EP1278786 - COPOLYMERS FOR PHOTORESISTS AND PROCESSES THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.11.2006 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.11.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.12.2006 [2006/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company 1007 Market Street Wilmington, DE 19898 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2006/01] | For all designated states E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY 1007 Market Street Wilmington Delaware 19898 / US | ||
Former [2003/05] | For all designated states E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY 1007 Market Street Wilmington Delaware 19898 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WHELAND, Robert, Clayton 510 Twaddell Mill Road Wilmington, DE 19807 / US | 02 /
FRENCH, Roger, Harquail 1516 Athens Road Wilmington, DE 19803 / US | 03 /
SCHADT, Frank, Leonard III 2407 Delaware Avenue Wilmington, DE 19806 / US | 04 /
ZUMSTEG, Frederick, C., Jr. 2715 Silverside Road Wilmington, DE 19810 / US | [2003/05] | Representative(s) | Towler, Philip Dean Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/05] | Towler, Philip Dean Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | Application number, filing date | 01935081.8 | 04.05.2001 | [2003/05] | WO2001US14532 | Priority number, date | US20000202143P | 05.05.2000 Original published format: US 202143 P | [2003/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0185811 | Date: | 15.11.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/46] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1278786 | Date: | 29.01.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.11.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1278786 | Date: | 04.01.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.06.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C08F214/18, C09D127/12, G03F7/039, H01L21/00, C08F220/10, C09D7/00 | [2003/05] | CPC: |
C08F214/186 (EP,US);
G03F7/0046 (EP,US);
G03F7/0048 (EP,US);
G03F7/0382 (EP,US);
G03F7/0392 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2004/20] |
Former [2003/05] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | COPOLYMERE FÜR PHOTORESISTZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG | [2003/05] | English: | COPOLYMERS FOR PHOTORESISTS AND PROCESSES THEREFOR | [2003/05] | French: | COPOLYMERES POUR PHOTORESINES ET PROCEDES AFFERENTS | [2003/05] | Entry into regional phase | 14.10.2002 | National basic fee paid | 14.10.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.10.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.11.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 14.10.2002 | Examination requested [2003/05] | 03.09.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.03.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.07.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.10.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.06.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.07.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.10.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 21.10.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.10.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2409274 (HANFORD WILLIAM E, et al) [A] 24* example IV *; | [X]EP0150725 (DAIKIN IND LTD [JP]) [X] 1,4-10 * page 3, line 5 - page 4, line 20; example - *; | [X]US5880234 (MAEDA KAZUHIKO [JP], et al) [X] 1,4-6,9 * example -; table 1 *; | [A]WO0025178 (DU PONT [US], et al) [A] 1-23 * page 9, line 30 - page 10, line 11; example -; claim - * * page 21, line 20 - page 28, line 11 * |