EP1292320 - USE OF EXTRACTS FROM SPERMATOPHYTE PLANTS WITH IMMUNOMODULATING ACTIVITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2003/12] | EXTRACTS FROM SPERMATOPHYTE PLANTS WITH IMMUNOMODULATING ACTIVITY | ||
[2005/16] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.09.2006 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.04.2016 | Change - lapse in a contracting state | published on 25.05.2016 [2016/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CONSIGLIO NAZIONALE DELLE RICERCHE Piazzale Aldo Moro, 7 I-00100 Roma / IT | For all designated states Istituto Agrario di S. Michele All'Adige Via E. Mach, 2 38010 S. Michele All'Adige / IT | [2005/46] |
Former [2003/12] | For all designated states CONSIGLIO NAZIONALE DELLE RICERCHE Piazzale Aldo Moro, 7 I-00100 Roma / IT | ||
For all designated states Istituto Agrario di S. Michele All'Adige Via E. Mach, 2 38010 S. Michele All'Adige / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RAVAGNAN, Giampietro Via degli Estensi, 291 I-00164 Roma / IT | 02 /
FALCHETTI, Roberto Largo Callifonte, 21 I-00124 Roma / IT | 03 /
LANZILLI, Giulia Via Valmaggia, 60 I-00141 Roma / IT | 04 /
FUGGETTA, Maria, Pia Via V. Fiorini, 9 I-00179 Roma / IT | 05 /
TRICARICO, Maria Via R. Forster, 141 I-00143 Roma / IT | 06 /
MATTIVI, Fulvio Frazione Ricaldo, 44 I-38042 Baselga di Pinè / IT | [2003/12] | Representative(s) | Gervasi, Gemma Notarbartolo & Gervasi S.p.A. Viale Achille Papa, 30 20149 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2003/12] | Gervasi, Gemma, Dr. NOTARBARTOLO & GERVASI Srl, Corso di Porta Vittoria, 9 20122 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 01934247.6 | 29.05.2001 | [2003/12] | WO2001IB00983 | Priority number, date | IT2000RM00294 | 30.05.2000 Original published format: IT RM000294 | [2003/12] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0191764 | Date: | 06.12.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/49] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1292320 | Date: | 19.03.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.12.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1292320 | Date: | 16.11.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.08.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A61P37/04, A61P37/06, A61K35/78 | [2005/25] | CPC: |
A61K45/06 (EP,US);
A61K31/05 (EP,US);
A61K36/18 (EP,US);
A61P37/00 (EP);
A61P37/02 (EP);
A61P37/04 (EP);
A61P37/06 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61K36/18, A61K2300/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2005/23] | A61P37/04, A61P37/06 | ||
Former IPC [2005/22] | A61P37/04, A61P37/06, A61K35/78 | ||
Former IPC [2005/19] | A61P37/04, A61P37/06 | ||
Former IPC [2005/16] | A61K35/78, A61P37/04, A61P37/06 | ||
Former IPC [2003/12] | A61K35/78 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/12] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG VON SPERMATOPHYTE PFLANZENEXTRAKTE MIT IMMUNOMODUELIERENDER WIRKUNG | [2005/16] | English: | USE OF EXTRACTS FROM SPERMATOPHYTE PLANTS WITH IMMUNOMODULATING ACTIVITY | [2005/16] | French: | UTILISATION D'EXTRAITS DE SPERMATOPHYTES COMME MODULATEURS IMMUNITAIRES | [2005/16] |
Former [2003/12] | SPERMATOPHYTE PFLANZENEXTRAKTE MIT IMMUNOMODUELIERENDER WIRKUNG | ||
Former [2003/12] | EXTRACTS FROM SPERMATOPHYTE PLANTS WITH IMMUNOMODULATING ACTIVITY | ||
Former [2003/12] | EXTRACTION DE PRINCIPES ACTIFS PHARMACEUTIQUES DE SPERMATOPHYTES, PRODUITS AINSI OBTENUS, ET UTILISATION MEDICALE COMME MODULATEURS IMMUNITAIRES | Entry into regional phase | 20.12.2002 | Translation filed | 24.12.2002 | National basic fee paid | 24.12.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.12.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.12.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 20.12.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.12.2002 | Examination requested [2003/12] | 21.07.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.01.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.05.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.09.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 20.09.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.08.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | |||
