EP1272601 - LAUNDRY WASH COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 08.04.2011 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For:CY
GB
IE
Unilever PLC Unilever House Blackfriars London Greater London EC4P 4BQ / GB | For:AT
BE
CH
DE
DK
ES
FI
FR
IT
LI
LU
MC
NL
PT
SE
TR
Unilever N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2006/29] | For:CY
GB
IE
UNILEVER PLC Unilever House, Blackfriars London EC4P 4BQ / GB | ||
For:AT
BE
CH
DE
DK
ES
FI
FR
IT
LI
LU
MC
NL
PT
SE
TR
UNILEVER N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | |||
Former [2003/02] | For:CY
GB
IE
UNILEVER PLC Unilever House, Blackfriars London EC4P 4BQ / GB | ||
For:AT
BE
CH
DE
DK
ES
FI
FR
IT
LU
MC
NL
PT
SE
TR
UNILEVER N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CREETH, Andrew, Martin Unilever Research Port Sunlight Quarry Road East Bebington Wirral Merseyside CH63 3JW / GB | 02 /
VAN DER HOEVEN, Philippus C. Unilever Res. Vlaardingen Olivier v Noortlaan 120 3133 AT Vlaardingen / NL | 03 /
STAPLES, Edwin John Sychnant Maenan Llanrwst, Wales LL26 OYN / GB | [2003/10] |
Former [2003/02] | 01 /
CREETH, Andrew, Martin Unilever Research Port Sunlight Quarry Road East Bebington Wirral Merseyside CH63 3JW / GB | ||
02 /
VAN DER HOEVEN, Philippus C. Unilever Res. Vlaardingen Olivier v Noortlaan 120 3133 AT Vlaardingen / NL | |||
03 /
STAPLES, Edwin John Unilever Research Port Sunlight Quarry Road East Bebington Wirral Merseyside CH63 3JW / GB | Representative(s) | Bristow, Stephen Robert, et al Unilever Patent Group Colworth House Sharnbrook Bedford, MK44 1LQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/45] | Bristow, Stephen Robert, et al Unilever Patent Group Colworth House Sharnbrook Bedford, MK44 1LQ / GB | ||
Former [2009/29] | Rosen Jacobson, Frans Lucas M., et al Unilever Patent Group P.O. Box 137 3130 AC Vlaardingen / NL | ||
Former [2007/48] | Rosen Jacobson, Frans Lucas M., et al Unilever N.V. Patent Division P.O. Box 137 3130 AC Vlaardingen / NL | ||
Former [2006/03] | Elliott, Peter William, et al Unilever Patent Group Colworth House Sharnbrook Bedford MK44 1LQ / GB | ||
Former [2003/49] | Elliott, Peter William, et al Unilever PLC Patent Department, Colworth House Sharnbrook Bedford MK44 1LQ / GB | ||
Former [2003/02] | Fransella, Mary Evelyn Unilever PLC Patent Division Colworth House Sharnbrook Bedford MK44 1LQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 01940274.2 | 30.03.2001 | [2003/02] | WO2001EP03654 | Priority number, date | GB20000009029 | 12.04.2000 Original published format: GB 0009029 | [2003/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0179407 | Date: | 25.10.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1272601 | Date: | 08.01.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.10.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1272601 | Date: | 02.07.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.10.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C11D3/37, C11D1/02 | [2003/02] | CPC: |
C11D3/3719 (EP,US);
C11D1/02 (EP,US);
C11D17/065 (EP,US);
C11D3/06 (EP,US);
C11D3/3723 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/02] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WASCHMITTELZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN | [2003/02] | English: | LAUNDRY WASH COMPOSITIONS | [2003/02] | French: | COMPOSITIONS DE LAVAGE POUR LESSIVE | [2003/02] | Entry into regional phase | 13.09.2002 | National basic fee paid | 13.09.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.09.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.10.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 13.09.2002 | Examination requested [2003/02] | 26.08.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.12.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.11.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.05.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.05.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.07.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 20.07.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.08.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.10.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
