EP1284789 - Apparatus to prevent infections [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2003/09] | METHOD AND APPARATUS TO PREVENT INFECTIONS | ||
[2005/10] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.06.2006 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Crossley, Kent 1245 Delaware Avenue St. Paul, MN 55118 / US | [2003/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2003/09] | Representative(s) | Rupprecht, Kay, et al Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/09] | Rupprecht, Kay, Dipl.-Ing., et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01935536.1 | 16.05.2001 | [2003/09] | WO2001US15697 | Priority number, date | US20000572999 | 17.05.2000 Original published format: US 572999 | US20010812519 | 20.03.2001 Original published format: US 812519 | [2003/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0187416 | Date: | 22.11.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1284789 | Date: | 26.02.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.11.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1284789 | Date: | 03.08.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.11.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A61N5/06 | [2003/09] | CPC: |
A61N5/062 (EP,US);
A61N5/0601 (EP,US);
A61B2018/2261 (EP,US);
A61N2005/0607 (EP,US);
A61N2005/061 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/09] | Extension states | AL | 12.12.2002 | LT | 12.12.2002 | LV | 12.12.2002 | MK | 12.12.2002 | RO | 12.12.2002 | SI | 12.12.2002 | Title | German: | Apparat zur Verhütung von Infektionen | [2005/10] | English: | Apparatus to prevent infections | [2005/10] | French: | Dispositif servant à empêcher des infections | [2005/10] |
Former [2003/09] | VERFAHREN UND APPARAT ZUR VERHÜTUNG VON INFEKTIONEN | ||
Former [2003/09] | METHOD AND APPARATUS TO PREVENT INFECTIONS | ||
Former [2003/09] | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF SERVANT A EMPECHER DES INFECTIONS | Entry into regional phase | 12.12.2002 | National basic fee paid | 12.12.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.12.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.12.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 12.12.2002 | Examination requested [2003/09] | 02.03.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.05.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.12.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01) | 17.01.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.01.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.06.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 01.06.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.05.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2005 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   03.06.2005 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 03.08.2005 | BE | 03.08.2005 | CY | 03.08.2005 | FI | 03.08.2005 | TR | 03.08.2005 | DK | 03.11.2005 | GR | 03.11.2005 | SE | 03.11.2005 | PT | 03.01.2006 | [2015/21] |
Former [2009/02] | AT | 03.08.2005 | |
BE | 03.08.2005 | ||
CY | 03.08.2005 | ||
FI | 03.08.2005 | ||
TR | 03.08.2005 | ||
DK | 03.11.2005 | ||
GR | 03.11.2005 | ||
SE | 03.11.2005 | ||
PT | 03.01.2006 | ||
Former [2006/51] | AT | 03.08.2005 | |
BE | 03.08.2005 | ||
FI | 03.08.2005 | ||
LI | 03.08.2005 | ||
TR | 03.08.2005 | ||
DK | 03.11.2005 | ||
GR | 03.11.2005 | ||
SE | 03.11.2005 | ||
PT | 03.01.2006 | ||
Former [2006/33] | AT | 03.08.2005 | |
BE | 03.08.2005 | ||
FI | 03.08.2005 | ||
LI | 03.08.2005 | ||
DK | 03.11.2005 | ||
GR | 03.11.2005 | ||
SE | 03.11.2005 | ||
PT | 03.01.2006 | ||
Former [2006/26] | AT | 03.08.2005 | |
BE | 03.08.2005 | ||
CH | 03.08.2005 | ||
FI | 03.08.2005 | ||
LI | 03.08.2005 | ||
DK | 03.11.2005 | ||
GR | 03.11.2005 | ||
SE | 03.11.2005 | ||
PT | 03.01.2006 | ||
Former [2006/25] | AT | 03.08.2005 | |
BE | 03.08.2005 | ||
CH | 03.08.2005 | ||
FI | 03.08.2005 | ||
LI | 03.08.2005 | ||
GR | 03.11.2005 | ||
SE | 03.11.2005 | ||
PT | 03.01.2006 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 03.08.2005 | |
CH | 03.08.2005 | ||
FI | 03.08.2005 | ||
LI | 03.08.2005 | ||
GR | 03.11.2005 | ||
SE | 03.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 03.08.2005 | |
FI | 03.08.2005 | ||
SE | 03.11.2005 | Cited in | International search | [X]DE3023130 (BLUECHER HUBERT, et al) [X] 61,62 * the whole document *; | [A]US5478339 (TADIR YONA [US], et al) [A] 1,25,37,61 * column 5, line 3 - line 12; figure 1 * * column 5, line 48 - line 61 ** column 6, line 36 - line 54 *; | [XA]WO9607451 (RARE EARTH MED INC [US], et al) [X] 37-39,44,46-55,61,62 * page 7, line 1 - line 32 * * page 19, line 37 - page 21, line 5; figures 23-25 * [A] 1,25,56; | [X]WO9623543 (ANGIOMEDICS II INC [US]) [X] 1-5,8,10-16,18,19,21,22,25-29,32,61,62 * page 4, line 4 - line 13 * * page 6, line 1 - line 12 * * page 7, line 20 - page 8, line 5; figure 1 *; | [X]WO9806456 (LIGHT SCIENCES LP [US]) [X] 25-27,32,61,62 * page 6, line 13 - page 7, line 11; figures 5A,5B *; | [A]US5947958 (WOODARD ROBERT E [US], et al) [A] 1,25,37,61 * column 3, line 65 - column 4, line 15; figure 3 * * column 6, line 23 - line 37 * | Examination | US5458595 |