Former [2007/45] | deleted | ||
Former [2007/36] | IT | 16.11.2005 | Cited in | International search | [XY]WO9958119 (PHARMASCIENCE INC [CA]) [X] 21-28,19 * page 11, paragraph 1 - page 14, paragraph 3; claims 14-29 * * page 6, line 20 - line 22 * * example 3 * [Y] 29-38; | [PX]WO0103713 (ACTICHEM [FR], et al) [PX] 1-3,7 * page 2, line 5 - line 10; example 1 *; | [PX]WO0130336 (PHARMASCIENCE [CA], et al) [PX] 21-28,29-31,33-35,38,1-7,15-18,20 * page 11, line 15 - line 16; claims 23-31 * * page 10, line 8 - line 18 * * see in particular claim 18, wherein the skin condition is ... psoriasis" *; | [X] - MATTIVI FULVIO ET AL, "Isolation, characterization, and evolution in red wine vinification of resveratrol monomers.", JOURNAL OF AGRICULTURAL AND FOOD CHEMISTRY, (1995), vol. 43, no. 7, ISSN 0021-8561, pages 1820 - 1823, XP002197355 [X] 1-14,20,21 * p. 1820-21, Materials and Methods *; page 1820, column 1, paragraph L - column 2, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jf00055a013 | [X] - KORHAMMER SIEGFRIED ET AL, "An oligostilbene from Vitis roots.", PHYTOCHEMISTRY (OXFORD), (1995), vol. 38, no. 6, ISSN 0031-9422, pages 1501 - 1504, XP000946048 [X] 1-14,20,21 * page 1502, column 2 - page 1503, column 2 * * see p. 1501, Introduction : e-viniferin, gnetin h, r-viniferin and r-2-viniferin * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0031-9422(94)00811-7 | [X] - TRELA B C ET AL, "RESVERATROL: ISOMERIC MOLAR ABSORPTIVITIES AND STABILITY", JOURNAL OF AGRICULTURAL AND FOOD CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY. WASHINGTON, US, (19960501), vol. 44, no. 5, ISSN 0021-8561, pages 1253 - 1257, XP000583846 [X] 19 * see in particular p. 1254-1255, UV-induced Isomerization and Fig. 5 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jf9504576 | [XY] - OHYAMA MASAYOSHI ET AL, "Antitumor agents 200. Cytotoxicity of naturally occurring resveratrol oligomers and their acetate derivatives.", BIOORGANIC & MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY LETTERS, (19991018), vol. 9, no. 20, ISSN 0960-894X, pages 3057 - 3060, XP002196352 [X] 21 * p. 3057, 2 : amelopsin A, e-viniferin and hopeaphenol *;; table 1 * [Y] 29-38 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0960-894X(99)00520-X | [X] - CHEONG, HO ET AL, "Anti-allergic action of resveratrol and related hydroxystilbenes", PLANTA MED. (1999), 65(3), 266-268, XP001032461 [X] 29-38 * page 267, column 2, paragraph 1 - paragraph 2; figure 1; table 1 * | [X] - GIOVANNINI, L. ET AL, "Pretreatment with resveratrol, a natural compound from grapes and wine, decreases ischemia/reperfusion-induced polymorphonuclear cell infiltration in rat kidney", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF IMMUNOTHERAPY (2000), 16(1/2), 19-26, XP001069872 [X] 31,36 * abstract * * page 25, paragraph L * | [PX] - KIMURA Y ET AL, "Effects of naturally occurring stilbene glucosides from medicinal plants and wine, on tumour growth and lung metastasis in Lewis lung carcinoma-bearing mice.", JOURNAL OF PHARMACY AND PHARMACOLOGY, (2000 OCT) 52 (10) 1287-95., XP001069866 [PX] 29-38 * abstract * * page 1295, paragraph L * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1211/0022357001777270 | [T] - GAO X ET AL, "Immunomodulatory activity of resveratrol: suppression of lymphocyte proliferation, development of cell-mediated cytotoxicity, and cytokine production.", BIOCHEMICAL PHARMACOLOGY, (2001 NOV 1) 62 (9) 1299-308., XP002197358 [T] 29-38 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0006-2952(01)00775-4 | [T] - FALCHETTI R ET AL, "Effects of resveratrol on human immune cell function.", LIFE SCIENCES, (2001 NOV 21) 70 (1) 81-96., XP002197359 [T] 29-38 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0024-3205(01)01367-4 |