EP1295442 - MESSAGING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.10.2009 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.10.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.11.2009 [2009/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WeeWorld Limited 19 Blythswood Square Glasgow G2 4BG / GB | [2006/48] |
Former [2003/13] | For all designated states Saw-You.Com Limited 2 Clifton Street Glasgow G3 7LA / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KINSELLA, Mike 3 Turnberry Road Glasgow G11 5AF / GB | 02 /
MCGUIRE, John, Law 11 Deanwood Avenue Glasgow G44 3RL / GB | [2003/13] | Representative(s) | McBride, Peter Hill, et al Murgitroyd & Company Scotland House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/36] | McBride, Peter Hill, et al Murgitroyd & Company Scotland House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | ||
Former [2008/31] | Ede, Eric, et al Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | ||
Former [2003/13] | McKechnie, Neil, et al Kennedys Patent Agency Limited, Floor 5, Queens House, 29 St. Vincent Place Glasgow G1 2DT / GB | Application number, filing date | 01938383.5 | 08.06.2001 | [2003/13] | WO2001GB02533 | Priority number, date | US20000592563 | 12.06.2000 Original published format: US 592563 | [2003/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0197535 | Date: | 20.12.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/51] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1295442 | Date: | 26.03.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.12.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.03.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/58, H04Q7/22 | [2003/13] | CPC: |
H04W4/12 (EP,US);
H04L51/58 (EP,US);
H04L61/00 (EP,US);
H04L61/45 (EP,US);
H04L67/55 (EP,US);
H04L51/48 (EP,US);
H04W4/14 (EP,US);
H04W8/18 (EP,US);
H04W88/184 (EP,US);
Y10S707/99933 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/13] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NACHRICHTENSYSTEM | [2003/13] | English: | MESSAGING SYSTEM | [2003/13] | French: | SYSTEME DE MESSAGERIE | [2003/13] | Entry into regional phase | 13.01.2003 | National basic fee paid | 13.01.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.01.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.01.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 13.01.2003 | Examination requested [2003/13] | 29.10.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.05.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/45] | 17.06.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 08.04.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 21.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9741654 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE], et al) [A] 1,23,45 * page 2, line 2 - line 4 * * page 2, line 19 - line 29 * * page 3, line 2 - line 25 * * page 4, line 18 - line 20 * * page 5, line 7 - line 10 * * page 5, line 16 - line 26; claim 1 *; | [A]WO9966746 (NOKIA TELECOMMUNICATIONS OY [FI], et al) [A] 1,23,45 * page 6, line 26 - line 31 * * page 9, line 3 - line 8 * * page 19, line 23 - page 20, line 9 * * page 24, line 23 - line 35 ** page 25, line 6 - line 12 *; | [XA]WO0022860 (DEGNBOL JANUS FRIIS [DK]) [X] 1,4-6,9,11,12,15-19,21,22,45,46 * page 4, line 26 - page 5, line 5 * * page 5, line 25 - line 33 * * page 12, line 17 - line 30 * * page 14, line 7 - line 16 * * page 14, line 30 - line 34 * * page 15, line 20 - line 22 * * figure 1 * [A] 23-44 |