EP1286665 - TREATMENT REGIMEN OF INTRAVENOUS ZOLEDRONATE FOR THE TREATMENT OF BONE METABOLISM DISEASES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2003/10] | USE OF ZOLENDRONATE FOR THE MANUFACTURE OF A MEDICAMENT FOR THE TREATMENT OF BONE METABOLISM DISEASES | ||
[2013/08] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 24.10.2014 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.06.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 06.07.2022 [2022/27] | Applicant(s) | For:BE
CH
CY
DE
DK
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
IE
IT
LI
LU
MC
NL
PT
SE
TR
Novartis AG Lichtstrasse 35 4056 Basel / CH | For:AT
Novartis Pharma GmbH Brunner Strasse 59 1230 Wien / AT | [2013/16] |
Former [2003/11] | For:BE
CH
CY
DE
DK
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
IE
IT
LI
LU
MC
NL
PT
SE
TR
Novartis AG Lichtstrasse 35 4056 Basel / CH | ||
For:AT
Novartis Pharma GmbH Brunner Strasse 59 1230 Wien / AT | |||
Former [2003/10] | For all designated states Novartis AG Lichtstrasse 35 4056 Basel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SEAMAN, John, J. 118 Rolling Hill Court New Hope, PA 18938 / US | 02 /
GALLI, Bruno Liestalerstrasse 28 D 4411 Seltisberg / CH | 03 /
SCHRAN, Horst 17 Junard Drive Morristown, NJ 07960 / US | [2013/10] |
Former [2003/10] | 01 /
SEAMAN, John, J. 118 Rolling Hill Court New Hope, PA 18938 / US | ||
02 /
SIGG, Juergen Karl-Arzet-Weg 25 79540 Loerrach / DE | |||
03 /
SCHRAN, Horst 17 Junard Drive Morristown, NJ 07960 / US | Representative(s) | Kristl, Jernej, et al Novartis Pharma AG Patent Department 4002 Basel / CH | [2013/19] |
Former [2013/03] | Trösch, Dominique, et al Henkel, Breuer & Partner Patentanwälte Erika-Mann-Straße 23 80636 München / DE | ||
Former [2003/10] | Gros, Florent, et al Novartis AG 4002 Basel / CH | Application number, filing date | 01935167.5 | 09.05.2001 | [2003/10] | WO2001US14886 | Priority number, date | GB20000012209 | 19.05.2000 Original published format: GB 0012209 | [2003/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0189494 | Date: | 29.11.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/48] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1286665 | Date: | 05.03.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.11.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1286665 | Date: | 17.04.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.05.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/662, A61K9/08, A61P19/08, A61P35/00, // A61K9/19 | [2013/08] | CPC: |
A61K31/662 (EP);
A61K47/12 (EP);
A61K9/0019 (EP);
A61K9/08 (EP);
A61P19/00 (EP);
A61P19/08 (EP);
A61P3/14 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/04 (EP);
A61K9/19 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2003/10] | A61K31/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/10] | Title | German: | BEHANDLUNGSSCHEMA VON ZOLEDRONAT ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON ERKRANKUNGEN DES KNOCHENMETABOLISMUS | [2013/08] | English: | TREATMENT REGIMEN OF INTRAVENOUS ZOLEDRONATE FOR THE TREATMENT OF BONE METABOLISM DISEASES | [2013/08] | French: | SCHEMA DE TRAITEMENT DU ZOLEDRONATE POUR LES MALADIES DE METABOLISME OSSEUX | [2013/08] |
Former [2003/10] | VERWENDUNG VON ZOLENDRONATE ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES MEDIKAMENTES ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON ERKRANKUNGEN DES KNOCHENMETABOLISMUS | ||
Former [2003/10] | USE OF ZOLENDRONATE FOR THE MANUFACTURE OF A MEDICAMENT FOR THE TREATMENT OF BONE METABOLISM DISEASES | ||
Former [2003/10] | PROCEDE D'ADMINISTRATION D'UN BISPHOSPHONATE | Entry into regional phase | 19.12.2002 | National basic fee paid | 19.12.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.12.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.12.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 11.11.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.12.2002 | Examination requested [2003/10] | 13.11.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.06.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 04.09.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.07.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.01.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.03.2012 | Observations by third parties | 22.09.2012 | Observations by third parties | 10.12.2012 | Observations by third parties | 14.12.2012 | Observations by third parties | 09.01.2013 | Date of oral proceedings | 28.01.2013 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 04.02.2013 | Observations by third parties | 08.02.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.02.2013 | Observations by third parties | 11.02.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 11.02.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.02.2013 | Observations by third parties | 20.02.2013 | Observations by third parties | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.11.2006 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
17.04.2013
23.04.2013
ADMISSIBLE Generics [UK] Limited (trading as Mylan) Albany Gate Darkes Lane Potters Bar Hertfordshire EN6 1AG / GB Opponent's representative Gillard, Richard Edward Elkington and Fife LLP Thavies Inn House 3-4 Holborn Circus London EC1N 2HA / GB | 02
24.04.2013
29.04.2013
ADMISSIBLE Teva Pharmaceutical Industries LTD. 5 Basel Street Petah Tiqva 49131 / IL Opponent's representative Friedrich, Rainer Df-mp Dörries Frank-Molnia & Pohlman Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Fünf Höfe / Theatinerstraße 16 80333 München / DE | 03
