EP1286651 - USE OF AMINOBENZOIC ACIDS IN COMPOSITIONS WITH PERFUMES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2003/10] | IMPROVEMENTS IN OR RELATING TO PERFUMES | ||
[2006/04] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.06.2007 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 15.10.2008 [2008/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Quest International Services B.V. Huizerstraatweg 28 1411 GP Naarden / NL | [2006/14] |
Former [2003/15] | For all designated states QUEST INTERNATIONAL B.V. Huizerstraatweg 28 1411 GP Naarden / NL | ||
Former [2003/10] | For all designated states QUEST INTERNATIONAL NEDERLAND BV Huizerstraatweg 28 1411 GP Naarden / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BIRKBECK, Anthony Alexander 16 Clifton Crescent Folkestone, Kent CT20 2EP / GB | 02 /
MOULIN, Olivier 24 Harman Avenue Lympne, Kent CT21 4LB / GB | 03 /
NAGEL, Christine 43, rue de Villiers F-92523 Neuilly sur Seine / FR | 04 /
PERRING, Keith Douglas 14 Malvern Road Ashford, Kent TN24 8HS / GB | 05 /
SELL, Charles Stanley Parsonage Farm, Church Lane Aldington, Kent TN25 7EG / GB | 06 /
TUCK, Kathleen Mary 20 Arden Drive, Gore Hill Ashford, Kent TN24 8YD / GB | [2003/10] | Representative(s) | Matthews, Heather Clare, et al Nash Matthews LLP 24 Hills Road Cambridge CB2 1JP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/42] | Matthews, Heather Clare, et al Nash Matthews 90-92 Regent Street Cambridge CB2 1DP / GB | ||
Former [2003/10] | Matthews, Heather Clare, et al Keith W Nash & Co, 90-92 Regent Street Cambridge CB2 1DP / GB | Application number, filing date | 01934190.8 | 01.06.2001 | [2003/10] | WO2001GB02446 | Priority number, date | EP20000304721 | 02.06.2000 Original published format: EP 00304721 | [2003/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0193823 | Date: | 13.12.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1286651 | Date: | 05.03.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.12.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1286651 | Date: | 02.08.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.12.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A61K8/44, A61K8/35, A61Q13/00, C11D3/33, C11D3/30, C11B9/00 | [2006/04] | CPC: |
A61Q13/00 (EP,US);
A61K8/445 (EP,US);
C11D3/30 (EP,US);
C11D3/507 (EP,US);
A61K2800/57 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2003/10] | A61K7/46, C11D3/30, C11D3/33, C11D3/50, C11B9/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, GB, NL [2004/20] |
Former [2003/10] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG VON AMINO BENZOESÄUREN IN ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN MIT DUFTSTOFFEN | [2006/04] | English: | USE OF AMINOBENZOIC ACIDS IN COMPOSITIONS WITH PERFUMES | [2006/04] | French: | UTILISATION DES ACIDES AMINOBENZOIQUES DANS DES COMPOSITIONS AVEC DES PARFUMS | [2006/04] |
Former [2003/10] | VERBESSERUNGEN BEZÜGLICH DUFSTOFFEN | ||
Former [2003/10] | IMPROVEMENTS IN OR RELATING TO PERFUMES | ||
Former [2003/10] | AMELIORATIONS CONCERNANT DES PARFUMS | Entry into regional phase | 29.11.2002 | National basic fee paid | 29.11.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.11.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.11.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 29.11.2002 | Examination requested [2003/10] | 12.07.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.01.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.05.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.07.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.01.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.05.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 15.05.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.05.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 02.08.2006 | [2007/19] | Cited in | International search | [DA]US3330730 (EMIL HERNAADEZ MANUEL) [DA] 1-6 * examples 3,4 *; | [AD]DE1492322 (DOMEKOS DR H DOERING GMBH) [AD] 1-6 * example 1 *; | [Y]US4511495 (MELVILLE JAMES B [GB]) [Y] 1-37 * the whole document *; | [A]US5500138 (BACON DENNIS R [US], et al) [A] 1* abstract *; | [DA]WO9946318 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US], et al) [DA] 1-37 * the whole document *; | [Y]EP0971025 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [Y] 1-37 * abstract * * page 8, paragraph 47 * * page 20, paragraph 118 - page 22, paragraph 129 * * page 23, paragraph 138 *; | [A]EP0971024 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [A] 1-37 * abstract *; | [D]WO0002981 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US], et al); | [DXY]EP1004654 (TAKASAGO PERFUMERY CO LTD [JP], et al) [DX] 1-6,8-16 * abstract * [Y] 7,17-37; | [Y] - ARCTANDER S., PERFUME AND FLAVOR CHEMICALS (AROMA CHEMICALS), US, MONCLAIR, S. ARCTANDER, 01896, XP002174800 [Y] 1-37 * examples 26,,2514,,3070 * |