EP1326504 - CURABLE OFF-LOADING FOOTBED AND METHODS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.06.2005 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.01.2008 [2008/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2004/33] | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | ||
Former [2003/29] | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHUREN, Johannes Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | 02 /
ALLENBERG, Kurt Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | 03 /
CALLINAN, Andrew J. Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [2003/29] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [N/P] | Hilleringmann, Jochen, et al von Kreisler-Selting-Werner Patentanwälte Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | ||
Former [2003/29] | Hilleringmann, Jochen, et al Bahnhofsvorplatz 1, Deichmannhaus 50667 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 01935086.7 | 07.05.2001 | [2003/29] | WO2001US14569 | Priority number, date | US20000693770 | 20.10.2000 Original published format: US 693770 | [2003/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0234080 | Date: | 02.05.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1326504 | Date: | 16.07.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.05.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1326504 | Date: | 11.08.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.05.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A43B7/28 | [2003/29] | CPC: |
A43B7/1425 (EP,US);
A43B7/1435 (EP,US);
A43B7/144 (EP,US);
A43B7/145 (EP,US);
A43B7/1464 (EP,US);
A43B7/147 (EP,US);
A43B7/28 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/29] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HÄRTBARE EINLEGESOHLE ZUM ENTLADEN VON DRUCKPUNKTEN UND VERFAHREN | [2003/29] | English: | CURABLE OFF-LOADING FOOTBED AND METHODS | [2003/29] | French: | SEMELLE POLYMERISABLE A SOULAGEMENT DE POIDS ET PROCEDES | [2003/29] | Entry into regional phase | 19.04.2003 | National basic fee paid | 19.04.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.04.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.05.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 19.04.2003 | Examination requested [2003/29] | 25.02.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.05.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 04.05.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.05.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 11.08.2004 | BE | 11.08.2004 | CH | 11.08.2004 | FI | 11.08.2004 | LI | 11.08.2004 | NL | 11.08.2004 | TR | 11.08.2004 | DK | 11.11.2004 | GR | 11.11.2004 | SE | 11.11.2004 | PT | 11.01.2005 | CY | 07.05.2005 | LU | 07.05.2005 | IE | 09.05.2005 | [2008/03] |
Former [2007/26] | AT | 11.08.2004 | |
BE | 11.08.2004 | ||
CH | 11.08.2004 | ||
FI | 11.08.2004 | ||
LI | 11.08.2004 | ||
NL | 11.08.2004 | ||
TR | 11.08.2004 | ||
DK | 11.11.2004 | ||
GR | 11.11.2004 | ||
SE | 11.11.2004 | ||
CY | 07.05.2005 | ||
LU | 07.05.2005 | ||
IE | 09.05.2005 | ||
Former [2007/20] | AT | 11.08.2004 | |
BE | 11.08.2004 | ||
CH | 11.08.2004 | ||
FI | 11.08.2004 | ||
LI | 11.08.2004 | ||
NL | 11.08.2004 | ||
TR | 11.08.2004 | ||
DK | 11.11.2004 | ||
GR | 11.11.2004 | ||
SE | 11.11.2004 | ||
CY | 07.05.2005 | ||
IE | 09.05.2005 | ||
Former [2006/51] | AT | 11.08.2004 | |
BE | 11.08.2004 | ||
CH | 11.08.2004 | ||
FI | 11.08.2004 | ||
LI | 11.08.2004 | ||
NL | 11.08.2004 | ||
TR | 11.08.2004 | ||
DK | 11.11.2004 | ||
GR | 11.11.2004 | ||
SE | 11.11.2004 | ||
IE | 09.05.2005 | ||
Former [2006/25] | AT | 11.08.2004 | |
BE | 11.08.2004 | ||
CH | 11.08.2004 | ||
FI | 11.08.2004 | ||
LI | 11.08.2004 | ||
NL | 11.08.2004 | ||
DK | 11.11.2004 | ||
GR | 11.11.2004 | ||
SE | 11.11.2004 | ||
IE | 09.05.2005 | ||
Former [2006/23] | AT | 11.08.2004 | |
BE | 11.08.2004 | ||
CH | 11.08.2004 | ||
FI | 11.08.2004 | ||
LI | 11.08.2004 | ||
NL | 11.08.2004 | ||
DK | 11.11.2004 | ||
GR | 11.11.2004 | ||
SE | 11.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/28] | AT | 11.08.2004 | |
BE | 11.08.2004 | ||
CH | 11.08.2004 | ||
FI | 11.08.2004 | ||
LI | 11.08.2004 | ||
DK | 11.11.2004 | ||
GR | 11.11.2004 | ||
SE | 11.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/22] | AT | 11.08.2004 | |
CH | 11.08.2004 | ||
FI | 11.08.2004 | ||
LI | 11.08.2004 | ||
DK | 11.11.2004 | ||
GR | 11.11.2004 | ||
SE | 11.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/21] | AT | 11.08.2004 | |
CH | 11.08.2004 | ||
FI | 11.08.2004 | ||
LI | 11.08.2004 | ||
GR | 11.11.2004 | ||
SE | 11.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/18] | AT | 11.08.2004 | |
FI | 11.08.2004 | ||
GR | 11.11.2004 | ||
SE | 11.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/13] | AT | 11.08.2004 | |
FI | 11.08.2004 | ||
SE | 11.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/11] | FI | 11.08.2004 | |
SE | 11.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/10] | SE | 11.11.2004 | Cited in | International search | [YA]US3834047 (SCHENKER A) [Y] 2 * abstract * [A] 1,7,12; | [XAY]US3895405 (EDWARDS CLYDE A) [X] 1,3,4,6 * column 2, line 64 - column 3, line 44; figure - * [A] 7,12 [Y] 2; | [A]FR2581536 (SPARACCA GUY [FR]) [A] 1,7,12 * abstract *; | [A]EP0592734 (KELLERMAN DAVID [US]) [A] 12 * abstract *; | [A]FR2781651 (MARTO ARTHUR [FR]) [A] 1,7,12 * abstract *; | [DA]WO0025616 (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US]) [DA] 1,7,12* the whole document * | by applicant | US4502479 | US4683877 | US4968542 | US5354259 | US5423735 | US5593628 | US5976610 | US5997492 |