03.05.2013
15.05.2013
ADMISSIBLE hameln rds gmbh Langes Feld 13 31789 Hameln / DE | 04
10.05.2013
17.05.2013
ADMISSIBLE Actavis Group Ptc Ehf Reykjavikurvegi 76-78 220 Hafnarfjörour / IS Opponent's representative Alt, Michael Bird & Bird LLP Maximiliansplatz 22 80333 München / DE | 05
15.05.2013
11.06.2013
ADMISSIBLE CHEMI SPA Via dei Lavoratori 54 20092 Cinisello Balsamo, Milano / IT Opponent's representative Longoni, Alessandra AL & Partners Srl Via C. Colombo ang. Via Appiani (Corte del Cotone) 20831 Seregno (MB) / IT | 06
24.06.2013
04.07.2013
ADMISSIBLE Dr. Reddy's Laboratories Ltd. / Betapharm Arznei- mittel GmbH Door 8-2-337, Road No 3, Banjara Hills/ Kobelweg 95 Hyderabad-500034 Andhra Pradesh/86156 Augsburg DE / IN Opponent's representative von Seebach, Malte Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH Jungfernstieg 38 20354 Hamburg / DE | 07
27.06.2013
04.07.2013
ADMISSIBLE medac Gesellschaft für klinische Spezialpräparate mbH Theaterstrasse 6 22880 WEDEL / DE Opponent's representative Uexküll & Stolberg, et al, et al Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Beselerstraße 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | 08
14.08.2013
19.09.2013
ADMISSIBLE Fresenius Kabi Deutschland GmbH Else-Krömer-Strasse 1 61352 Bad Homburg / DE Opponent's representative Fresenius Kabi Deutschland GmbH, et al, et al Patent Department Borkenberg 14 61440 Oberursel / DE | 09
12.09.2013
19.09.2013
ADMISSIBLE Hikma Pharma GmbH Lochhamer Schlag 17 82166 Gräfelfing / DE Opponent's representative Grund, Martin Grund Intellectual Property Group Patentanwälte und Solicitor PartG mbB Steinsdorfstraße 2 80538 München / DE | 10
25.09.2013
01.10.2013
ADMISSIBLE PFIZER LIMITED Ramsgate Road SANDWICH, KENT CT13 9NJ / GB Opponent's representative Pfizer, et al, et al European Patent Department 23-25 avenue du Docteur Lannelongue 75668 Paris Cedex 14 / FR | 11
18.11.2013
26.11.2013
ADMISSIBLE STADA Arzneimittel AG Stadastrasse 2-18 61118 Bad Vilbel / DE Opponent's representative von Seebach, Malte Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH Jungfernstieg 38 20354 Hamburg / DE | 12
30.12.2013
14.01.2014
ADMISSIBLE Genericon Pharma Gesellschaft m.b.H. Hafnerstrasse 211 8054 Graz / AT Opponent's representative Keschmann, Marc Haffner und Keschmann Patentanwälte GmbH Schottengasse 3a 1010 Wien / AT | 13
09.01.2014
22.01.2014
ADMISSIBLE Sanovel IIaç San. ve Tic. A.S. Balabandere Cad. Ilaç Sanayi Yolu No: 14 Istinye-Sariyer 34460 Istanbul / TR Opponent's representative von Uexküll - Güldenband, Alexa Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | 14
14.01.2014
24.01.2014
ADMISSIBLE Accord Healthcare Ltd Sage House 319 Pinner Road North Harrow Middlesex HA1 4HF / GB Opponent's representative Santamaria Gamez, Antoni Accord Healthcare SLU World Trade Center Moll Barcelona s/n Edifici Est, 6th Floor 08039 Barcelona / ES | 15
14.01.2014
24.01.2014
ADMISSIBLE Synthon B.V. Microweg 22 6545 CM Nijmegen / NL Opponent's representative Prins, Hendrik Willem Arnold & Siedsma Bezuidenhoutseweg 57 2594 AC The Hague / NL | 16
16.01.2014
11.02.2014
ADMISSIBLE BIOGARAN 15 Boulevard Charles de Gaulle 92707 Colombes Cedex / FR Opponent's representative Casalonga, et al, et al Casalonga & Partners Bayerstraße 71/73 80335 München / DE | 17
17.01.2014
28.01.2014
ADMISSIBLE Taylor Wessing LLP 5 New Street Square London EC4A 3TW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/09] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
17.04.2013
23.04.2013
ADMISSIBLE Generics [UK] Limited (trading as Mylan) Albany Gate Darkes Lane Potters Bar Hertfordshire EN6 1AG / GB Opponent's representative Gillard, Richard Edward Elkington and Fife LLP Thavies Inn House 3-4 Holborn Circus London EC1N 2HA / GB | ||
02
24.04.2013
29.04.2013
ADMISSIBLE Teva Pharmaceutical Industries LTD. 5 Basel Street Petah Tiqva 49131 / IL Opponent's representative Friedrich, Rainer Df-mp Fünf Höfe Theatinerstraße 16 80333 München / DE | |||
03
03.05.2013
15.05.2013
ADMISSIBLE hameln rds gmbh Langes Feld 13 31789 Hameln / DE | |||
04
10.05.2013
17.05.2013
ADMISSIBLE Actavis Group Ptc Ehf Reykjavikurvegi 76-78 220 Hafnarfjörour / IS Opponent's representative Alt, Michael Bird & Bird LLP Maximiliansplatz 22 80333 München / DE | |||
05
15.05.2013
11.06.2013
ADMISSIBLE CHEMI SPA Via dei Lavoratori 54 20092 Cinisello Balsamo, Milano / IT Opponent's representative Longoni, Alessandra AL & Partners Srl Via C. Colombo ang. Via Appiani (Corte del Cotone) 20831 Seregno (MB) / IT | |||
06
24.06.2013
04.07.2013
ADMISSIBLE Dr. Reddy's Laboratories Ltd. / Betapharm Arznei- mittel GmbH Door 8-2-337, Road No 3, Banjara Hills/ Kobelweg 95 Hyderabad-500034 Andhra Pradesh/86156 Augsburg DE / IN Opponent's representative von Seebach, Malte Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH Jungfernstieg 38 20354 Hamburg / DE | |||
07
27.06.2013
04.07.2013
ADMISSIBLE medac Gesellschaft für klinische Spezialpräparate mbH Theaterstrasse 6 22880 WEDEL / DE Opponent's representative UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG, et al, et al Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | |||
08
14.08.2013
19.09.2013
ADMISSIBLE Fresenius Kabi Deutschland GmbH Else-Krömer-Strasse 1 61352 Bad Homburg / DE Opponent's representative Fresenius Kabi Deutschland GmbH, et al, et al Patent Department Borkenberg 14 61440 Oberursel / DE | |||
09
12.09.2013
19.09.2013
