EP1267846 - TRANSDERMAL THERAPEUTIC SYSTEM FOR THE DELIVERY OF LERISETRON [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.09.2006 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 07.01.2009 [2009/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LTS LOHMANN Therapie-Systeme AG Lohmannstrasse 2 56626 Andernach / DE | [2005/47] |
Former [2003/01] | For all designated states LTS Lohmann Therapie-Systeme AG Lohmannstrasse 2 56626 Andernach / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SELZER, Torsten Fürst-Johann-August-Strasse 1 56564 Neuwied / DE | 02 /
BOTZEM, Petra St. Thomaser Hohl 24 56626 Andernach / DE | 03 /
HOFFMANN, Gerd Flurstrasse 17 56566 Neuwied / DE | 04 /
KINDEL, Heinz Fliederweg 5 56581 Ehlscheid / DE | [2003/01] | Representative(s) | Flaccus, Rolf-Dieter, et al Flaccus Müller-Wolff Patentanwälte Bussardweg 10 50389 Wesseling / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/01] | Flaccus, Rolf-Dieter, Dr., et al Patentanwalt Bussardweg 10 50389 Wesseling / DE | Application number, filing date | 01936095.7 | 17.03.2001 | [2003/01] | WO2001EP03089 | Priority number, date | DE2000115783 | 30.03.2000 Original published format: DE 10015783 | [2003/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0174338 | Date: | 11.10.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1267846 | Date: | 02.01.2003 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.10.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1267846 | Date: | 23.11.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.10.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/70, A61K31/496, A61P1/08 | [2003/01] | CPC: |
A61K9/7069 (EP,US);
A61K9/70 (KR);
A61K31/495 (EP,US);
A61P1/08 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/01] | Title | German: | TRANSDERMALES THERAPEUTISCHES SYSTEM ZUR ABGABE VON LERISETRON | [2003/01] | English: | TRANSDERMAL THERAPEUTIC SYSTEM FOR THE DELIVERY OF LERISETRON | [2003/01] | French: | SYSTEME THERAPEUTIQUE TRANSDERMIQUE POUR ADMINISTRER DU LERISETRON | [2003/01] | Entry into regional phase | 10.08.2002 | National basic fee paid | 10.08.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.08.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.10.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 10.08.2002 | Examination requested [2003/01] | 14.01.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.05.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.06.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.09.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 09.09.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.08.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 23.11.2005 | FI | 23.11.2005 | TR | 23.11.2005 | DK | 23.02.2006 | SE | 23.02.2006 | MC | 31.03.2006 | PT | 24.04.2006 | [2009/02] |
Former [2008/37] | FI | 23.11.2005 | |
TR | 23.11.2005 | ||
DK | 23.02.2006 | ||
SE | 23.02.2006 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
PT | 24.04.2006 | ||
Former [2007/45] | FI | 23.11.2005 | |
DK | 23.02.2006 | ||
SE | 23.02.2006 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
PT | 24.04.2006 | ||
Former [2007/36] | FI | 23.11.2005 | |
IT | 23.11.2005 | ||
DK | 23.02.2006 | ||
SE | 23.02.2006 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
PT | 24.04.2006 | ||
Former [2006/48] | FI | 23.11.2005 | |
DK | 23.02.2006 | ||
SE | 23.02.2006 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
PT | 24.04.2006 | ||
Former [2006/46] | FI | 23.11.2005 | |
DK | 23.02.2006 | ||
SE | 23.02.2006 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/35] | FI | 23.11.2005 | |
DK | 23.02.2006 | ||
SE | 23.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/27] | FI | 23.11.2005 | |
SE | 23.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/23] | FI | 23.11.2005 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5256665 (ORJALES-VENERO AURELIO [ES], et al) [A] 1-21 * column 2, line 45 - line 61; example 1 * * claim 4 *; | [A]WO9917755 (GLAXO GROUP LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1-21* claims 1-10 *; | [PA]WO0027371 (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US]) [PA] 1-21 * page 2, line 2 - page 3, line 16 * * page 6, line 28 - page 7, line 19 * |