EP1283704 - PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITIONS FOR TRANSDERMAL ADMINISTRATION OF ANTI-INFLAMMATORY AGENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.10.2014 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SANOFI 54, rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | [2013/51] |
Former [2012/18] | For all designated states SANOFI 54 rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2012/17] | For all designated states SANOFI 54, rue de la Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2011/30] | For all designated states SANOFI 174, Avenue de France 75013 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2004/44] | For all designated states Sanofi-Aventis 174, Avenue de France 75013 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2003/08] | For all designated states SANOFI-SYNTHELABO 174, Avenue de France 75013 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ILLEL, Brigitte 91, rue René Clair F-34070 Montpellier / FR | 02 /
VERGNAUD, Jean-Pierre 292, rue du Lavandin F-34070 Montpellier / FR | [2003/08] | Representative(s) | Thouret-Lemaitre, Elisabeth, et al Sanofi Département Brevets 54, rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | [2013/51] |
Former [2003/08] | Thouret-Lemaitre, Elisabeth, et al Sanofi-Synthélabo Service Brevets 174, avenue de France 75013 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 01934105.6 | 11.05.2001 | [2003/08] | WO2001FR01442 | Priority number, date | FR20000006048 | 12.05.2000 Original published format: FR 0006048 | [2003/08] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0185143 | Date: | 15.11.2001 | Language: | FR | [2001/46] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1283704 | Date: | 19.02.2003 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.11.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1283704 | Date: | 18.12.2013 | Language: | FR | [2013/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.05.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/00, A61K31/192 | [2013/27] | CPC: |
A61K9/7015 (EP,US);
A61K31/192 (EP,US);
A61K9/0014 (EP,US);
A61P29/00 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2003/08] | A61K9/70 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/08] | Extension states | AL | 12.12.2002 | LT | 12.12.2002 | LV | 12.12.2002 | MK | 12.12.2002 | RO | 12.12.2002 | SI | 12.12.2002 | Title | German: | PHARMAZEUTISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ZUR TRANSDERMALEN VERABREICHUNG VON ENTZÜNDUNGSHEMMERN | [2003/08] | English: | PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITIONS FOR TRANSDERMAL ADMINISTRATION OF ANTI-INFLAMMATORY AGENTS | [2003/08] | French: | COMPOSITIONS PHARMACEUTIQUES POUR ADMINISTRATION TRANSDERMIQUE D' AGENTS ANTI-INFLAMMATOIRES | [2003/08] | Entry into regional phase | 12.12.2002 | National basic fee paid | 12.12.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.12.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.11.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 12.12.2002 | Examination requested [2003/08] | 16.12.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.06.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.12.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.07.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.07.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.03.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 30.04.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.01.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.07.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.05.2013 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 28.05.2013 | 28.05.2013 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 08.07.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.11.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 07.11.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.12.2003 | Opposition(s) | 19.09.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/48] | Request for further processing for: | 30.04.2007 | Request for further processing filed | 02.05.2007 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 15.05.2007 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 02.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 11.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 08.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 10.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 18.12.2013 | CY | 18.12.2013 | DK | 18.12.2013 | ES | 18.12.2013 | FI | 18.12.2013 | IT | 18.12.2013 | MC | 18.12.2013 | NL | 18.12.2013 | SE | 18.12.2013 | TR | 18.12.2013 | GR | 19.03.2014 | PT | 18.04.2014 | IE | 11.05.2014 | LU | 11.05.2014 | BE | 31.05.2014 | CH | 31.05.2014 | LI | 31.05.2014 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/32] | AT | 18.12.2013 | |
