EP1296751 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR THE CATALYTIC CONVERSION OF A SUBSTANCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.11.2005 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.11.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.12.2005 [2005/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/14] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HUMS, Erich Hochstr.12 91093 Hessdorf / DE | 02 /
SPIELMANN, Horst Dr.-Ludwig-von-Raufferstr. 6a 91083 Baiersdorf / DE | [2003/14] | Representative(s) | Tergau & Pohl Patentanwälte Mögeldorfer Hauptstrasse 51 90482 Nürnberg / DE | [2003/18] | Application number, filing date | 01940226.2 | 10.05.2001 | [2003/14] | WO2001DE01782 | Priority number, date | DE2000122763 | 10.05.2000 Original published format: DE 10022763 | [2003/14] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0185311 | Date: | 15.11.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1296751 | Date: | 02.04.2003 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.11.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.11.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B01D53/86, B01D53/90, B01D53/94, F01N3/20, C10L1/10, B01J38/68 | [2003/14] | CPC: |
F01N3/2066 (EP);
B01D53/86 (KR);
B01D53/8625 (EP);
B01D53/90 (EP);
B01D53/9409 (EP);
B01J23/92 (EP);
B01J38/04 (EP);
C10L1/1208 (EP);
C10L10/02 (EP);
B01J37/0238 (EP);
F01N2610/01 (EP);
F01N2610/02 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/14] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR KATALYTISCHEN UMWANDLUNG EINES STOFFS | [2003/14] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR THE CATALYTIC CONVERSION OF A SUBSTANCE | [2003/14] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR LA CONVERSION CATALYTIQUE D'UNE MATIERE | [2003/14] | Entry into regional phase | 21.10.2002 | National basic fee paid | 21.10.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.10.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.09.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 21.10.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.10.2002 | Examination requested [2003/14] | 19.09.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.03.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.12.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.06.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/52] | 22.07.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2005/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9728358 (CLEAN DIESEL TECH INC [US], et al) [X] 1-25 * page 6, line 16 - page 8, line 14 * * page 10, line 10 - page 20, line 29 * * page 28, line 3 - page 30, line 27; figures 1,2; claims 1,6,8,12,13 *; | [X]DE19800873 (ERC EMISSIONS REDUZIERUNGS CON [DE]) [X] 1,2,5,15-21 * the whole document *; | [X]US5322671 (SHUSTOROVICH EUGENE [US], et al) [X] 1-4,6-13,22 * column 2, line 3 - column 5, line 49; figures 1,2; claims 12-14 *; | [X]US3168368 (ALEXANDER MILLS GEORGE) [X] 1-19,21 * the whole document *; | [X]GB2333048 (COLLINS HUGH F [GB]) [X] 9,15,16,18,19,21 * page 1 - page 5; example 1; claims 16,17 *; | [X]EP0974397 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD [JP]) [X] 9-11,15 * page 2, line 5 - page 5, line 58; examples 2,5 *; | [X]US5519149 (CONTRACTOR RASHMIKANT M [US], et al) [X] 1-4,6-13,15 * column 3, line 15 - column 5, line 33 * * column 6, line 53 - column 8, line 8; figure 1; claim 1 *; | [X]US5821187 (ZAHN WOLFGANG [DE], et al) [X] 9-11 * the whole document *; | [X]US5308810 (VOSS ANDREW P [US], et al) [X] 9-11,15 * claims 1-9,13-19 * |