EP1284787 - ADAPTIVE STIMULATOR FOR RELIEF OF SYMPTOMS OF NEUROLOGICAL DISORDERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 14.12.2007 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2007 | Withdrawal of application | published on 16.01.2008 [2008/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lockheed Martin Corporation 9500 Godwin Drive Manassas, VA 20110-4122 / US | [2003/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GESOTTI, Phillip, E. 12531 Brenmill Lane Manassa, VA 20112 / US | [2005/04] |
Former [2003/09] | 01 /
GESOTTI, Phillip, E. 8335 Shady Grove Circle Manassas, VA 20110 / US | Representative(s) | Whiting, Gary, et al Abel & Imray 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/50] | Whiting, Gary, et al Abel & Imray, 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PQ / GB | ||
Former [2003/09] | Bardo, Julian Eason, et al Abel & Imray 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 01935558.5 | 15.05.2001 | [2003/09] | WO2001US15735 | Priority number, date | US20000204404P | 16.05.2000 Original published format: US 204404 P | US20000659351 | 12.09.2000 Original published format: US 659351 | [2003/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0187411 | Date: | 22.11.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/47] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1284787 | Date: | 26.02.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.11.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.03.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A61N1/36 | [2003/09] | CPC: |
A61N1/36003 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/09] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ADAPTIERENDER STIMULATOR ZUR VERMINDERUNG VON SYMPTOMEN NEUROLOGISCHER STÖRUNGEN | [2003/09] | English: | ADAPTIVE STIMULATOR FOR RELIEF OF SYMPTOMS OF NEUROLOGICAL DISORDERS | [2003/09] | French: | STIMULATEUR ADAPTATIF POUVANT SOULAGER DES SYMPTOMES DE TROUBLES NEUROLOGIQUES | [2003/09] | Entry into regional phase | 11.12.2002 | National basic fee paid | 11.12.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.12.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.12.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 11.12.2002 | Examination requested [2003/09] | 06.02.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.12.2007 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2008/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]WO9739796 (MEDTRONIC INC [US]) [X] 1-8,10,15-19,35-41,46-50,52-54 * the whole document * [Y] 43; | [X]EP0911061 (NEUROPACE INC [US]) [X] 1-8,11-15,17,19,35-40,46,52-54 * the whole document *; | [X]WO9739795 (MEDTRONIC INC [US]) [X] 1-8,11-15,17-19,35-40,46,52-54 * the whole document *; | [Y]WO9012293 (COMBY BRUNO [FR], et al) [Y] 43 * the whole document * |