EP1290056 - POLYURETHANE COMPOSITIONS BASED ON POLYESTER BLOCK COPOLYMERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.07.2007 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.07.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 06.08.2008 [2008/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Henkel Kommanditgesellschaft auf Aktien Henkelstrasse 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | [2003/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KREBS, Michael Bogenstrasse 1 40724 Hilden / DE | 02 /
LOHR, Christoph Am Wolfshahn 16 42117 Wuppertal / DE | 03 /
BRENGER, Andreas Volmerswerther Strasse 391 40221 Düsseldorf / DE | 04 /
SCHEFFLER, Ingolf Neukirchener Strasse 69 41470 Neuss / DE | [2003/11] | Application number, filing date | 01936406.6 | 30.05.2001 | [2003/11] | WO2001EP06127 | Priority number, date | DE2000128810 | 10.06.2000 Original published format: DE 10028810 | [2003/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0196436 | Date: | 20.12.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1290056 | Date: | 12.03.2003 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.12.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1290056 | Date: | 20.09.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.12.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C08G18/12, C09J175/06, C08G18/42 | [2003/11] | CPC: |
C08G18/12 (EP,US);
C08G18/4277 (EP,US);
C08G2170/20 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08G18/12, C08G18/307 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2004/21] |
Former [2003/11] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | POLYURETHAN-ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN AUF DER BASIS VON POLYESTER-BLOCK-COPOLYMEREN | [2003/11] | English: | POLYURETHANE COMPOSITIONS BASED ON POLYESTER BLOCK COPOLYMERS | [2003/11] | French: | COMPOSITIONS DE POLYURETHANNE A BASE DE COPOLYMERES SEQUENCES DE POLYESTER | [2003/11] | Entry into regional phase | 02.12.2002 | National basic fee paid | 02.12.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.12.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.01.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 02.12.2002 | Examination requested [2003/11] | 24.03.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.07.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.09.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.12.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.04.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.07.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 03.07.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.06.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 20.09.2006 | GB | 30.05.2007 | FR | 31.05.2007 | [2008/32] |
Former [2008/26] | IT | 20.09.2006 | |
GB | 30.05.2007 | ||
Former [2007/35] | IT | 20.09.2006 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5137984 (KANGAS LANI S [US], et al) [A] 1-3,8 * column 1, line 54 - column 3, line 28 * * examples 8,9; table 2 *; | [A]US5965662 (KREBS MICHAEL [DE], et al) [A] 1-3,8 * column 3, line 59 - column 7, line 14 * * example 1 *; | [ED]DE19961941 (HENKEL KGAA [DE]) [ED] 1-3,6,8 * page 2, line 53 - page 3, line 43 * * claims 1,4,5,7,9 * | Examination | WO0146330 |