EP1281032 - APPARATUS AND METHODS FOR COOLING AND LIQUEFYING A FLUID USING MAGNETIC REFRIGERATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.04.2014 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.04.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.05.2014 [2014/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Prometheus Technologies, LLC 9675 SE 36th Street Mercer Island WA 98040 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2009/29] | For all designated states Prometheus Technologies, LCC 9675 SE 36th Street Mercer Island WA 98040 / US | ||
Former [2006/40] | For all designated states Prometieus Energy Company 3311 South 120th, PL Suit 100 Seattle WA 98168 / US | ||
Former [2003/06] | For all designated states Rhocraft R.& D. Ltd. University of Victoria P.O. Box 3075, R-Hut, McKenzie avenue Victoria, British Columbia V8W 3W2 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BARCLAY, John, A. 13369 Prospector Ridge Road Monroe, WA 98272 / US | 02 /
BROOK, Thomas, C. 2905 Yew Street Vancouver, British Columbia V6K 4M4 / CA | [2003/06] | Representative(s) | Sessford, Russell, et al Forresters IP LLP Skygarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/13] | Sessford, Russell, et al Forrester & Boehmert SkyGarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/37] | Sessford, Russell, et al Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/25] | Beattie, Alex Thomas Stewart, et al Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/18] | Hoarton, Lloyd Douglas Charles, et al Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2003/06] | Meddle, Alan Leonard Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01936723.4 | 07.05.2001 | [2003/06] | WO2001IB01027 | Priority number, date | US20000202266P | 05.05.2000 Original published format: US 202266 P | [2003/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0186218 | Date: | 15.11.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/46] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1281032 | Date: | 05.02.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.11.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.04.2002 | Classification | IPC: | F25J1/00 | [2003/06] | CPC: |
F25J1/0225 (EP,US);
F25J1/001 (EP,US);
F25J1/0022 (EP,US);
F25B21/00 (EP,US);
F25B2321/0021 (EP,US);
F25J2270/908 (EP,US);
Y02B30/00 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/06] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR KÜHLUNG UND VERFLÜSSIGUNG EINES FLUIDES DURCH MAGNETISCHE KÜHLUNG | [2003/06] | English: | APPARATUS AND METHODS FOR COOLING AND LIQUEFYING A FLUID USING MAGNETIC REFRIGERATION | [2003/06] | French: | APPAREIL ET PROCEDES DE REFROIDISSEMENT ET DE LIQUEFACTION D'UN FLUIDE PAR REFRIGERATION MAGNETIQUE | [2003/06] | Entry into regional phase | 21.11.2002 | National basic fee paid | 21.11.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.11.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.12.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 21.11.2002 | Examination requested [2003/06] | 26.01.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.07.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.10.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.02.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.12.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/20] | 09.01.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2014/20] | 18.03.2014 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 25.03.2014 | 25.03.2014 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.01.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 18.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 11.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 26.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2003 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   24.11.2003 | 31.05.2009 | 09   M06   Fee paid on   25.06.2009 | 31.05.2012 | 12   M06   Fee paid on   26.10.2012 | 31.05.2013 | 13   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US3108444 (DAVID KAHN) [A] 1 * column W *; | [X]FR2520094 (US ENERGY [US]) [X] 27,28 * page 15, line 17 - line 33; figure -; claim - * * page 16, line 24 - line 33 * * page 17, line 5 - line 7 *; | [A]US4507927 (BARCLAY JOHN A [US]) [A] * column W *; | [X]US4704871 (BARCLAY JOHN A [US], et al) [X] 27,28 * column 3, line 35 - line 51; figure -; claim - * * column 4, line 28 - line 35 * * column 4, line 59 - line 63 * * column 6, line 11 - line 25 *; | [X]US5182914 (BARCLAY JOHN A [US], et al) [X] 10,12-14,19 * column 2, line 20 - line 31; figure -; claim - * * column 4, line 27 - line 29 * * column 4, line 48 - line 65 * * column 8, line 11 - line 14 *; | [A]US5249424 (DEGREGORIA ANTHONY J [US], et al) [A] 1,8 * column 2, line 41 - line 67; figure -; claim - * * column 3, line 41 - line 53 * * column 6, line 11 - line 24 * * column 10, line 24 - line 29 * * column 13, line 54 - line 68 *; | [A] - ZHANG L ET AL, "Design optimization of a 0.1-ton/day active magnetic regenerative hydrogen liquefier", CRYOGENICS, IPC SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY PRESS LTD. GUILDFORD, GB, (200004), vol. 40, no. 4-5, ISSN 0011-2275, pages 269 - 278, XP004218751 [A] * column W * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0011-2275(00)00039-4 |