CY | 18.12.2013 | ||
DK | 18.12.2013 | ||
ES | 18.12.2013 | ||
FI | 18.12.2013 | ||
IT | 18.12.2013 | ||
MC | 18.12.2013 | ||
NL | 18.12.2013 | ||
SE | 18.12.2013 | ||
GR | 19.03.2014 | ||
PT | 18.04.2014 | ||
IE | 11.05.2014 | ||
LU | 11.05.2014 | ||
BE | 31.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
Former [2016/29] | AT | 18.12.2013 | |
CY | 18.12.2013 | ||
DK | 18.12.2013 | ||
ES | 18.12.2013 | ||
FI | 18.12.2013 | ||
IT | 18.12.2013 | ||
MC | 18.12.2013 | ||
NL | 18.12.2013 | ||
SE | 18.12.2013 | ||
GR | 19.03.2014 | ||
PT | 18.04.2014 | ||
IE | 11.05.2014 | ||
LU | 11.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 18.12.2013 | |
CY | 18.12.2013 | ||
DK | 18.12.2013 | ||
ES | 18.12.2013 | ||
FI | 18.12.2013 | ||
MC | 18.12.2013 | ||
NL | 18.12.2013 | ||
SE | 18.12.2013 | ||
GR | 19.03.2014 | ||
PT | 18.04.2014 | ||
IE | 11.05.2014 | ||
LU | 11.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
Former [2015/21] | AT | 18.12.2013 | |
CY | 18.12.2013 | ||
DK | 18.12.2013 | ||
ES | 18.12.2013 | ||
FI | 18.12.2013 | ||
MC | 18.12.2013 | ||
NL | 18.12.2013 | ||
SE | 18.12.2013 | ||
PT | 18.04.2014 | ||
IE | 11.05.2014 | ||
LU | 11.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | AT | 18.12.2013 | |
CY | 18.12.2013 | ||
DK | 18.12.2013 | ||
ES | 18.12.2013 | ||
FI | 18.12.2013 | ||
MC | 18.12.2013 | ||
NL | 18.12.2013 | ||
SE | 18.12.2013 | ||
PT | 18.04.2014 | ||
LU | 11.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | AT | 18.12.2013 | |
CY | 18.12.2013 | ||
DK | 18.12.2013 | ||
ES | 18.12.2013 | ||
FI | 18.12.2013 | ||
NL | 18.12.2013 | ||
SE | 18.12.2013 | ||
PT | 18.04.2014 | ||
LU | 11.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
Former [2015/04] | AT | 18.12.2013 | |
CY | 18.12.2013 | ||
DK | 18.12.2013 | ||
ES | 18.12.2013 | ||
FI | 18.12.2013 | ||
NL | 18.12.2013 | ||
SE | 18.12.2013 | ||
PT | 18.04.2014 | ||
LU | 11.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | AT | 18.12.2013 | |
CY | 18.12.2013 | ||
DK | 18.12.2013 | ||
ES | 18.12.2013 | ||
FI | 18.12.2013 | ||
NL | 18.12.2013 | ||
SE | 18.12.2013 | ||
PT | 18.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/39] | AT | 18.12.2013 | |
CY | 18.12.2013 | ||
ES | 18.12.2013 | ||
FI | 18.12.2013 | ||
NL | 18.12.2013 | ||
SE | 18.12.2013 | ||
PT | 18.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | AT | 18.12.2013 | |
CY | 18.12.2013 | ||
ES | 18.12.2013 | ||
FI | 18.12.2013 | ||
SE | 18.12.2013 | ||
PT | 18.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/22] | FI | 18.12.2013 | |
SE | 18.12.2013 | Cited in | International search | JPS59216822 [ ] (TERUMO CORP); | [X]EP0450123 (SAGITTA ARZNEIMITTEL GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,4,6,7,11,12 * page 3, line 27 - line 37 * * page 4 - page 5; example 1 *; | JPH04234314 [ ] (MIKASA SEIYAKU KK); | [X]US5350769 (KASAI SHUICHI [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,4-6,14 * column 3; example 1 *; | [DA]WO9630000 (SANOFI SA [FR], et al) [DA] 1-30 * the whole document *; | [X]WO9939713 (CHONG KUN DANG CORP [KR], et al) [X] 1,4-6,9,11,12,17,18,22 * page 4, line 5 - line 27 * * page 13 - page 15; examples 3-6 *; | [X] - SAITO, HIROSHI ET AL, "Topical gel preparations containing absorption accelerators, and", CHEMABS, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 117:239871 HCA, URL: STN, XP002157095 [X] 1-4,6,7,11,12 * abstract * | [X] - TERUMO CORP., JAPAN, "Film -forming topical formulations", CHEMABS, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 102:137818 HCA, URL: STN, XP002157096 [X] 1,4,6,9 * abstract * | [A] - SANTUS G C ET AL, "TRANSDERMAL ENHANCER PATENT LITERATURE", JOURNAL OF CONTROLLED RELEASE,NL,ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS B.V. AMSTERDAM, (19930527), vol. 25, no. 1 / 02, ISSN 0168-3659, pages 1 - 20, XP000361364 [A] 17-20 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0168-3659(93)90090-R | Examination | WO9909954 |