EP1230671 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR PROVIDING DEFECT FREE RAPID THERMAL PROCESSING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.02.2009 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.10.2009 | Change - representative | published on 02.12.2009 [2009/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wafermasters Incorporated 246 East Gish Road San Jose, CA 95112 / US | [2002/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YOO, Woo, Sik 3090 Stelling Drive Palo Alto, CA 94303 / US | [2002/33] | Representative(s) | Freeman, Jacqueline Carol WP Thompson 138 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/49] | Freeman, Jacqueline Carol W.P.Thompson & Co. 55 Drury Lane London WC2B 5SQ / GB | ||
Former [2002/33] | Freeman, Jacqueline Carol W.P. THOMPSON & CO. Celcon House 289-293 High Holborn London WC1V 7HU / GB | Application number, filing date | 01939341.2 | 22.05.2001 | [2002/33] | WO2001US16710 | Priority number, date | US20000589851 | 08.06.2000 Original published format: US 589851 | [2002/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0195372 | Date: | 13.12.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/50] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1230671 | Date: | 14.08.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.12.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1230671 | Date: | 16.04.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.04.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/00 | [2002/33] | CPC: |
H01L21/67115 (EP,US);
H01L21/324 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [2004/21] |
Former [2002/33] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR ERZEUGUNG EINER FEHLERFREIEN SCHNELLEN THERMISCHEN BEHANDLUNG | [2002/33] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR PROVIDING DEFECT FREE RAPID THERMAL PROCESSING | [2002/33] | French: | SYSTEME ET PROCEDE DE TRAITEMENT THERMIQUE RAPIDE DONNANT DES PIECES EXEMPTES DE DEFAUT | [2002/33] | Entry into regional phase | 13.02.2002 | National basic fee paid | 13.02.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.02.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.02.2002 | Examination requested [2002/33] | 28.12.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.04.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.01.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.05.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.08.2007 | Date of oral proceedings | 10.09.2007 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 26.09.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.01.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 14.01.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.01.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 16.04.2008 | GB | 16.07.2008 | [2009/39] |
Former [2009/29] | GB | 16.07.2008 | Cited in | International search | [XY]US5884009 (OKASE WATARU [JP]) [X] 1,2,4-12,14-16 * figures 15A-15D * * column 22, lines 21-23 * * column 23, lines 29-63 * [Y] 13,17-20; | [YA]JPH09330873 ; | [A]JPH11251400 ; | [A]US5592581 (OKASE WATARU [JP]) [A] 1,9,12,17 * figures 1,3,4 *; | [A]US5399199 (KIYAMA HIROMI [JP], et al) [A] 1,9,12,17 * column 4, lines 24-39 * | [YA] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1998, no. 10, Database accession no. 1998-107252, XP002184262 & JPH09330873 A 19971222 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [Y] 13,17-20 * abstract * [A] 1,9,12,17 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19991222), vol. 1999, no. 14, & JP11251400 A 19990917 (HITACHI LTD) [A] 1,9,12,17 * abstract * |