EP1288865 - CREATION OF IMAGE DESIGNATION FILE AND REPRODUCTION OF IMAGE USING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.09.2010 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.07.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GB | published on 31.08.2011 [2011/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Seiko Epson Corporation 4-1, Nishishinjuku 2-chome, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 163-0811 / JP | [2009/47] |
Former [2003/10] | For all designated states SEIKO EPSON CORPORATION 4-1, Nishishinjuku 2-chome, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 160-0811 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KARASAWA, Toru, c/o SEIKO EPSON CORPORATION 3-5, Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi, Nagano 392-8502 / JP | 02 /
AKAIWA, Shoichi, c/o SEIKO EPSON CORPORATION 3-5, Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi, Nagano 392-8502 / JP | 03 /
NAGANO, Miki, c/o SEIKO EPSON CORPORATION 3-5, Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi, Nagano 392-8502 / JP | [2003/10] | Representative(s) | Tothill, John Paul Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/10] | Tothill, John Paul Frank B. Dehn & Co. 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | Application number, filing date | 01936934.7 | 08.06.2001 | [2003/10] | WO2001JP04879 | Priority number, date | JP20000174142 | 09.06.2000 Original published format: JP 2000174142 | JP20000174150 | 09.06.2000 Original published format: JP 2000174150 | JP20000175874 | 12.06.2000 Original published format: JP 2000175874 | [2003/10] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0195256 | Date: | 13.12.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1288865 | Date: | 05.03.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.12.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1288865 | Date: | 18.11.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 13.12.2001 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.10.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G06T11/60 | [2009/24] | CPC: |
G06F3/0486 (EP,US);
G06F16/183 (US);
G06F16/51 (EP,US);
G06T1/00 (US);
G06T11/60 (EP,US);
H04L67/06 (US);
H04L67/1097 (US);
H04N19/70 (US);
H04N5/74 (US);
|
Former IPC [2006/47] | G06T11/60, G06T1/00 | ||
Former IPC [2006/30] | G06T11/60 | ||
Former IPC [2003/10] | G06T13/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/21] |
Former [2003/10] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HERSTELLUNG EINER DATEI ZUR BESTIMMUNG EINES BILDES UND REPRODUKTION DIESES BILDES DADURCH | [2009/24] | English: | CREATION OF IMAGE DESIGNATION FILE AND REPRODUCTION OF IMAGE USING THE SAME | [2003/10] | French: | CREATION D'UN FICHIER DE DESIGNATION D'IMAGE ET REPRODUCTION D'UNE IMAGE PAR UTILISATION DE CELUI-CI | [2003/10] |
Former [2003/10] | HERSTELLUNG EINER DATEI ZUR BESTIMMUNG EINES BILDES UND WIEDERHERSTELLUNG DIESES BILDES DADURCH | Entry into regional phase | 15.03.2002 | Translation filed | 15.03.2002 | National basic fee paid | 15.03.2002 | Search fee paid | 15.03.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.03.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.03.2002 | Examination requested [2003/10] | 11.10.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.02.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.07.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.05.2009 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 11.05.2009 | 06.05.2009 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 11.05.2009 | Date of oral proceedings | 11.05.2009 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 29.05.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.10.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 01.10.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP08012994.3 / EP1980996 | EP08012995.0 / EP1980997 | EP10009552.0 / EP2273452 | Opposition(s) | 19.08.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 08.06.2010 | FR | 30.06.2010 | [2011/35] |
Former [2011/31] | FR | 30.06.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0572031 (HITACHI SOFTWARE ENG [JP]) [A] 22-37 * column 16, line 47 - column 17, line 12 * * column 18, lines 21-43 ** figure 15 *; | [X]EP0631246 (IBM [US]) [X] 1-6,10,11,20,21 * abstract * * column 1, line 4 - column 4, line 3 * * column 5, line 48 - column 6, line 7 * * figures 2,4a *; | [A]EP0717544 (AT & T CORP [US]) [A] 22-37 * column 4, line 41 - column 7, line 27 * * column 14, line 20 - column 15, line 33 * * figures 1,44,46,47 *; | [X]US5859623 (MEYN CATHERINE K [US], et al) [X] 1-21 * abstract * * column 1, line 13 - column 2, line 5 * * column 3, line 9 - column 5, line 65 * * column 11, lines 31-36 * * column 12, line 54 - column 16, line 44 * * column 23, lines 17-23 * * figure 5 * | International search | [X]JPH06259521 (SONY CORP); | [X]JPH08153104 (TOSHIBA CORP); | [Y]JPH10116168 (FUJITSU LTD); | [X]JP2000098986 (NEC CORP) |