EP1287159 - ENZYMATIC TREATMENT OF WHEY PROTEINS FOR THE PRODUCTION OF ANTIHYPERTENSIVE PEPTIDES, THE RESULTING PRODUCTS AND TREATMENT OF HYPERTENSION IN MAMMALS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 07.01.2005 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.01.2005 | Withdrawal of application | published on 23.02.2005 [2005/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DAVISCO Foods International, Inc. Suite 210, 11000 West 78th Street Eden Prairie, MN 55344 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2003/10] | For all designated states Davisco Foods International, Inc. Suite 210, 11000 West 78th Street Eden Prairie, MN 55344 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DAVIS, Martin, E. 415 Lakeview Avenue Tonka Bay, MN 55331 / US | 02 /
RAO, Anand 5057 Edgewater Court Savage, MN 55378 / US | 03 /
GAUTHIER, Sylvie 7330 des Mesanges Charny, Quebec G6X 3P8 / CA | 04 /
POULIOT, Yves 7330 des Mesanges Charny, Quebec G6X 3P8 / CA | 05 /
GOURLEY, Line 1014 2nd Avenue Quebec, Quebec G1L 3C3 / CA | 06 /
ALLAIN, Ann, Françoise 1750, rue du Pont Saint-Lambert de Lauzon Quebec G0S 2W0 / CA | [2003/10] | Representative(s) | Dzieglewska, Hanna Eva, et al Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/10] | Dzieglewska, Hanna Eva, et al Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | Application number, filing date | 01933181.8 | 08.05.2001 | [2003/10] | WO2001US14797 | Priority number, date | US20000567283 | 08.05.2000 Original published format: US 567283 | US20000702068 | 30.10.2000 Original published format: US 702068 | [2003/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0185984 | Date: | 15.11.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1287159 | Date: | 05.03.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.11.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 15.11.2001 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.12.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/34, C12Q1/37, A61P9/12 | [2005/05] | CPC: |
A23J3/343 (EP);
A61K38/556 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P9/12 (EP);
C12P21/06 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2003/10] | C12Q1/34, C12Q1/37 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/10] | Extension states | AL | 06.12.2002 | LT | 06.12.2002 | LV | 06.12.2002 | MK | 06.12.2002 | RO | 06.12.2002 | SI | 06.12.2002 | Title | German: | ENZYMATISCHE BEHANDLUNG VON MOLKEPROTEINEN ZUR PRODUKTION VON BLUTDRUCKSENKENDEN PEPTIDEN, RESULTIERENDE PRODUKTE DARAUS UND BEHANDLUNG VON BLUTDRUCK IN SÄUGERN | [2003/10] | English: | ENZYMATIC TREATMENT OF WHEY PROTEINS FOR THE PRODUCTION OF ANTIHYPERTENSIVE PEPTIDES, THE RESULTING PRODUCTS AND TREATMENT OF HYPERTENSION IN MAMMALS | [2003/10] | French: | TRAITEMENT ENZYMATIQUE DES PROTEINES DE LACTOSERUM PERMETTANT D'OBTENIR DES PEPTIDES ANTI-HYPERTENSION, PRODUITS OBTENUS ET TRAITEMENT DE L'HYPERTENSION CHEZ LES MAMMIFERES | [2003/10] | Entry into regional phase | 06.12.2002 | National basic fee paid | 06.12.2002 | Search fee paid | 06.12.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.12.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.12.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 06.12.2002 | Examination requested [2003/10] | 18.02.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.12.2004 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2005/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH04282400 ; | [X]JPH1033115 ; | [A]EP0671126 (MORINAGA MILK INDUSTRY CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-33 * page 5, line 27 - page 6, line 3 * * page 8, line 48 - line 56 *; | [A]EP0821968 (CALPIS FOOD IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-33 * example 1; claim 1 *; | [A]JPH06345664 | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1992, no. 48, Database accession no. 1992-392238, XP002311023 & JPH04282400 A 19921007 (CALPIS SHOKUHIN KOGYO KK) [X] 1-33 * abstract * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1998, no. 16, Database accession no. 1998-172040, XP002311024 & JPH1033115 A 19980210 (NOCHIKU SANGYO SHINKO JIGYODAN) [X] 1-33 * abstract * | [XD] - ABUBAKAR A ET AL, "Structural analysis of new antihypertensive peptides derived from cheese whey protein by proteinase K digestion.", JOURNAL OF DAIRY SCIENCE. DEC 1998, (199812), vol. 81, no. 12, ISSN 0022-0302, pages 3131 - 3138, XP002937027 [XD] 1-33 * the whole document * | [X] - PIHLANTO-LEPPALA ANNE ET AL, "Angiotensin I converting enzyme inhibitory peptides derived from bovine milk proteins", INTERNATIONAL DAIRY JOURNAL, (199804), vol. 8, no. 4, ISSN 0958-6946, pages 325 - 331, XP000853723 [X] 1-33 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0958-6946(98)00048-X | [X] - MULLALLY MARGARET M ET AL, "Angiotensin-I-converting enzyme inhibitory activities of gastric and pancreatic proteinase digests of whey proteins", INTERNATIONAL DAIRY JOURNAL, (199705), vol. 7, no. 5, ISSN 0958-6946, pages 299 - 303, XP000853725 [X] 1-33 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0958-6946(97)00018-6 | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1995, no. 10, Database accession no. 1995-070230, XP002311025 & JPH06345664 A 19941220 (TOMITA T) [A] 1-33 * abstract * | International search | JPH06345664 [ ] (TOMITA TAKAKO); | JPH04282400 [ ] (CALPIS FOOD IND CO LTD); | JPH04282398 [ ] (CALPIS FOOD IND CO LTD) | [Y] - "Blood pressure inhibitory composition useful for preventing hypertension - includes potassium and caseino:glycopeptide", DERWENT, Database accession no. 1995-070230, XP002944629 | [Y] - "New ACE inhibiting peptide for hypertension treatment and health foods - contain peptide obtd. by trypsin decomposing whey protein", DERWENT, Database accession no. 1992-392238, XP002944630 | [Y] - "New angiotensin converting enzyme-inhibiting peptide - can be used in the treatment of hypertension or as health food", DERWENT, Database accession no. 1992-392237, XP002944631 |