EP1384101 - ARRANGEMENT FOR MULTIPLEXING AND/OR DEMULTIPLEXING THE SIGNALS OF AT LEAST TWO OPTICAL WAVELENGTH CHANNELS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.12.2007 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 29.10.2008 [2008/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Finisar Corporation 1308 Moffett Park Drive Sunnyvale, CA 94089 / US | [2007/08] |
Former [2006/40] | For all designated states FINISAR CORPORATION 1308 Moffett Park Drive Sunnyvale, CA 94089 / US | ||
Former [2004/05] | For all designated states Infineon Technologies AG St.-Martin-Strasse 53 81669 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ALBRECHT, Helmut Wessobrunner Platz 9a 81377 München / DE | 02 /
BAUMANN, Ingo Lindenstrasse 24E 85604 Zorneding / DE | 03 /
HEISE, Gerhard Bajnworenweg 16 85579 Neubiberg / DE | 04 /
GAO, Zhan Ludwig-Erhard-Allee 18 81739 München / DE | [2004/05] | Representative(s) | Müller, Wolfram Hubertus, et al Patentanwälte Maikowski & Ninnemann Postfach 15 09 20 10671 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/44] | Müller, Wolfram Hubertus, et al Patentanwälte Maikowski & Ninnemann Postfach 15 09 20 10671 Berlin / DE | ||
Former [2006/40] | Müller, Wolfram Hubertus, et al Patentanwälte Maikowski & Ninnemann, Postfach 15 09 20 10671 Berlin / DE | ||
Former [2004/05] | Müller, Wolfram Hubertus, Dipl.-Phys., et al Patentanwälte Maikowski & Ninnemann, Postfach 15 09 20 10671 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 01936031.2 | 30.04.2001 | [2004/05] | WO2001DE01670 | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02088808 | Date: | 07.11.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1384101 | Date: | 28.01.2004 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.11.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1384101 | Date: | 21.02.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.11.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G02B6/34 | [2004/05] | CPC: |
G02B6/12016 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2007/08] |
Former [2004/05] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | ANORDNUNG ZUM MULTIPLEXEN UND/ODER DEMULTIPLEXEN DER SIGNALE MINDESTENS ZWEIER OPTISCHER WELLENLÄNGENKANÄLE | [2004/05] | English: | ARRANGEMENT FOR MULTIPLEXING AND/OR DEMULTIPLEXING THE SIGNALS OF AT LEAST TWO OPTICAL WAVELENGTH CHANNELS | [2004/05] | French: | SYSTEME POUR MULTIPLEXER ET/OU DEMULTIPLEXER LES SIGNAUX D'AU MOINS DEUX CANAUX DE LONGUEURS D'ONDE OPTIQUES | [2004/05] | Entry into regional phase | 17.11.2003 | National basic fee paid | 17.11.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.11.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.11.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 17.11.2003 | Examination requested [2004/05] | 28.01.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.05.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.02.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.06.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.06.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.10.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 23.10.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.11.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2003 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   13.01.2004 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DA]US5412744 (DRAGONE CORRADO [US]) [DA] 1 * column A; figures 1-14 *; | [DA]US5732171 (MICHEL HERBERT [DE], et al) [DA] 1 * abstract *; | [DA]DE19815404 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [DA] 1* column A; figures 1-7 *; | [DA] - SOOLE J B D ET AL, "USE OF MULTIMODE INTERFERENCE COUPLERS TO BROADEN THE PASSBAND OF WAVELENGTH-DISPERSIVE INTEGRATED WDM FILTERS", IEEE PHOTONICS TECHNOLOGY LETTERS, IEEE INC. NEW YORK, US, (19961001), vol. 8, no. 10, ISSN 1041-1135, pages 1340 - 1342, XP000628952 [DA] 1 * column A; figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/68.536648 | Examination | FR2742882 | - OKAMOTO K.; SUGITA A., "Flat spectral response arrayed-waveguide grating multiplexer with parabolic waveguide horns", ELECTRONICS LETTERS, (19960829), vol. 32, no. 18, pages 1661 - 1662, XP006005618 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1049/el:19961108 |