ADMISSIBLE Hikma Pharma GmbH Lochhamer Schlag 17 82166 Gräfelfing / DE Opponent's representative Grund, Martin Grund Intellectual Property Group Postfach 44 05 16 80754 München / DE | |||
10
25.09.2013
01.10.2013
ADMISSIBLE PFIZER LIMITED Ramsgate Road SANDWICH, KENT CT13 9NJ / GB Opponent's representative Pfizer, et al, et al European Patent Department 23-25 avenue du Docteur Lannelongue 75668 Paris Cedex 14 / FR | |||
11
18.11.2013
26.11.2013
ADMISSIBLE STADA Arzneimittel AG Stadastrasse 2-18 61118 Bad Vilbel / DE Opponent's representative von Seebach, Malte Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH Jungfernstieg 38 20354 Hamburg / DE | |||
12
30.12.2013
14.01.2014
ADMISSIBLE Genericon Pharma Gesellschaft m.b.H. Hafnerstrasse 211 8054 Graz / AT Opponent's representative Keschmann, Marc Haffner und Keschmann Patentanwälte GmbH Schottengasse 3a 1010 Wien / AT | |||
13
09.01.2014
22.01.2014
ADMISSIBLE Sanovel IIaç San. ve Tic. A.S. Balabandere Cad. Ilaç Sanayi Yolu No: 14 Istinye-Sariyer 34460 Istanbul / TR Opponent's representative von Uexküll - Güldenband, Alexa Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | |||
14
14.01.2014
ADMISSIBLE Accord Healthcare Ltd Sage House 319 Pinner Road North Harrow Middlesex HA1 4HF / GB Opponent's representative Santamaria Gamez, Antoni Accord Healthcare SLU World Trade Center Moll Barcelona s/n Edifici Est, 6th Floor 08039 Barcelona / ES | |||
15
14.01.2014
ADMISSIBLE Synthon B.V. Microweg 22 6545 CM Nijmegen / NL Opponent's representative Prins, Hendrik Willem Arnold & Siedsma Sweelinckplein 1 2517 GK The Hague / NL | |||
16
16.01.2014
ADMISSIBLE BIOGARAN 15 Boulevard Charles de Gaulle 92707 Colombes Cedex / FR Opponent's representative Casalonga, et al, et al Casalonga & Partners Bayerstraße 71/73 80335 München / DE | |||
17
17.01.2014
ADMISSIBLE Taylor Wessing LLP 5 New Street Square London EC4A 3TW / GB | |||
Former [2014/08] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
17.04.2013
23.04.2013
ADMISSIBLE Generics [UK] Limited (trading as Mylan) Albany Gate Darkes Lane Potters Bar Hertfordshire EN6 1AG / GB Opponent's representative Gillard, Richard Edward Elkington and Fife LLP Thavies Inn House 3-4 Holborn Circus London EC1N 2HA / GB | ||
02
24.04.2013
29.04.2013
ADMISSIBLE Teva Pharmaceutical Industries LTD. 5 Basel Street Petah Tiqva 49131 / IL Opponent's representative Friedrich, Rainer Df-mp Fünf Höfe Theatinerstraße 16 80333 München / DE | |||
03
03.05.2013
15.05.2013
ADMISSIBLE hameln rds gmbh Langes Feld 13 31789 Hameln / DE | |||
04
10.05.2013
17.05.2013
ADMISSIBLE Actavis Group Ptc Ehf Reykjavikurvegi 76-78 220 Hafnarfjörour / IS Opponent's representative Alt, Michael Bird & Bird LLP Maximiliansplatz 22 80333 München / DE | |||
05
15.05.2013
11.06.2013
ADMISSIBLE CHEMI SPA Via dei Lavoratori 54 20092 Cinisello Balsamo, Milano / IT Opponent's representative Longoni, Alessandra AL & Partners Srl Via C. Colombo ang. Via Appiani (Corte del Cotone) 20831 Seregno (MB) / IT | |||
06
24.06.2013
04.07.2013
ADMISSIBLE Dr. Reddy's Laboratories Ltd. / Betapharm Arznei- mittel GmbH Door 8-2-337, Road No 3, Banjara Hills/ Kobelweg 95 Hyderabad-500034 Andhra Pradesh/86156 Augsburg DE / IN Opponent's representative von Seebach, Malte Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH Jungfernstieg 38 20354 Hamburg / DE | |||
07
27.06.2013
04.07.2013
ADMISSIBLE medac Gesellschaft für klinische Spezialpräparate mbH Theaterstrasse 6 22880 WEDEL / DE Opponent's representative UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG, et al, et al Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | |||
08
14.08.2013
19.09.2013
ADMISSIBLE Fresenius Kabi Deutschland GmbH Else-Krömer-Strasse 1 61352 Bad Homburg / DE Opponent's representative Fresenius Kabi Deutschland GmbH, et al, et al Patent Department Borkenberg 14 61440 Oberursel / DE | |||
09
12.09.2013
19.09.2013
ADMISSIBLE Hikma Pharma GmbH Lochhamer Schlag 17 82166 Gräfelfing / DE Opponent's representative Grund, Martin Grund Intellectual Property Group Postfach 44 05 16 80754 München / DE | |||
10
25.09.2013
01.10.2013
ADMISSIBLE PFIZER LIMITED Ramsgate Road SANDWICH, KENT CT13 9NJ / GB Opponent's representative Pfizer, et al, et al European Patent Department 23-25 avenue du Docteur Lannelongue 75668 Paris Cedex 14 / FR | |||
11
18.11.2013
26.11.2013
ADMISSIBLE STADA Arzneimittel AG Stadastrasse 2-18 61118 Bad Vilbel / DE Opponent's representative von Seebach, Malte Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH Jungfernstieg 38 20354 Hamburg / DE | |||
12
30.12.2013
14.01.2014
ADMISSIBLE Genericon Pharma Gesellschaft m.b.H. Hafnerstrasse 211 8054 Graz / AT Opponent's representative Keschmann, Marc Haffner und Keschmann Patentanwälte GmbH Schottengasse 3a 1010 Wien / AT | |||
13
09.01.2014
ADMISSIBLE Sanovel IIaç San. ve Tic. A.S. Balabandere Cad. Ilaç Sanayi Yolu No: 14 Istinye-Sariyer 34460 Istanbul / TR Opponent's representative von Uexküll - Güldenband, Alexa Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | |||
14
14.01.2014
Accord Healthcare Ltd Sage House 319 Pinner Road North Harrow Middlesex HA1 4HF / GB Opponent's representative Santamaria Gamez, Antoni Accord Healthcare SLU World Trade Center Moll Barcelona s/n Edifici Est, 6th Floor 08039 Barcelona / ES | |||
15
14.01.2014
Synthon B.V. Microweg 22 6545 CM Nijmegen / NL Opponent's representative Prins, Hendrik Willem Arnold & Siedsma Sweelinckplein 1 2517 GK The Hague / NL | |||
Former [2013/52] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
