EP1207692 - STORAGE-TYPE BROADCAST SERVICE SYSTEM AND RECEPTION STORAGE UNIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 31.07.2009 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.07.2009 | Withdrawal of application | published on 02.09.2009 [2009/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/47] | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | ||
Former [2002/21] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-0050 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FUJITA, Kenichi 2-14-1-205, Tamachi, Kawasaki-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 210-0822 / JP | [2002/21] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/21] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01938590.5 | 11.06.2001 | [2002/21] | WO2001JP04909 | Priority number, date | JP20000177631 | 13.06.2000 Original published format: JP 2000177631 | JP20010128502 | 25.04.2001 Original published format: JP 2001128502 | [2002/21] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0197515 | Date: | 20.12.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1207692 | Date: | 22.05.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.12.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 20.12.2001 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.05.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/76, H04N7/16, H04B1/16, H04H1/00, G06F12/00 | [2002/21] | CPC: |
H04H60/27 (EP,US);
H04N5/76 (EP,KR,US);
H04H20/40 (EP,US);
H04N21/60 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/22] |
Former [2002/21] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | RUNDFUNKDIENSTSYSTEM VOM SPEICHERTYP UND EMPFANGSSPRECHEREINHEIT | [2002/21] | English: | STORAGE-TYPE BROADCAST SERVICE SYSTEM AND RECEPTION STORAGE UNIT | [2002/21] | French: | SYSTEME DE SERVICE DE DIFFUSION DE TYPE STOCKAGE ET UNITE DE STOCKAGE DE RECEPTION | [2002/21] | Entry into regional phase | 11.02.2002 | Translation filed | 11.02.2002 | National basic fee paid | 11.02.2002 | Search fee paid | 11.02.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.02.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.02.2002 | Examination requested [2002/21] | 21.07.2009 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2009/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0907285 (CANAL PLUS SA [FR]) [A] 1-33* the whole document *; | [XA]US5978855 (METZ ERIK CHRISTOPHER [US], et al) [X] 1,2,8,14-16,21,27-29 * the whole document * [A] 3-7,9-13,17-20,22-26,30-33; | [A]EP0998141 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO [JP]) [A] 1-33 * the whole document * | International search | [Y]JPH0965288 (SONY CORP); | [Y]JPH04506276 ; | [Y]JPH11112494 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP); | [Y]JPH11232727 (HITACHI LTD) |