EP1284630 - APPENDAGE FOR A ROBOT FOR CLEANING A SURFACE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.05.2006 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.11.2009 | Change - representative | published on 09.12.2009 [2009/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2003/09] | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FISHER, Charles, William 200 Belmont Court Loveland, OH 45140 / US | [2003/09] | Representative(s) | Borbach, Markus Procter & Gamble Service GmbH IP Department Sulzbacher Straße 40-50 65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/50] | Borbach, Markus Procter & Gamble Service GmbH, Sulzbacher Strasse 40-50 65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE | ||
Former [2003/09] | Borbach, Markus Procter & Gamble Service GmbH, Sulzbacher Strasse 40-50 65823 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE | Application number, filing date | 01939503.7 | 25.05.2001 | [2003/09] | WO2001US17087 | Priority number, date | US20000580083 | 30.05.2000 Original published format: US 580083 | US20010785356 | 16.02.2001 Original published format: US 785356 | [2003/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0191624 | Date: | 06.12.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/49] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1284630 | Date: | 26.02.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.12.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.05.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A47L11/12, A47L11/40, A47L13/44 | [2003/09] | CPC: |
A47L11/4061 (EP);
A47L11/12 (EP);
A47L11/292 (EP);
A47L13/44 (EP);
A47L2201/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/09] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANSATZTEIL FÜR EINEN ROBOTER ZUM REINIGEN VON OBERFLÄCHEN | [2003/09] | English: | APPENDAGE FOR A ROBOT FOR CLEANING A SURFACE | [2003/09] | French: | APPENDICE DE ROBOT | [2003/09] | Entry into regional phase | 22.11.2002 | National basic fee paid | 22.11.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.11.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.10.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 22.11.2002 | Examination requested [2003/09] | 06.02.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.06.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.12.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/25] | 03.02.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2006/25] | Request for further processing for: | 25.06.2004 | Request for further processing filed | 25.06.2004 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 06.08.2004 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2005 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]JPS57103616 (TOKYO SHIBAURA ELECTRIC CO) [X] 1,2,4,5,7,8 * figure - * [A] 9; | [XA]EP0424229 (PROTEE [FR]) [X] 1,5,7,8 * figures 1-3 * [A] 9; | [XA]US5012886 (JONAS ANDRE [FR], et al) [X] 1-3,5,7,8 * column 6, line 32 - line 56 * * figures 1,2,9 * [A] 9; | [XA]US5720077 (NAKAMURA KYOKO [JP], et al) [X] 1,4,5,7,8 * figures 1,4,5,11,17A,17B * [A] 9; | [X]US5735959 (KUBO NAOKI [JP], et al) [X] 1,7-9 * abstract * * column 6, line 3 - line 25 * * column 15, line 66 - column 16, line 8 * * column 16, line 36 - line 67 * * figures 1,21,23A,23B *; | [AD]US5915437 (PETNER ROBERT E [US]) [AD] 9 * figure - *; | [XA]WO0010062 (SIEMENS AG [DE], et al) [X] 1,4,7,8 * page 9, line 22 - line 31 * * figures 11,12 * [A] 9; | [XA]DE19916427 (SOMMER VOLKER [DE]) [X] 1,5,7,8 * abstract * * column 7, line 21 - line 49 * * figures 1,2 * [A] 9; | [PAD]US6098239 (VOSBIKIAN PETER S [US]) [PAD] 9* figure - *; | [E]DE10000407 (SOMMER VOLKER [DE]) [E] 1,5-10,14 * figures 1,2 * * column 3, line 28 - line 35 * * column 9, line 45 - line 68 * |