17.04.2013
23.04.2013
ADMISSIBLE Generics [UK] Limited (trading as Mylan) Albany Gate Darkes Lane Potters Bar Hertfordshire EN6 1AG / GB Opponent's representative Gillard, Richard Edward Elkington and Fife LLP Thavies Inn House 3-4 Holborn Circus London EC1N 2HA / GB | ||
02
24.04.2013
29.04.2013
ADMISSIBLE Teva Pharmaceutical Industries LTD. 5 Basel Street Petah Tiqva 49131 / IL Opponent's representative Friedrich, Rainer Df-mp Fünf Höfe Theatinerstraße 16 80333 München / DE | |||
03
03.05.2013
15.05.2013
ADMISSIBLE hameln rds gmbh Langes Feld 13 31789 Hameln / DE | |||
04
10.05.2013
17.05.2013
ADMISSIBLE Actavis Group Ptc Ehf Reykjavikurvegi 76-78 220 Hafnarfjörour / IS Opponent's representative Alt, Michael Bird & Bird LLP Pacellistraße 14 80333 München / DE | |||
05
15.05.2013
11.06.2013
ADMISSIBLE CHEMI SPA Via dei Lavoratori 54 20092 Cinisello Balsamo, Milano / IT Opponent's representative Longoni, Alessandra AL & Partners Srl Via C. Colombo ang. Via Appiani (Corte del Cotone) 20831 Seregno (MB) / IT | |||
06
24.06.2013
04.07.2013
ADMISSIBLE Dr. Reddy's Laboratories Ltd. / Betapharm Arznei- mittel GmbH Door 8-2-337, Road No 3, Banjara Hills/ Kobelweg 95 Hyderabad-500034 Andhra Pradesh/86156 Augsburg DE / IN Opponent's representative von Seebach, Malte Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH Jungfernstieg 38 20354 Hamburg / DE | |||
07
27.06.2013
04.07.2013
ADMISSIBLE medac Gesellschaft für klinische Spezialpräparate mbH Theaterstrasse 6 22880 WEDEL / DE Opponent's representative UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG, et al, et al Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | |||
08
14.08.2013
19.09.2013
ADMISSIBLE Fresenius Kabi Deutschland GmbH Else-Krömer-Strasse 1 61352 Bad Homburg / DE Opponent's representative Fresenius Kabi Deutschland GmbH, et al, et al Patent Department Borkenberg 14 61440 Oberursel / DE | |||
09
12.09.2013
19.09.2013
ADMISSIBLE Hikma Pharma GmbH Lochhamer Schlag 17 82166 Gräfelfing / DE Opponent's representative Grund, Martin Grund Intellectual Property Group Postfach 44 05 16 80754 München / DE | |||
10
25.09.2013
01.10.2013
ADMISSIBLE PFIZER LIMITED Ramsgate Road SANDWICH, KENT CT13 9NJ / GB Opponent's representative Pfizer, et al, et al European Patent Department 23-25 avenue du Docteur Lannelongue 75668 Paris Cedex 14 / FR | |||
11
18.11.2013
ADMISSIBLE STADA Arzneimittel AG Stadastrasse 2-18 61118 Bad Vilbel / DE Opponent's representative von Seebach, Malte Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH Jungfernstieg 38 20354 Hamburg / DE | |||
Former [2013/45] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
17.04.2013
23.04.2013
ADMISSIBLE Generics [UK] Limited (trading as Mylan) Albany Gate Darkes Lane Potters Bar Hertfordshire EN6 1AG / GB Opponent's representative Gillard, Richard Edward Elkington and Fife LLP Thavies Inn House 3-4 Holborn Circus London EC1N 2HA / GB | ||
02
24.04.2013
29.04.2013
ADMISSIBLE Teva Pharmaceutical Industries LTD. 5 Basel Street Petah Tiqva 49131 / IL Opponent's representative Friedrich, Rainer Df-mp Fünf Höfe Theatinerstraße 16 80333 München / DE | |||
03
03.05.2013
15.05.2013
ADMISSIBLE hameln rds gmbh Langes Feld 13 31789 Hameln / DE | |||
04
10.05.2013
17.05.2013
ADMISSIBLE Actavis Group Ptc Ehf Reykjavikurvegi 76-78 220 Hafnarfjörour / IS Opponent's representative Alt, Michael Bird & Bird LLP Pacellistraße 14 80333 München / DE | |||
05
15.05.2013
11.06.2013
ADMISSIBLE CHEMI SPA Via dei Lavoratori 54 20092 Cinisello Balsamo, Milano / IT Opponent's representative Longoni, Alessandra AL & Partners Srl Via C. Colombo ang. Via Appiani (Corte del Cotone) 20831 Seregno (MB) / IT | |||
06
24.06.2013
04.07.2013
ADMISSIBLE Dr. Reddy's Laboratories Ltd. / Betapharm Arznei- mittel GmbH Door 8-2-337, Road No 3, Banjara Hills/ Kobelweg 95 Hyderabad-500034 Andhra Pradesh/86156 Augsburg DE / IN Opponent's representative von Seebach, Malte Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH Jungfernstieg 38 20354 Hamburg / DE | |||
07
27.06.2013
04.07.2013
ADMISSIBLE medac Gesellschaft für klinische Spezialpräparate mbH Theaterstrasse 6 22880 WEDEL / DE Opponent's representative UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG, et al, et al Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | |||
08
14.08.2013
19.09.2013
ADMISSIBLE Fresenius Kabi Deutschland GmbH Else-Krömer-Strasse 1 61352 Bad Homburg / DE Opponent's representative Fresenius Kabi Deutschland GmbH, et al, et al Patent Department Borkenberg 14 61440 Oberursel / DE | |||
09
12.09.2013
19.09.2013
ADMISSIBLE Hikma Pharma GmbH Lochhamer Schlag 17 82166 Gräfelfing / DE Opponent's representative Grund, Martin Grund Intellectual Property Group Postfach 44 05 16 80754 München / DE | |||
10
25.09.2013
01.10.2013
ADMISSIBLE PFIZER LIMITED Ramsgate Road SANDWICH, KENT CT13 9NJ / GB Opponent's representative Pfizer, et al, et al European Patent Department 23-25 avenue du Docteur Lannelongue 75668 Paris Cedex 14 / FR | |||
Former [2013/43] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
17.04.2013
23.04.2013
ADMISSIBLE Generics [UK] Limited (trading as Mylan) Albany Gate Darkes Lane Potters Bar Hertfordshire EN6 1AG / GB Opponent's representative Gillard, Richard Edward Elkington and Fife LLP Thavies Inn House 3-4 Holborn Circus London EC1N 2HA / GB | ||
02
24.04.2013
29.04.2013
ADMISSIBLE Teva Pharmaceutical Industries LTD. 5 Basel Street Petah Tiqva 49131 / IL Opponent's representative Friedrich, Rainer Df-mp Fünf Höfe Theatinerstraße 16 80333 München / DE | |||
