EP1265495 - METHOD FOR PREPARING A ROLLER DRIED PROTEIN PREPARATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.07.2012 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.07.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.08.2012 [2012/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Friesland Brands B.V. Stationsplein 4 3818 LE Amersfoort / NL | [2011/38] |
Former [2011/31] | For all designated states FrieslandBrands B.V. Stationsplein 4 3818 LE Amersfoort / NL | ||
Former [2003/03] | For all designated states Campina B.V. Hogeweg 9 5301 LB Zaltbommel / NL | ||
Former [2002/51] | For all designated states CAMPINA MELKUNIE B.V. Hogeweg 9 NL-5301 LB Zaltbommel / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CLARK, David, Callam Maaskantje 40 NL-5175 XG St. Michielsgestel / NL | 02 /
SCHMELTER, Tillmann, Gerhard Sterndonk 4 NL-5467 DW Veghel / NL | 03 /
VAN DIJK, Johannes, Henricus Groesstraat 7 NL-5409 TN Odiliapeel / NL | [2011/16] |
Former [2003/04] | 01 /
CLARK, David, Callam Maaskantje 40 NL-5175 XG St. Michielsgestel The Netherlands / NL | ||
02 /
SCHMELTER, Tillmann, Gerhard Sterndonk 4 NL-5467 DW Veghel / NL | |||
03 /
VAN DIJK, Johannes, Henricus Groesstraat 7 NL-5409 TN Odiliapeel / NL | |||
Former [2002/51] | 01 /
CLARK, David, Callam HC65 Box 75 McNaught Hill Rd. Bovina, NY 13740 / US | ||
02 /
SCHMELTER, Tillmann, Gerhard Sterndonk 4 NL-5467 DW Veghel / NL | |||
03 /
VAN DIJK, Johannes, Henricus Groesstraat 7 NL-5409 TN Odiliapeel / NL | Representative(s) | Jorritsma, Ruurd Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS The Hague / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2012/01] | Jorritsma, Ruurd Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS The Hague / NL | ||
Former [2008/34] | Van Someren, Petronella F. H. M., et al Arnold & Siedsma, Sweelinkplein 1 2517 GK The Hague / NL | ||
Former [2002/51] | Van Someren, Petronella F. H. M., et al Arnold & Siedsma, Advocaten en Octrooigemachtigden, Sweelinckplein 1 2517 GK Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 01936140.1 | 22.03.2001 | [2002/51] | WO2001EP03436 | Priority number, date | WO2000EP02618 | 23.03.2000 Original published format: PCT/EP00/02618 | [2002/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0170042 | Date: | 27.09.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1265495 | Date: | 18.12.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.09.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1265495 | Date: | 31.08.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/35] | Type: | B9 Corrected patent specification | No.: | EP1265495 | Date: | 14.03.2012 | [2012/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.09.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A23J1/20, A23J1/22, A23C1/03, C12N9/10 | [2002/51] | CPC data not yet available | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/51] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON TROMMELGETROCKNETER PROTEINZUBEREITUNG | [2002/51] | English: | METHOD FOR PREPARING A ROLLER DRIED PROTEIN PREPARATION | [2002/51] | French: | PROCEDE DE PREPARATION D'UNE PREPARATION DE PROTEINES SECHEES SUR CYLINDRES | [2002/51] | Entry into regional phase | 04.09.2002 | National basic fee paid | 04.09.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.09.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.10.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 04.09.2002 | Examination requested [2002/51] | 03.11.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.06.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 26.08.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.01.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.06.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.04.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.10.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.11.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 13.01.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.03.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.05.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 13.05.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.11.2004 | Opposition(s) | 01.06.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/32] | Request for further processing for: | 26.08.2005 | Request for further processing filed | 26.08.2005 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 15.09.2005 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 28.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2004 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   28.04.2004 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US3720765 (MILLER R) [X] 1,6,8 * column 2, lines 34-65; example 1; claim 1 *; | [XY]US4016147 (FUJIMAKI MASAO, et al) [X] 1,2,4,11 * column 2, line 37 - column 3, line 40 * * column 7, lines 3-20 * * example 1; claim 16 * [Y] 3,5-8,12-15; | [A]US4133901 (FETZER RICHARD W, et al) [A] 16 * column 6, paragraphs 2,3 ** examples 1-3; claims 1,7,8 *; | [X]US4138505 (HART JAMES R, et al) [X] 1,8,9,11 * column 5, paragraphs 2-4 * * example 2 *; | [YA] - IMM, J. Y., LIAN, P., AND LEE, C. M., "Gelation and water-binding properties of transglutaminase-treated skim milk powder", JOURNAL OF FOOD SCIENCE., INSTITUTE OF FOOD TECHNOLOGISTS. CHICAGO., US, (2000), vol. 65, no. 2, ISSN 0022-1147, pages 200 - 205, XP002153299 [Y] 3,5-8,12-15 * page 200, column 2, paragraph 3 - page 201, column 1, paragraph 1 * * See Materials and Methods, Conclusions;; table 1 * [A] 9,10,16 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1365-2621.2000.tb15979.x | Examination | EP0963704 | EP0821881 | EP0824870 |