EP1286409 - NONAQUEOUS ELECTROLYTIC SOLUTION AND SECONDARY BATTERY CONTAINING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.02.2013 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.02.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.03.2013 [2013/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsubishi Chemical Corporation 1-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8251 / JP | [2012/27] |
Former [2012/15] | For all designated states Mitsubishi Chemical Corporation 14-1, Shiba 4-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0014 / JP | ||
Former [2006/47] | For all designated states Mitsubishi Chemical Corporation 14-1, Shiba 4-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0014 / JP | ||
Former [2004/38] | For all designated states Mitsubishi Chemical Corporation 33-8, Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0014 / JP | ||
Former [2003/09] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI CHEMICAL CORPORATION 5-2 Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-0005 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OKAHARA, Kenji, @Mitsubishi Chemical Corporation Yokohama Res. Center 1000, Kamoshida-cho Aoba-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 227-8502 / JP | 02 /
SHIMA, Noriko, @Mitsubishi Chemical Corporation Tsukuba Res. Center 3-1, Chuo 8-chome Ami-machi Inashiki-gun, Ibaraki 300-0332 / JP | 03 /
SUZUKI, Hitoshi, @Mitsubishi Chemical Corporation Tsukuba Res. Center 3-1, Chuo 8-chome Ami-machi Inashiki-gun, Ibaraki 300-0332 / JP | [2012/15] |
Former [2003/09] | 01 /
OKAHARA, Kenji, Mitsubishi Chemical Corporation Yokohama Res. Center, 1000, Kamoshida-cho, Aoba-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 227-8502 / JP | ||
02 /
SHIMA, Noriko, Mitsubishi Chemical Corporation Tsukuba Res. Center, 3-1, Chuo 8-chome, Ami-machi Inashiki-gun, Ibaraki 300-0332 / JP | |||
03 /
SUZUKI, Hitoshi, Mitsubishi Chemical Corporation Tsukuba Res. Center, 3-1, Chuo 8-chome, Ami-machi Inashiki-gun, Ibaraki 300-0332 / JP | Representative(s) | Henkel & Partner mbB Patentanwaltskanzlei, Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Maximiliansplatz 21 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/15] | Henkel, Breuer & Partner Patentanwälte Maximiliansplatz 21 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [2003/09] | Henkel, Feiler, Hänzel Möhlstrasse 37 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01934354.0 | 25.05.2001 | [2003/09] | WO2001JP04406 | Priority number, date | JP20000155772 | 26.05.2000 Original published format: JP 2000155772 | [2003/09] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0191223 | Date: | 29.11.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1286409 | Date: | 26.02.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.11.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1286409 | Date: | 11.04.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 29.11.2001 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.03.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H01M10/0567, H01M10/0525, C07D307/91, C07D311/86, C07D335/12 | [2011/40] | CPC: |
H01M10/0567 (EP,US);
C07D307/91 (EP,US);
H01M10/0525 (EP,US);
H01M10/4235 (EP,US);
H01M2010/4292 (EP,US);
H01M2300/0037 (EP,US);
H01M4/505 (EP,US);
H01M4/525 (EP,US);
H01M4/587 (EP,US);
Y02E60/10 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2003/09] | H01M10/40, H01M4/62, H01M4/02, C07D307/91, C07D311/86, C07D335/12 | Designated contracting states | DE [2004/20] |
Former [2003/09] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | NICHTWÄSSRIGE ELEKTROLYTISCHE LÖSUNG UND DIESE ENTHALTENDE SEKUNDÄRBATTERIE | [2003/09] | English: | NONAQUEOUS ELECTROLYTIC SOLUTION AND SECONDARY BATTERY CONTAINING THE SAME | [2003/09] | French: | SOLUTION ELECTROLYTIQUE NON AQUEUSE ET BATTERIE SECONDAIRE LA CONTENANT | [2003/09] | Entry into regional phase | 29.01.2002 | Translation filed | 29.01.2002 | National basic fee paid | 29.01.2002 | Search fee paid | 29.01.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.01.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.01.2002 | Examination requested [2003/09] | 28.07.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.12.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.03.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.08.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.11.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.02.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 27.02.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.07.2008 | Opposition(s) | 14.01.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 31.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]JPS6286673 (TOYOTA CENTRAL RES & DEV) [X] 1-7 [Y] 8-11; | [XY]EP0296589 (HITACHI MAXELL [JP]) [X] 1-7 * page 2, line 30 - page 3, line 21 * * page 3, line 48 - page 4, line 43 * * page 4, line 52 - page 5, line 7 * * examples 2,5 * * claims 1,8,10 * [Y] 8-11; | [X]JPS642260 (HITACHI MAXELL) [X] 1-7 * abstract * * page 321 * * page 324 *; | [X]JPS6460959 (HITACHI MAXELL) [X] 1-7 * abstract * * page 294 * * page 297 *; | [X]US5853917 (FAUTEUX DENIS G [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5-11 * column 2, lines 1-16 * * column 3, lines 32-65 * * column 4, lines 25-42 * * column 5, lines 58-67 * * column 6, lines 42-67 * * figures 1,2 *; | [Y]EP0901180 (CIT ALCATEL [FR]) [Y] 8-11* paragraphs [0016] - [0021] - [0028] , [0029] , [0042] - [0048] * | International search | [XP]JP2001015172 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD); | [X]JPS6286673 (TOYOTA CENTRAL RES & DEV); | [Y]JPH10308236 (SONY CORP); | [Y]JPH07235327 (FUJI ELECTROCHEMICAL CO LTD); | [A]JPS5435329 (EXXON RESEARCH ENGINEERING CO); | [A]EP0548660 (ALSTHOM CGE ALCATEL [FR]); | [A]GB2068631 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE); | [A]JPH10112422 (NIPPON CHEMICON); | [A]JPH1074537 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD); | [A]JPS58214281 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE) | by applicant | US5853917 | EP0296589 |