03
03.05.2013
15.05.2013
ADMISSIBLE hameln rds gmbh Langes Feld 13 31789 Hameln / DE | |||
04
10.05.2013
17.05.2013
ADMISSIBLE Actavis Group Ptc Ehf Reykjavikurvegi 76-78 220 Hafnarfjörour / IS Opponent's representative Alt, Michael Bird & Bird LLP Pacellistraße 14 80333 München / DE | |||
05
15.05.2013
11.06.2013
ADMISSIBLE CHEMI SPA Via dei Lavoratori 54 20092 Cinisello Balsamo, Milano / IT Opponent's representative Longoni, Alessandra AL & Partners Srl Via C. Colombo ang. Via Appiani (Corte del Cotone) 20831 Seregno (MB) / IT | |||
06
24.06.2013
04.07.2013
ADMISSIBLE Dr. Reddy's Laboratories Ltd. / Betapharm Arznei- mittel GmbH Door 8-2-337, Road No 3, Banjara Hills/ Kobelweg 95 Hyderabad-500034 Andhra Pradesh/86156 Augsburg DE / IN Opponent's representative von Seebach, Malte Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH Jungfernstieg 38 20354 Hamburg / DE | |||
07
27.06.2013
04.07.2013
ADMISSIBLE medac Gesellschaft für klinische Spezialpräparate mbH Theaterstrasse 6 22880 WEDEL / DE Opponent's representative UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG, et al, et al Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | |||
08
14.08.2013
19.09.2013
ADMISSIBLE Fresenius Kabi Deutschland GmbH Else-Krömer-Strasse 1 61352 Bad Homburg / DE Opponent's representative Fresenius Kabi Deutschland GmbH, et al, et al Patent Department Borkenberg 14 61440 Oberursel / DE | |||
09
12.09.2013
19.09.2013
ADMISSIBLE Hikma Pharma GmbH Lochhamer Schlag 17 82166 Gräfelfing / DE Opponent's representative Grund, Martin Grund Intellectual Property Group Postfach 44 05 16 80754 München / DE | |||
Former [2013/39] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
17.04.2013
23.04.2013
ADMISSIBLE Generics [UK] Limited (trading as Mylan) Albany Gate Darkes Lane Potters Bar Hertfordshire EN6 1AG / GB Opponent's representative Gillard, Richard Edward Elkington and Fife LLP Thavies Inn House 3-4 Holborn Circus London EC1N 2HA / GB | ||
02
24.04.2013
29.04.2013
ADMISSIBLE Teva Pharmaceutical Industries LTD. 5 Basel Street Petah Tiqva 49131 / IL Opponent's representative Friedrich, Rainer Df-mp Fünf Höfe Theatinerstraße 16 80333 München / DE | |||
03
03.05.2013
15.05.2013
ADMISSIBLE hameln rds gmbh Langes Feld 13 31789 Hameln / DE | |||
04
10.05.2013
17.05.2013
ADMISSIBLE Actavis Group Ptc Ehf Reykjavikurvegi 76-78 220 Hafnarfjörour / IS Opponent's representative Alt, Michael Bird & Bird LLP Pacellistraße 14 80333 München / DE | |||
05
15.05.2013
11.06.2013
ADMISSIBLE CHEMI SPA Via dei Lavoratori 54 20092 Cinisello Balsamo, Milano / IT Opponent's representative Longoni, Alessandra AL & Partners Srl Via C. Colombo ang. Via Appiani (Corte del Cotone) 20831 Seregno (MB) / IT | |||
06
24.06.2013
04.07.2013
ADMISSIBLE Dr. Reddy's Laboratories Ltd. / Betapharm Arznei- mittel GmbH Door 8-2-337, Road No 3, Banjara Hills/ Kobelweg 95 Hyderabad-500034 Andhra Pradesh/86156 Augsburg DE / IN Opponent's representative von Seebach, Malte Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH Jungfernstieg 38 20354 Hamburg / DE | |||
07
27.06.2013
04.07.2013
ADMISSIBLE medac Gesellschaft für klinische Spezialpräparate mbH Theaterstrasse 6 22880 WEDEL / DE Opponent's representative UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG, et al, et al Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | |||
08
14.08.2013
ADMISSIBLE Fresenius Kabi Deutschland GmbH Else-Krömer-Strasse 1 61352 Bad Homburg / DE Opponent's representative Fresenius Kabi Deutschland GmbH, et al, et al Patent Department Borkenberg 14 61440 Oberursel / DE | |||
Former [2013/32] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
17.04.2013
23.04.2013
ADMISSIBLE Generics [UK] Limited (trading as Mylan) Albany Gate Darkes Lane Potters Bar Hertfordshire EN6 1AG / GB Opponent's representative Gillard, Richard Edward Elkington and Fife LLP Thavies Inn House 3-4 Holborn Circus London EC1N 2HA / GB | ||
02
24.04.2013
29.04.2013
ADMISSIBLE Teva Pharmaceutical Industries LTD. 5 Basel Street Petah Tiqva 49131 / IL Opponent's representative Friedrich, Rainer Df-mp Fünf Höfe Theatinerstraße 16 80333 München / DE | |||
03
03.05.2013
15.05.2013
ADMISSIBLE hameln rds gmbh Langes Feld 13 31789 Hameln / DE | |||
04
10.05.2013
17.05.2013
ADMISSIBLE Actavis Group Ptc Ehf Reykjavikurvegi 76-78 220 Hafnarfjörour / IS Opponent's representative Alt, Michael Bird & Bird LLP Pacellistraße 14 80333 München / DE | |||
05
15.05.2013
11.06.2013
ADMISSIBLE CHEMI SPA Via dei Lavoratori 54 20092 Cinisello Balsamo, Milano / IT Opponent's representative Longoni, Alessandra AL & Partners Srl Via C. Colombo ang. Via Appiani (Corte del Cotone) 20831 Seregno (MB) / IT | |||
06
24.06.2013
04.07.2013
ADMISSIBLE Dr. Reddy's Laboratories Ltd. / Betapharm Arznei- mittel GmbH Door 8-2-337, Road No 3, Banjara Hills/ Kobelweg 95 Hyderabad-500034 Andhra Pradesh/86156 Augsburg DE / IN Opponent's representative von Seebach, Malte Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH Jungfernstieg 38 20354 Hamburg / DE | |||
07
27.06.2013
04.07.2013
ADMISSIBLE medac Gesellschaft für klinische Spezialpräparate mbH Theaterstrasse 6 22880 WEDEL / DE Opponent's representative UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG, et al, et al Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | |||
Former [2013/31] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
17.04.2013
23.04.2013
