EP1287245 - METHOD AND ARRANGEMENT FOR REGULATING CRANKSHAFT ROTATIONAL SPEED [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.06.2006 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 24.09.2008 [2008/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VOLVO LASTVAGNAR AB 405 08 Göteborg / SE | [2003/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BERGLUND, Sixten Kornbodsvägen 2 S-423 54 Torslanda / SE | [2003/10] | Representative(s) | Hammond, Andrew David Valea AB Box 1098 405 23 Gothenburg / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/39] | Hammond, Andrew David Valea AB Lindholmspiren 5 417 56 Göteborg / SE | ||
Former [2003/10] | Hammond, Andrew David Ström & Gulliksson IP AB Sjöporten 4 417 64 Göteborg / SE | Application number, filing date | 01937067.5 | 23.05.2001 | [2003/10] | WO2001SE01168 | Priority number, date | SE20000002043 | 31.05.2000 Original published format: SE 0002043 | [2003/10] | Filing language | SV | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0192699 | Date: | 06.12.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1287245 | Date: | 05.03.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.12.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1287245 | Date: | 17.08.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 06.12.2001 | Classification | IPC: | F02B39/04, B60K25/02 | [2003/10] | CPC: |
F02B37/105 (EP,US);
B60W10/04 (EP,US);
B60W10/10 (EP,US);
B60W30/1819 (EP,US);
F02B37/14 (EP,US);
F02B39/04 (EP,US);
F02B39/06 (EP,US);
F02B75/20 (EP,US);
F02D41/023 (EP,US);
F02B2075/1824 (EP,US);
F02D2200/0406 (EP,US);
F02D2200/602 (EP,US);
Y02T10/12 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [2004/21] |
Former [2003/10] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR REGELUNG DER KURBELWELLENDREHZAHL | [2003/10] | English: | METHOD AND ARRANGEMENT FOR REGULATING CRANKSHAFT ROTATIONAL SPEED | [2003/10] | French: | PROCEDE ET ARRANGEMENT DESTINES A REGULER LA VITESSE DE ROTATION D'UN VILEBREQUIN | [2003/10] | Entry into regional phase | 17.12.2002 | National basic fee paid | 17.12.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.12.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.12.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 23.12.2002 | Examination requested [2003/10] | 23.09.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.02.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.02.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.06.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 20.06.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.05.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 17.08.2005 | NL | 17.08.2005 | [2007/36] |
Former [2006/14] | NL | 17.08.2005 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5890468 (OZAWA GODO [JP]); | [A]US5875766 (OZAWA GODO [JP]); | [A]US4907549 (MORIKAWA KOJI [JP], et al) |