EP1295457 - NETWORK LIBRARY SERVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.12.2005 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.12.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.02.2006 [2006/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SUN MICROSYSTEMS, INC. 4150 Network Circle Santa Clara, California 95054 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2003/17] | For all designated states Sun Microsystems, Inc. 4150 Network Circle Santa Clara, California 95054 / US | ||
Former [2003/13] | For all designated states Sun Microsystems, Inc. 901 San Antonio Road, M/S UPAL 01-521 Palo Alto, California 94303 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BAKER, Christopher 834 Port Walk Place Redwood City, CA 94065 / US | 02 /
MERRIAM, Charles 1447 Flicker Way Sunnyvale, CA 94087 / US | [2003/13] | Representative(s) | Harris, Ian Richard D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/13] | Harris, Ian Richard D. Young & Co., 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | Application number, filing date | 01932861.6 | 01.05.2001 | [2003/13] | WO2001US14114 | Priority number, date | US20000569699 | 11.05.2000 Original published format: US 569699 | [2003/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0186480 | Date: | 15.11.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/46] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1295457 | Date: | 26.03.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.11.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.01.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/08, G06F1/00, G06F17/30 | [2003/13] | CPC: |
G06Q30/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/21] |
Former [2003/13] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ONLINE-BIBLIOTHEKENDIENSTE | [2003/13] | English: | NETWORK LIBRARY SERVICE | [2003/13] | French: | SERVICE DE BIBLIOTHEQUE SUR RESEAU | [2003/13] | Entry into regional phase | 31.10.2002 | National basic fee paid | 31.10.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.10.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.11.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 04.11.2002 | Examination requested [2003/13] | 20.07.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.10.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.03.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.07.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/05] | 30.08.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2006/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]EP0732661 (AT & T CORP) [X] 1,2,5-9,11 * abstract * * column 3, line 27 - column 9, line 14 * [Y] 3,4,10; | [XY]WO9918525 (CAERE CORP ;SULEMAN DANI (US); FERGUSON DAVID R (US); WHITTEMORE G) [X] 1,5-9,11 * abstract * * page 4, line 28 - page 13, line 4 * [Y] 2-4,10; | [Y]WO0022774 (SPRAGGS LYNN ;ULTRA INFORMATION SYSTEMS LLC (US)) [Y] 2-4 * abstract *; | [Y]WO0016221 (MICROSOFT CORP) [Y] 10 * page 3, line 21 - page 4, line 11 * | [XY] - HAKOZAKI K ET AL, "CONCEPTUAL DESIGN OF A VIRTUAL LIBRARY FOR PERSONAL USE", SYSTEMS & COMPUTERS IN JAPAN, SCRIPTA TECHNICA JOURNALS. NEW YORK, US, (199903), vol. 30, no. 3, ISSN 0882-1666, pages 43 - 51, XP000831491 [X] 1,5-9,11 * page 44, column L, line 19 - page 46, column L, line 34; figures 1,2 * [Y] 2-4,10 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/(SICI)1520-684X(199903)30:3<43::AID-SCJ5>3.0.CO;2-1 |