ADMISSIBLE Generics [UK] Limited (trading as Mylan) Albany Gate Darkes Lane Potters Bar Hertfordshire EN6 1AG / GB Opponent's representative Gillard, Richard Edward Elkington and Fife LLP Thavies Inn House 3-4 Holborn Circus London EC1N 2HA / GB | ||
02
24.04.2013
29.04.2013
ADMISSIBLE Teva Pharmaceutical Industries LTD. 5 Basel Street Petah Tiqva 49131 / IL Opponent's representative Friedrich, Rainer Df-mp Fünf Höfe Theatinerstraße 16 80333 München / DE | |||
03
03.05.2013
15.05.2013
ADMISSIBLE hameln rds gmbh Langes Feld 13 31789 Hameln / DE | |||
04
10.05.2013
17.05.2013
ADMISSIBLE Actavis Group Ptc Ehf Reykjavikurvegi 76-78 220 Hafnarfjörour / IS Opponent's representative Alt, Michael Bird & Bird LLP Pacellistraße 14 80333 München / DE | |||
05
15.05.2013
11.06.2013
ADMISSIBLE CHEMI SPA Via dei Lavoratori 54 20092 Cinisello Balsamo, Milano / IT Opponent's representative Longoni, Alessandra AL & Partners Srl Via C. Colombo ang. Via Appiani (Corte del Cotone) 20831 Seregno (MB) / IT | |||
06
24.06.2013
ADMISSIBLE Dr. Reddy's Laboratories Ltd. / Betapharm Arznei- mittel GmbH Door 8-2-337, Road No 3, Banjara Hills/ Kobelweg 95 Hyderabad-500034 Andhra Pradesh/86156 Augsburg DE / IN Opponent's representative von Seebach, Malte Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH Jungfernstieg 38 20354 Hamburg / DE | |||
Former [2013/25] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
17.04.2013
23.04.2013
ADMISSIBLE Generics [UK] Limited (trading as Mylan) Albany Gate Darkes Lane Potters Bar Hertfordshire EN6 1AG / GB Opponent's representative Gillard, Richard Edward Elkington and Fife LLP Thavies Inn House 3-4 Holborn Circus London EC1N 2HA / GB | ||
02
24.04.2013
29.04.2013
ADMISSIBLE Teva Pharmaceutical Industries LTD. 5 Basel Street Petah Tiqva 49131 / IL Opponent's representative Friedrich, Rainer Df-mp Fünf Höfe Theatinerstraße 16 80333 München / DE | |||
03
03.05.2013
15.05.2013
ADMISSIBLE hameln rds gmbh Langes Feld 13 31789 Hameln / DE | |||
04
10.05.2013
Actavis Group Ptc Ehf Reykjavikurvegi 76-78 220 Hafnarfjörour / IS Opponent's representative Alt, Michael Bird & Bird LLP Pacellistraße 14 80333 München / DE | |||
05
15.05.2013
ADMISSIBLE CHEMI SPA Via dei Lavoratori 54 20092 Cinisello Balsamo, Milano / IT Opponent's representative Longoni, Alessandra AL & Partners Srl Via C. Colombo ang. Via Appiani (Corte del Cotone) 20831 Seregno (MB) / IT | |||
Former [2013/24] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
17.04.2013
23.04.2013
ADMISSIBLE Generics [UK] Limited (trading as Mylan) Albany Gate Darkes Lane Potters Bar Hertfordshire EN6 1AG / GB Opponent's representative Gillard, Richard Edward Elkington and Fife LLP Thavies Inn House 3-4 Holborn Circus London EC1N 2HA / GB | ||
02
24.04.2013
29.04.2013
ADMISSIBLE Teva Pharmaceutical Industries LTD. 5 Basel Street Petah Tiqva 49131 / IL Opponent's representative Friedrich, Rainer Df-mp Fünf Höfe Theatinerstraße 16 80333 München / DE | |||
03
03.05.2013
ADMISSIBLE hameln rds gmbh Langes Feld 13 31789 Hameln / DE | |||
Former [2013/22] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
17.04.2013
23.04.2013
ADMISSIBLE Generics [UK] Limited (trading as Mylan) Albany Gate Darkes Lane Potters Bar Hertfordshire EN6 1AG / GB Opponent's representative Gillard, Richard Edward Elkington and Fife LLP Thavies Inn House 3-4 Holborn Circus London EC1N 2HA / GB | ||
02
24.04.2013
ADMISSIBLE Teva Pharmaceutical Industries LTD. 5 Basel Street Petah Tiqva 49131 / IL Opponent's representative Friedrich, Rainer Df-mp Fünf Höfe Theatinerstraße 16 80333 München / DE | |||
Former [2013/21] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
17.04.2013
ADMISSIBLE Generics [UK] Limited (trading as Mylan) Albany Gate Darkes Lane Potters Bar Hertfordshire EN6 1AG / GB Opponent's representative Gillard, Richard Edward Elkington and Fife LLP Thavies Inn House 3-4 Holborn Circus London EC1N 2HA / GB | 04.03.2014 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 07.07.2014 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 17.07.2014 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2014/48] | Request for further processing for: | 04.09.2007 | Request for further processing filed | 04.09.2007 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 18.09.2007 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 02.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 11.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 30.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 17.04.2013 | CY | 17.04.2013 | DK | 17.04.2013 | FI | 17.04.2013 | LI | 17.04.2013 | MC | 17.04.2013 | NL | 17.04.2013 | SE | 17.04.2013 | TR | 17.04.2013 | IE | 09.05.2013 | LU | 09.05.2013 | GB | 17.07.2013 | PT | 19.08.2013 | AT | 09.05.2014 | IT | 09.05.2014 | ES | 10.05.2014 | [2022/27] |
Former [2020/33] | CH | 17.04.2013 | |
CY | 17.04.2013 | ||
DK | 17.04.2013 | ||
FI | 17.04.2013 | ||
LI | 17.04.2013 | ||
MC | 17.04.2013 | ||
NL | 17.04.2013 | ||
SE | 17.04.2013 | ||
IE | 09.05.2013 | ||
LU | 09.05.2013 | ||
GB | 17.07.2013 | ||
PT | 19.08.2013 | ||
AT | 09.05.2014 | ||
IT | 09.05.2014 | ||
ES | 10.05.2014 | ||
Former [2015/34] | CH | 17.04.2013 | |
CY | 17.04.2013 | ||
DK | 17.04.2013 | ||
FI | 17.04.2013 | ||
LI | 17.04.2013 | ||
MC | 17.04.2013 | ||
NL | 17.04.2013 | ||
SE | 17.04.2013 | ||
IE | 09.05.2013 | ||
LU | 09.05.2013 | ||
GB | 17.07.2013 | ||
PT | 19.08.2013 | ||
AT | 09.05.2014 | ||
IT | 09.05.2014 | ||
Former [2015/23] | CH | 17.04.2013 | |
CY | 17.04.2013 | ||
DK | 17.04.2013 | ||
FI | 17.04.2013 | ||
