EP1278457 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR DETECTING ABNORMAL SITUATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.09.2006 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 07.01.2009 [2009/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Université de Rennes 1 2, rue du Thabor CS 46510 35065 Rennes / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2003/05] | For all designated states Universite de Rennes 1 2, rue du Thabor, CS 46510 35065 Rennes / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GAGNARDE, Claude 8, rue Gauguin F-56270 Ploemeur / FR | 02 /
THUILLIER, Sandrine 42, rue Helo F-56100 Lorient / FR | 03 /
BILLON, Michel 6, rue Louis Pasteur F-22300 Lannion / FR | 04 /
VALETTE, Michel Poul Ranet F-22560 Trebeurden / FR | 05 /
COSQUER, Philippe Chemin de St-Uzec F-22560 Trebeurden / FR | 06 /
VINESSE, Hélène 2, rue Chemin de Kervouric, Servel F-22300 Lannion / FR | 07 /
LUTZLER, Pierre Ker Lutzler, 99, rue de Chelles F-77360 Vaires sur Marne / FR | 08 /
FARALDI, Odile 8, Rue la Fontaine Freteau 60880 Lemeux / FR | 09 /
L'HER, Henry Chemin de Kerawell F-22730 Tregastel / FR | 10 /
SENTIEYS, Olivier 9, Résidence Kerawell F-22700 Louannec / FR | [2003/25] |
Former [2003/14] | 01 /
GAGNARDE, Claude 8, rue Gauguin F-56270 Ploemeur / FR | ||
02 /
THUILLIER, Sandrine 42, rue Helo F-56100 Lorient / FR | |||
03 /
BILLON, Michel 6, rue Louis Pasteur F-22300 Lannion / FR | |||
04 /
VALETTE, Michel Poul Ranet F-22560 Trebeurden / FR | |||
05 /
COSQUER, Philippe Chemin de St-Uzec F-22560 Trebeurden / FR | |||
06 /
VINESSE, Hélène 2, rue Chemin de Kervouric, Servel F-22300 Lannion / FR | |||
07 /
LUTZLER, Pierre Ker Lutzler, 99, rue de Chelles F-77360 Vaires sur Marne / FR | |||
08 /
FARALDI, Odile 2, Villa Boticelli F-77400 Saint Thibault des Vignes / FR | |||
09 /
L'HER, Henry Chemin de Kerawell F-22730 Tregastel / FR | |||
10 /
SENTIEYS, Olivier 9, Résidence Kerawell F-22700 Louannec / FR | |||
Former [2003/05] | 01 /
GAGNARDE, Claude 8, rue Gauguin F-56270 Ploemeur / FR | ||
02 /
THUILLIER, Sandrine 42, rue Hello F-56100 Lorient / FR | |||
03 /
BILLON, Michel 6, rue Louis Pasteur F-22300 Lannion / FR | |||
04 /
VALETTE, Michel Poul Ranet F-22560 Trebeurden / FR | |||
05 /
COSQUER, Philippe Chemin de St-Uzec F-22560 Trebeurden / FR | |||
06 /
VINESSE, Hélène 2, rue Chemin de Kervouric, Servel F-22300 Lannion / FR | |||
07 /
LUTZLER, Pierre Ker Lutzler, 99, rue de Chelles F-77360 Vaires sur Marne / FR | |||
08 /
FARALDI, Odile 2, Villa Boticelli F-77400 Saint Thibault des Vignes / FR | |||
09 /
L'HER, Henry Chemin de Kerawell F-22730 Tregastel / FR | |||
10 /
SENTIEYS, Olivier 9, Résidence Kerawell F-22700 Louannec / FR | Representative(s) | Vidon, Patrice Cabinet Vidon Technopole Atalante 16B Rue de Jouanet BP 90333 35703 Rennes Cedex 7 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/28] | Vidon, Patrice Cabinet Vidon Technopole Atalante 16B Rue de Jouanet BP 90333 35703 Rennes Cedex 7 / FR | ||
Former [2003/05] | Vidon, Patrice Le Nobel, 2, allée Antoine Becquerel BP 90333 35703 Rennes Cedex 7 / FR | Application number, filing date | 01931805.4 | 04.05.2001 | [2003/05] | WO2001FR01375 | Priority number, date | FR20000005822 | 05.05.2000 Original published format: FR 0005822 | [2003/05] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0185025 | Date: | 15.11.2001 | Language: | FR | [2001/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1278457 | Date: | 29.01.2003 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.11.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1278457 | Date: | 26.10.2005 | Language: | FR | [2005/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.11.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/0205, A61B5/11, G08B21/04 | [2003/05] | CPC: |
