EP1292359 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR ASSESSING THE PERFORMANCE OF A PHARMACEUTICAL AGENT DELIVERY SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.08.2007 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.08.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.09.2007 [2007/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Merck & Co., Inc. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, New Jersey 07065 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2003/12] | For all designated states MERCK & CO., INC. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, New Jersey 07065 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SIMON, Adam, J. 543 Fawnhill Drive Langhorne, PA 19047 / US | [2003/12] | Representative(s) | Patentanwälte Ruff, Wilhelm, Beier, Dauster & Partner mbB Kronenstrasse 30 70174 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/12] | Patentanwälte Ruff, Wilhelm, Beier, Dauster & Partner Kronenstrasse 30 70174 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 01939219.0 | 22.05.2001 | [2003/12] | WO2001US16398 | Priority number, date | US20000206121P | 22.05.2000 Original published format: US 206121 P | [2003/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0189455 | Date: | 29.11.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/48] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1292359 | Date: | 19.03.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.11.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 29.08.2002 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.03.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A61N1/32, C25B11/04, H01B1/00, H01M4/66 | [2005/01] | CPC: |
A61N1/325 (EP,US);
A61K49/0002 (EP,US);
A61N1/306 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2003/21] | A61K9/00 | ||
Former IPC [2003/12] | A61N1/00, A61N1/04, A61N1/18, A61N1/30, A61N1/32, C12M1/42, C12N13/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/12] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR BEWERTUNG DER WIRKSAMKEIT EINES VERABREICHUNGSSYSTEMS FÜR PHARMAZEUTIKA | [2003/12] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR ASSESSING THE PERFORMANCE OF A PHARMACEUTICAL AGENT DELIVERY SYSTEM | [2003/12] | French: | SYSTEME ET PROCEDE PERMETTANT D'EVALUER L'EFFICACITE D'UN DISPOSITIF D'ADMINISTRATION D'AGENT PHARMACEUTIQUE | [2003/12] | Entry into regional phase | 20.12.2002 | National basic fee paid | 20.12.2002 | Search fee paid | 20.12.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.12.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.12.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 20.12.2002 | Examination requested [2003/12] | 28.09.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.04.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/39] | 11.05.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2007/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2007 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5515848 (CORBETT III SCOTT S [US], et al) [X] 5-7,11,12,14 * column 3, line 4 - column 13, line 9 *; | [X]US5911223 (WEAVER JAMES C [US], et al) [X] 5-14 * column 2, line 18 - column 9, line 50 *; | [A]US5968006 (HOFMANN GUNTER A [US]) [A] 5-14* the whole document *; | [X]US5983131 (WEAVER JAMES C [US], et al) [X] 5,6,11-14 * column 2, line 20 - column 13, line 4 * | International search | [X]US5515848 (CORBETT III SCOTT S [US], et al); | [X]US5983131 (WEAVER JAMES C [US], et al); | [Y]US5968006 (HOFMANN GUNTER A [US]) | [Y] - OSHIMA ET AL., "Targeted gene transfer to corneal endothelium in vivo by electric pulse", GENE THERAPY, (199810), vol. 5, no. 10, pages 1347 - 1354, XP001029779 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/sj.gt.3300725 | [Y] - BUREAU ET AL., "Importance of association between permeabilization and electrophoretic forces for intramuscular DNA electrotransfer", BIOCHIMICA ET BIOPHYSICA ACTA, (20000501), vol. 1474, no. 3, pages 353 - 359, XP004276575 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0304-4165(00)00028-3 | [Y] - ZHANG ET AL, "In vivo transdermal delivery of large molecules by pressure-mediated electroincorporation and electroporation: a novel method for drug and gene delivery", BIOELECTROCHEMISTRY AND BIOENERGISTICS, (1997), vol. 42, pages 283 - 292, XP002950932 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0302-4598(96)05128-8 |