LI | 17.04.2013 | ||
MC | 17.04.2013 | ||
NL | 17.04.2013 | ||
SE | 17.04.2013 | ||
IE | 09.05.2013 | ||
GB | 17.07.2013 | ||
PT | 19.08.2013 | ||
AT | 09.05.2014 | ||
IT | 09.05.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | CH | 17.04.2013 | |
CY | 17.04.2013 | ||
DK | 17.04.2013 | ||
FI | 17.04.2013 | ||
LI | 17.04.2013 | ||
MC | 17.04.2013 | ||
NL | 17.04.2013 | ||
SE | 17.04.2013 | ||
IE | 09.05.2013 | ||
GB | 17.07.2013 | ||
PT | 19.08.2013 | ||
AT | 09.05.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | CH | 17.04.2013 | |
CY | 17.04.2013 | ||
DK | 17.04.2013 | ||
FI | 17.04.2013 | ||
LI | 17.04.2013 | ||
MC | 17.04.2013 | ||
NL | 17.04.2013 | ||
SE | 17.04.2013 | ||
IE | 09.05.2013 | ||
GB | 17.07.2013 | ||
PT | 19.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | CY | 17.04.2013 | |
DK | 17.04.2013 | ||
FI | 17.04.2013 | ||
MC | 17.04.2013 | ||
NL | 17.04.2013 | ||
SE | 17.04.2013 | ||
IE | 09.05.2013 | ||
GB | 17.07.2013 | ||
PT | 19.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | CY | 17.04.2013 | |
DK | 17.04.2013 | ||
FI | 17.04.2013 | ||
MC | 17.04.2013 | ||
NL | 17.04.2013 | ||
SE | 17.04.2013 | ||
IE | 09.05.2013 | ||
PT | 19.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | CY | 17.04.2013 | |
DK | 17.04.2013 | ||
FI | 17.04.2013 | ||
MC | 17.04.2013 | ||
NL | 17.04.2013 | ||
SE | 17.04.2013 | ||
PT | 19.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | CY | 17.04.2013 | |
DK | 17.04.2013 | ||
FI | 17.04.2013 | ||
MC | 17.04.2013 | ||
SE | 17.04.2013 | ||
PT | 19.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | CY | 17.04.2013 | |
FI | 17.04.2013 | ||
MC | 17.04.2013 | ||
SE | 17.04.2013 | ||
PT | 19.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | CY | 17.04.2013 | |
FI | 17.04.2013 | ||
SE | 17.04.2013 | ||
PT | 19.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | FI | 17.04.2013 | |
SE | 17.04.2013 | ||
PT | 19.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | PT | 19.08.2013 | Cited in | International search | [PX] - BERENSON J R ET AL, "A phase I dose-ranging trial of monthly infusions of zoledronic acid for the treatment of osteolytic bone metastases.", CLINICAL CANCER RESEARCH, (2001 MAR) 7 (3) 478-85., XP001036868 [PX] 1-10 * abstract * * page 478, column 2, line 7 * * page 480, column 2, line 5 * | [PXY] - BERENSON JAMES R ET AL, "Zoledronic acid reduces skeletal-related events in patients with osteolytic metastases: A double-blind, randomized dose-response study.", CANCER, (20010401), vol. 91, no. 7, ISSN 0008-543X, pages 1191 - 1200, XP001036871 [PX] 1-5 * abstract * * page 1191, column 2, line 37 * * page 1192, column 2, lines 45,46 * [Y] 6-10 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/1097-0142(20010401)91:7<1191::AID-CNCR1119>3.0.CO;2-0 | [XY] - BODY J J, "Clinical research update: Zoledronate.", CANCER, (1997), vol. 80, no. 8 SUPPL., ISSN 0008-543X, pages 1699 - 1701, XP001037214 [X] 1-10 * abstract * * page 1700, column 2, line 2 * * page 1701, column 1, line 23 * * page 1701, column 2, lines 22-29 * [Y] 6-10 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/(SICI)1097-0142(19971015)80:8+<1699::AID-CNCR23>3.0.CO;2-U | [XY] - LIPTON A ET AL, "Phase II trial of zoledronate vs. pamidronate in multiple myeloma and breast cancer.", CANCER INVESTIGATION., XVII Symposium of the Chemotherapy Foundation: Innovative Cancer Therapy for Tomorrow.;New York, NY, USA; November 03-06, 1999, (2000), vol. 18, no. SUPPL. 1, ISSN 0735-7907, pages 68 - 69, XP001036876 [X] 1,2,4,5 * abstract * [Y] 6-10 | [Y] - BUCKLER H ET AL, "Single infusion of zoledronate in Paget's disease of bone: A placebo-controlled, dose-ranging study.", BONE (NEW YORK), International Symposium of the 25th Anniversary of the National Association for the Relief of Paget's Disease;Oxford, England, UK; July 15-17, 1998, (199905), vol. 24, no. 5 SUPPL., ISSN 8756-3282, pages 81S - 85S, XP001036896 [Y] 6-10 * page 82S, column 1, line 18 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S8756-3282(99)00071-X | Examination | - Publication of Swiss marketing approval for Zometa® 4 mg, Lyophilisat in the IKS Monatsbericht 11/2000 | - Summary of Product Characteristics for Zometa® by Novartis | - Product monograph for Zoledronate Disodium (Zometa) in Drugs of the Future, March 2000, 25(3), 259-268 | - GREEN J R ET AL, "Renal tolerability profile of novel, potent bisphosphonates in two short-term rat models.", PHARMACOLOGY & TOXICOLOGY MAY 1997, (199705), vol. 80, no. 5, ISSN 0901-9928, pages 225 - 230 | - KANIS J A ET AL, "Effects of intravenous etidronate disodium on skeletal and calcium metabolism.", THE AMERICAN JOURNAL OF MEDICINE 23 FEB 1987, (19870223), vol. 82, no. 2A, ISSN 0002-9343, pages 55 - 70 | - MIAN M ET AL, "Tolerability and safety of clodronate therapy in bone diseases.", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF CLINICAL PHARMACOLOGY RESEARCH 1991, (1991), vol. 11, no. 2, ISSN 0251-1649, pages 107 - 114 | - MAJOR P ET AL, "Zoledronic acid is superior to pamidronate in the treatment of hypercalcemia of malignancy: a pooled analysis of two randomized, controlled clinical trials.", JOURNAL OF CLINICAL ONCOLOGY : OFFICIAL JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN SOCIETY OF CLINICAL ONCOLOGY 15 JAN 2001, (20010115), vol. 19, no. 2, ISSN 0732-183X, pages 558 - 567 | - NAKASHIMA L., "Guidelines for the treatment of hypercalcemiaassociated with malignancy", J. ONCOL. PHARM. PRACTICE, (1997), vol. 3, no. 1, pages 