EP1303514 - PROCESS FOR PREPARING AZACYCLOALKANOYLAMINOTHIAZOLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.05.2006 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.02.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 06.03.2013 [2013/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bristol-Myers Squibb Company Route 206 and Province Line Road Princeton, NJ 08543 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2005/29] | For all designated states Bristol-Myers Squibb Company P.O. Box 4000, Lawrenceville-Princeton Road Princeton, NJ 08543-4000 / US | ||
Former [2003/17] | For all designated states Bristol-Myers Squibb Co. P.O. Box 4000, Lawrenceville-Princeton Road Princeton, NJ 08543-4000 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHEN, Bang-Chi 28 Marion Drive Plainsboro, NJ 08536 / US | 02 /
KIM, Kyoung, S. 252 Forest Lane North Brunswick, NJ 08902 / US | 03 /
KIMBALL, S., David 13 Charred Oak Lane East Windsor, NJ 08520 / US | 04 /
MISRA, Raj, N. 12 Eaton Place Hopewell, NJ 08525 / US | 05 /
SALVATI, Mark, E. 9 Tracey Drive Lawrenceville, NJ 08648 / US | 06 /
SUNDEEN, Joseph, E. 1108 Pratt Drive Yardley, PA 19067 / US | 07 /
XIAO, Hai-Yun 173 Jonathan Dayton Court Princeton, NJ 08540 / US | 08 /
ZHAO, Rulin 42 Manley Road Pennington, NJ 08534 / US | [2003/33] |
Former [2003/17] | 01 /
CHEN, Bang-Chi Marion Drive Plainsboro, NJ 08536 / US | ||
02 /
KIM, Kyoung, S. 252 Forest Lane North Brunswick, NJ 08902 / US | |||
03 /
KIMBALL, S., David 13 Charred Oak Lane East Windsor, NJ 08520 / US | |||
04 /
MISRA, Raj, N. 12 Eaton Place Hopewell, NJ 08525 / US | |||
05 /
SALVATI, Mark, E. 9 Tracey Drive Lawrenceville, NJ 08648 / US | |||
06 /
SUNDEEN, Joseph, E. 1108 Pratt Drive Yardley, PA 19067 / US | |||
07 /
XIAO, Hai-Yun 173 Jonathan Dayton Court Princeton, NJ 08540 / US | |||
08 /
ZHAO, Rulin 42 Manley Road Pennington, NJ 08534 / US | Representative(s) | Hubert, Philippe, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2003/17] | Hubert, Philippe, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 01932879.8 | 02.05.2001 | [2003/17] | WO2001US14155 | Priority number, date | US20000616627 | 26.07.2000 Original published format: US 616627 | US20000746060 | 22.12.2000 Original published format: US 746060 | [2003/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0210163 | Date: | 07.02.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1303514 | Date: | 23.04.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.02.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1303514 | Date: | 20.07.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/29] | Type: | B9 Corrected patent specification | No.: | EP1303514 | Date: | 08.11.2006 | [2006/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.02.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C07D417/14, C07D487/18, C07D263/32, // (C07D487/18, 251:00, 251:00), C07D251:00 | [2003/17] | CPC: |
C07D417/12 (EP,US);
C07D417/14 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/427 (EP,US);
A61K31/454 (EP,US);
A61P35/00 (EP);
C07D231/12 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/17] | Extension states | AL | 03.02.2003 | LT | 03.02.2003 | LV | 03.02.2003 | MK | 03.02.2003 | RO | 03.02.2003 | SI | 03.02.2003 | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON AZACYCLOALKANOYLAMINOTHIAZOLEN | [2003/17] | English: | PROCESS FOR PREPARING AZACYCLOALKANOYLAMINOTHIAZOLES | [2003/17] | French: | PROCEDE DE PREPARATION D'AZACYCLOALCANOYLAMINOTHIAZOLES | [2003/17] | Entry into regional phase | 21.01.2003 | National basic fee paid | 21.01.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.01.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.02.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 23.01.2003 | Examination requested [2003/17] | 23.02.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.06.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.11.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.04.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 27.04.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.04.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | |||
Former [2006/51] | TR | 20.07.2005 | Cited in | International search | [DA]WO9924416 (BRISTOL MYERS SQUIBB CO [US]) [DA] 1 * the whole document *; | [PX]US6214852 (KIM KYOUNG S [US], et al) [PX] 1-51 * the whole document, particularly scheme 5 *; | [E]WO0144241 (BRISTOL MYERS SQUIBB CO [US], et al) [E] 1-51 * the whole document *; | [E]WO0144242 (BRISTOL MYERS SQUIBB CO [US], et al) [E] 1-51 * the whole document *; | [E]WO0144217 (BRISTOL MYERS SQUIBB CO [US], et al) [E] 1-51 * the whole document *; | [X] - SCOTT C R ET AL, "The antibacterial activity of a series of quaternaries prepared from hexamethylentetramine and halohydrocarbons", APPLIED MICROBIOLOGY, (1962), vol. 10, pages 211 - 216, XP000655121 [X] 35-37,43 * the whole document, particularly page 213, table 1, 6th entry * | [A] - HALL J H ET AL, "Syntheses and photophysical properties of some 5(2)-aryl-2(5)-(4-pyridyl)oxazoles and related oxadiazoles and furans", JOURNAL OF HETEROCYCLIC CHEMISTRY, (1992), vol. 29, no. 5, pages 1245 - 1273, XP002181697 [A] 1,35,43 * the whole document, particularly page 1247, figure 3, and page 1248, text * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/jhet.5570290534 | [A] - GANELLIN C R ET AL, "Design of a potent non-thiourea H3-receptor histamine antagonist", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, (1995), vol. 38, no. 17, pages 3342 - 3350, XP002074789 [A] 1,38,48 * the whole document, particularly page 3347, scheme 5 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm00017a018 |