02.04.2009
12.06.2009
ADMISSIBLE The Procter & Gamble Company One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnatti, Ohio 45202 / US Opponents representative Fisher, Adrian John, et al, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/20] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
02.04.2009
The Procter & Gamble Company One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnatti, Ohio 45202 / US Opponents representative Fisher, Adrian John, et al, et al CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43-45 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | 17.06.2009 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 14.12.2009 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 20.01.2010 | No. 01: Notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition | 02.02.2010 | No. 01: Reply to notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition | 24.02.2010 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M04) | 10.06.2010 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 14.12.2010 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 26.01.2011 | 27.12.2010 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 06.01.2011 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2011/19] | 26.01.2011 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 02.07.2008 | BE | 02.07.2008 | CY | 02.07.2008 | DK | 02.07.2008 | FI | 02.07.2008 | NL | 02.07.2008 | TR | 02.07.2008 | SE | 02.10.2008 | GR | 03.10.2008 | PT | 02.12.2008 | IE | 30.03.2009 | LU | 30.03.2009 | CH | 31.03.2009 | LI | 31.03.2009 | MC | 31.03.2009 | [2011/43] |
Former [2011/21] | AT | 02.07.2008 | |
BE | 02.07.2008 | ||
DK | 02.07.2008 | ||
FI | 02.07.2008 | ||
NL | 02.07.2008 | ||
SE | 02.10.2008 | ||
GR | 03.10.2008 | ||
PT | 02.12.2008 | ||
IE | 30.03.2009 | ||
LU | 30.03.2009 | ||
CH | 31.03.2009 | ||
LI | 31.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
Former [2010/47] | AT | 02.07.2008 | |
BE | 02.07.2008 | ||
DK | 02.07.2008 | ||
FI | 02.07.2008 | ||
NL | 02.07.2008 | ||
SE | 02.10.2008 | ||
GR | 03.10.2008 | ||
PT | 02.12.2008 | ||
IE | 30.03.2009 | ||
CH | 31.03.2009 | ||
LI | 31.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
Former [2010/09] | AT | 02.07.2008 | |
BE | 02.07.2008 | ||
DK | 02.07.2008 | ||
FI | 02.07.2008 | ||
NL | 02.07.2008 | ||
SE | 02.10.2008 | ||
PT | 02.12.2008 | ||
IE | 30.03.2009 | ||
CH | 31.03.2009 | ||
LI | 31.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
Former [2010/08] | AT | 02.07.2008 | |
BE | 02.07.2008 | ||
DK | 02.07.2008 | ||
FI | 02.07.2008 | ||
NL | 02.07.2008 | ||
PT | 02.12.2008 | ||
IE | 30.03.2009 | ||
CH | 31.03.2009 | ||
LI | 31.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
Former [2010/07] | AT | 02.07.2008 | |
BE | 02.07.2008 | ||
DK | 02.07.2008 | ||
FI | 02.07.2008 | ||
NL | 02.07.2008 | ||
PT | 02.12.2008 | ||
IE | 30.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/47] | AT | 02.07.2008 | |
BE | 02.07.2008 | ||
DK | 02.07.2008 | ||
FI | 02.07.2008 | ||
NL | 02.07.2008 | ||
PT | 02.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/19] | AT | 02.07.2008 | |
BE | 02.07.2008 | ||
DK | 02.07.2008 | ||
FI | 02.07.2008 | ||
NL | 02.07.2008 | ||
PT | 02.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/15] | AT | 02.07.2008 | |
FI | 02.07.2008 | ||
NL | 02.07.2008 | ||
PT | 02.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/12] | FI | 02.07.2008 | |
NL | 02.07.2008 | ||
PT | 02.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/01] | NL | 02.07.2008 | Cited in | International search | [DA]JPH07316590 ; | [A]US4418011 (BAUMAN ROBERT A [US], et al) [A] 1-7,12,14 * claims 1,5,6 *; | [A]GB2164657 (COLGATE PALMOLIVE CO) [A] 1-7,12,14 * abstract *; | [DA]DD296307 (AKAD WISSENSCHAFTEN DDR [DD]) [DA] 1-7,12,14 * tables 1,2 *; | [A]GB2245585 (KAO CORP [JP]) [A] 1-11 * abstract *; | [DA]WO9919428 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US], et al) [DA] 1,8-11,14* example 1; claim 1 * | [DA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960430), vol. 1996, no. 04, & JP07316590 A 19951205 (LION CORP) [DA] 1-7 * abstract * |