31 - 37 | - Affidavit of Dr. Horst Schran filed with the USPTO in 24.04.2006 during the prosecution of the equivalent US patent application US2004/0014724-A1 | - Berenson et al; Population pharmacokinetics (PK) of Zometa, 2000, Proceedings of ASCO, Vol. 19, Clinical Pharmacology, 209a, No. 814 | - BERENSON J R, "Zoledronic acid in cancer patients with bone metastases: results of Phase I and II trials.", SEMINARS IN ONCOLOGY APR 2001, (200104), vol. 28, no. 2 Suppl 6, ISSN 0093-7754, pages 25 - 34 | - Fleisch; Bisphosphonates in bone disease, 1997, third edition, p.152. | - ROSEN LEE S ET AL, "Long-term efficacy and safety of zoledronic acid compared with pamidronate disodium in the treatment of skeletal complications in patients with advanced multiple myeloma or breast carcinoma: a randomized, double-blind, multicenter, comparative trial.", CANCER 15 OCT 2003, (20031015), vol. 98, no. 8, ISSN 0008-543X, pages 1735 - 1744 | other | US2004014724 | - GREEN J.R. ET AL, "RENAL TOLERABILITY PROFILE OF NOVEL, POTENT BISPHOSPHONATES IN TWO SHORT-TERM RAT MODELS", PHARMACOLOGY AND TOXICOLOGY, (19970101), vol. 80, no. 5, pages 225 - 230, XP001036879 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1600-0773.1997.tb01964.x | - ANONYMOUS, "Summary of Product Characteristics for Zometa(R)", NOVARTIS, (200005), pages 1 - 3, XP003026145 | - SORBERA L.A. ET AL, "ZOLEDRONATE DISODIUM TREATMENT OF TUMOR-INDUCED HYPERCALCEMIA ANGIOGENESIS INHIBITOR", DRUGS OF THE FUTURE, (200003), vol. 25, no. 3, pages 259 - 268, XP008010716 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1358/dof.2000.025.03.569207 | - KANIS J.A. ET AL, "Effects of intravenous etidronate disodium on skeletal and calcium metabolism", AMER. J. MED. SUPPL. 2A, (19870223), vol. 82, pages 55 - 70, XP023305069 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0002-9343(87)90488-8 | - MIAN M. ET AL, "Tolerability and safety of clodronate therapy in bone diseases.", INT. J. CLIN. PHARM. RES., (1991), vol. XI, no. 2, pages 107 - 114, XP003029281 | - BERENSON J.R. ET AL, "A PHASE I DOSE-RANGING TRIAL OF MONTHLY INFUSIONS OF ZOLEDRONIC ACID FOR THE TREATMENT OF OSTEOLYTIC BONE METASTASES", CLIN. CANCER RES., (200103), vol. 7, pages 478 - 485, XP001036868 | - BERENSON J.R. ET AL, "ZOLEDRONIC ACID REDUCES SKELETAL-RELATED EVENTS IN PATIENTS WITH OSTEOLYTIC METASTASES: A DOUBLE-BLIND, RANDOMIZED DOSE-RESPONSE STUDY", CANCER, (20010401), vol. 91, no. 7, pages 1191 - 1200, XP001036871 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/1097-0142(20010401)91:7<1191::AID-CNCR1119>3.0.CO;2-0 | - BODY J.J., "CLINICAL RESEARCH UPDATE: ZOLEDRONATE", CANCER SUPPL, (19971015), vol. 80, no. 8, pages 1699 - 1701, XP001148496 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/(SICI)1097-0142(19971015)80:8+<1699::AID-CNCR23>3.0.CO;2-U | - LIPTON A. ET AL, "PHASE II TRIAL OF ZOLEDRONATE VS. PAMIDRONATE IN MULTIPLE MYELOMA AND BREAST CANCER.", CANCER INVESTIGATION, SUPPL. 1, (2000), vol. 18, pages 68 - 69, XP001036876 | - BUCKLER H. ET AL, "SINGLE INFUSION OF ZOLEDRONATE IN PAGET'S DISEASE OF BONE: A PLACEBO-CONTROLLED,DOSE-RANGING STUDY", BONE, SUPPLEMENT, (1999), vol. 24, no. 5, pages 81S - 85S, XP001026721 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S8756-3282(99)00071-X | - MAJOR P. ET AL, "ZOLEDRONIC ACID IS SUPERIOR TO PAMIDRONATE IN THE TREATMENT OF HYPERCALCEMIA OF MALIGNANCY: A POOLED ANALYSIS OF TWO RANDOMIZED, CONTROLLED CLINICAL TRIALS", JOURNAL OF CLINICAL ONCOLOGY, (20010115), vol. 19, no. 2, pages 558 - 567, XP001034173 | - NAKASHIMA L., "Guidelines for the treatment of hypercalcemia associated with malignancy", J. ONCOL. PHARM. PRACTICE, (1997), vol. 3, no. 1, pages 31 - 37, XP003029282 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1177/107815529700300105 | - BERENSON J.R. ET AL, "Population pharmacokinetics (PK) of Zometa (abstr.nr. 814)", PROCEEDINGS OF ASCO, (20000520), vol. 19, page 209, XP003029283 | - BERENSON J.R., "Zoledronic acid in cancer patients with bone metastases: Results of phase I and II trials.", SEMINARS IN ONCOLOGY, SUPPL. 6, (200104), vol. 28, no. 2, pages 25 - 34, XP003029284 | - FLEISCH ET AL, BISPHOSPHONATES IN BONE DISEASE, THIRD EDITION, (1997), page 152, XP003029285 | - ADAMI S. ET AL, "Chronic intravenous aminobisphosphonate therapy increases high-density lipoprotein cholesterol and decreases low-density lipoprotein cholesterol", J. BONE MINER. RES., (2000), vol. 15, no. 3, pages 599 - 604, XP003029620 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1359/jbmr.2000.15.3.599 | - ADAMI S. ET AL, "diverse effects of bisphosphonates. A comparative review.", DRUG SAF., (199603), vol. 14, no. 3, pages 158 - 170, XP003029621 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.2165/00002018-199614030-00003 | - FLEISCH H.A., "BISPHOSPHONATES: PRECLINICAL ASPECTS AND USE IN OSTEOPOROSIS", ANN. MED., (1997), vol. 29, pages 55 - 62, XP000904875 | - ZOMETA, FDA CLINICAL BRIEFING DOCUMENT FOR THE ONCOLOGIC DRUGS ADVISORY COMMITTEE, pages 1 - 3, 14, XP003029622 | - OFFICIAL JOURNAL OF THE EUROPEAN COMMUNITIES., (20010427), pages C 127/2 - C 127/6, XP003029623 | - ZOMETA., SUMMARY OF PRODUCT CHARACTERISTICS, (200103), pages 1 - 42, XP003029624 | - "I.V. therapy", LEWIS J.A., ILLUSTRATED MANUAL of NURSING PRACTICE, Second Edition, pages 99 - 117, XP003029625 | - "Infusion Devices", MALLETT J. ET AL, The Royal Marsden Hospital Manual of Clinical Nursing Procedures, Fifth Edition, (2000), pages 319 - 333, XP003029626 |