G08B29/183 (EP,US);
A61B5/02055 (EP,US);
A61B5/1117 (EP,US);
A61B5/1118 (EP,US);
G08B21/0446 (EP,US);
G08B21/0453 (EP,US);
A61B5/0022 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/05] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR DETEKTION ABNORMALER SITUTATIONEN | [2003/05] | English: | DEVICE AND METHOD FOR DETECTING ABNORMAL SITUATIONS | [2003/05] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCEDE DE DETECTION DE SITUATIONS ANORMALES | [2003/05] | Entry into regional phase | 07.11.2002 | National basic fee paid | 07.11.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.11.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.12.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 07.11.2002 | Examination requested [2003/05] | 12.11.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.08.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.02.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.03.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.09.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.03.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.06.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 13.06.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.07.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2005 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   28.06.2005 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 26.10.2005 | CY | 26.10.2005 | FI | 26.10.2005 | IT | 26.10.2005 | NL | 26.10.2005 | TR | 26.10.2005 | DK | 26.01.2006 | GR | 26.01.2006 | PT | 27.03.2006 | LU | 04.05.2006 | MC | 31.05.2006 | [2009/02] |
Former [2008/37] | AT | 26.10.2005 | |
FI | 26.10.2005 | ||
IT | 26.10.2005 | ||
NL | 26.10.2005 | ||
TR | 26.10.2005 | ||
DK | 26.01.2006 | ||
GR | 26.01.2006 | ||
PT | 27.03.2006 | ||
LU | 04.05.2006 | ||
MC | 31.05.2006 | ||
Former [2007/36] | AT | 26.10.2005 | |
FI | 26.10.2005 | ||
IT | 26.10.2005 | ||
NL | 26.10.2005 | ||
DK | 26.01.2006 | ||
GR | 26.01.2006 | ||
PT | 27.03.2006 | ||
MC | 31.05.2006 | ||
Former [2007/07] | AT | 26.10.2005 | |
FI | 26.10.2005 | ||
NL | 26.10.2005 | ||
DK | 26.01.2006 | ||
GR | 26.01.2006 | ||
PT | 27.03.2006 | ||
MC | 31.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/38] | AT | 26.10.2005 | |
FI | 26.10.2005 | ||
NL | 26.10.2005 | ||
DK | 26.01.2006 | ||
GR | 26.01.2006 | ||
PT | 27.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/34] | AT | 26.10.2005 | |
FI | 26.10.2005 | ||
NL | 26.10.2005 | ||
DK | 26.01.2006 | ||
PT | 27.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/25] | FI | 26.10.2005 | |
NL | 26.10.2005 | ||
PT | 27.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/23] | FI | 26.10.2005 | |
NL | 26.10.2005 | Cited in | International search | [X]US5515858 (MYLLYMAEKI MATTI [FI]) [X] 1-3,10-13,16,21-23 * column 1, line 40 - line 57 * * column 2, line 16 - line 25 * * column 3, line 1 - line 8 * * claim 5 *; | [Y]GB2312309 (WOLMAN RICHARD IAN [GB]) [Y] 17* page 1, line 24 - page 2, line 7 *; | [Y]EP0877346 (SUISSE ELECTRONIQUE MICROTECH [CH]) [Y] 11 * column 3, line 46 - column 4, line 14 *; | [XY]FR2785073 (SARCOS INC [US]) [X] 1,3-7,10,12,15,16,18,21-24 * page 2, line 19 - line 24 * * page 5, line 10 - line 15 * * page 6, line 8 - line 27 * * page 9, line 1 * * page 9, line 23 * * page 10, line 32 - page 11, line 15 * * page 11, line 19 - line 32 * * page 13, line 8 - line 34 * * page 16, line 4 - line 14 * * page 16, line 28 - page 17, line 19 * * page 17, line 10 * * claims 26,27,38 * [Y] 11,17 |