLIAGE | [2003/03] | Entry into regional phase | 12.08.2002 | National basic fee paid | 12.08.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.08.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.11.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 12.08.2002 | Examination requested [2003/03] | 23.05.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.11.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 17.11.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.05.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.07.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 30.07.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.06.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/35] | Request for further processing for: | 15.11.2006 | Request for further processing filed | 17.11.2006 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 27.11.2006 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 19.09.2007 | DK | 19.09.2007 | FI | 19.09.2007 | IE | 19.09.2007 | NL | 19.09.2007 | TR | 19.09.2007 | SE | 19.12.2007 | GR | 20.12.2007 | ES | 30.12.2007 | PT | 19.02.2008 | AT | 06.04.2008 | LU | 06.04.2008 | BE | 30.04.2008 | CH | 30.04.2008 | IT | 30.04.2008 | LI | 30.04.2008 | MC | 30.04.2008 | [2011/13] |
Former [2010/37] | CY | 19.09.2007 | |
DK | 19.09.2007 | ||
FI | 19.09.2007 | ||
IE | 19.09.2007 | ||
NL | 19.09.2007 | ||
TR | 19.09.2007 | ||
SE | 19.12.2007 | ||
GR | 20.12.2007 | ||
ES | 30.12.2007 | ||
PT | 19.02.2008 | ||
AT | 06.04.2008 | ||
LU | 06.04.2008 | ||
BE | 30.04.2008 | ||
CH | 30.04.2008 | ||
LI | 30.04.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
Former [2010/32] | CY | 19.09.2007 | |
DK | 19.09.2007 | ||
FI | 19.09.2007 | ||
IE | 19.09.2007 | ||
NL | 19.09.2007 | ||
SE | 19.12.2007 | ||
GR | 20.12.2007 | ||
ES | 30.12.2007 | ||
PT | 19.02.2008 | ||
AT | 06.04.2008 | ||
LU | 06.04.2008 | ||
BE | 30.04.2008 | ||
CH | 30.04.2008 | ||
LI | 30.04.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
Former [2009/40] | CY | 19.09.2007 | |
DK | 19.09.2007 | ||
FI | 19.09.2007 | ||
IE | 19.09.2007 | ||
NL | 19.09.2007 | ||
SE | 19.12.2007 | ||
GR | 20.12.2007 | ||
ES | 30.12.2007 | ||
PT | 19.02.2008 | ||
AT | 06.04.2008 | ||
BE | 30.04.2008 | ||
CH | 30.04.2008 | ||
LI | 30.04.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
Former [2009/33] | CY | 19.09.2007 | |
DK | 19.09.2007 | ||
FI | 19.09.2007 | ||
IE | 19.09.2007 | ||
NL | 19.09.2007 | ||
SE | 19.12.2007 | ||
GR | 20.12.2007 | ||
ES | 30.12.2007 | ||
PT | 19.02.2008 | ||
BE | 30.04.2008 | ||
CH | 30.04.2008 | ||
LI | 30.04.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
Former [2009/19] | DK | 19.09.2007 | |
FI | 19.09.2007 | ||
IE | 19.09.2007 | ||
NL | 19.09.2007 | ||
SE | 19.12.2007 | ||
GR | 20.12.2007 | ||
ES | 30.12.2007 | ||
PT | 19.02.2008 | ||
BE | 30.04.2008 | ||
CH | 30.04.2008 | ||
LI | 30.04.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
Former [2009/12] | DK | 19.09.2007 | |
FI | 19.09.2007 | ||
IE | 19.09.2007 | ||
NL | 19.09.2007 | ||
SE | 19.12.2007 | ||
GR | 20.12.2007 | ||
ES | 30.12.2007 | ||
PT | 19.02.2008 | ||
CH | 30.04.2008 | ||
LI | 30.04.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
Former [2008/51] | DK | 19.09.2007 | |
FI | 19.09.2007 | ||
IE | 19.09.2007 | ||
NL | 19.09.2007 | ||
SE | 19.12.2007 | ||
GR | 20.12.2007 | ||
ES | 30.12.2007 | ||
PT | 19.02.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
Former [2008/45] | DK | 19.09.2007 | |
FI | 19.09.2007 | ||
IE | 19.09.2007 | ||
NL | 19.09.2007 | ||
SE | 19.12.2007 | ||
GR | 20.12.2007 | ||
ES | 30.12.2007 | ||
PT | 19.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/35] | DK | 19.09.2007 | |
FI | 19.09.2007 | ||
NL | 19.09.2007 | ||
SE | 19.12.2007 | ||
GR | 20.12.2007 | ||
ES | 30.12.2007 | ||
PT | 19.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/28] | FI | 19.09.2007 | |
NL | 19.09.2007 | ||
SE | 19.12.2007 | ||
GR | 20.12.2007 | ||
ES | 30.12.2007 | ||
PT | 19.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/24] | FI | 19.09.2007 | |
NL | 19.09.2007 | ||
GR | 20.12.2007 | ||
ES | 30.12.2007 | ||
PT | 19.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/19] | FI | 19.09.2007 | |
GR | 20.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/10] | FI | 19.09.2007 | Cited in | International search | [A]US1986212 (MICHAEL MAHON) [A] 1,2* page 2, column L, line 37 - line 75; figures 1,2 *; | [DA]EP0559077 (FRANKENTHAL AG ALBERT [DE]) [DA] 1,2 * column 2, paragraph 2; figure 3; claim 1 * |