EP1280510 - COSMETIC SKIN CARE COMPOSITIONS CONTAINING PULEGONE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.12.2009 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For:CY
GB
IE
Unilever PLC Unilever House 100 Victoria Embankment London EC4Y 0DY / GB | For:AT
BE
CH
DE
DK
ES
FI
FR
GR
IT
LI
LU
MC
NL
PT
SE
TR
Unilever N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2009/05] | For:CY
GB
IE
Unilever PLC Unilever House 100 Victoria Embankment London EC4Y 0DY / GB | ||
For:AT
BE
CH
DE
DK
ES
FI
FR
GR
IT
LI
LU
MC
NL
PT
SE
TR
Unilever N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | |||
Former [2009/03] | For:CY
GB
IE
Unilever PLC Unilever House 100 Victoria Embankment London EC4Y 0DY / GB | ||
For:AT
BE
CH
DE
DK
ES
FI
FR
GR
IT
LI
LU
MC
NL
PT
SE
TR
UNILEVER N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | |||
Former [2006/29] | For:CY
GB
IE
UNILEVER PLC Unilever House, Blackfriars London EC4P 4BQ / GB | ||
For:AT
BE
CH
DE
DK
ES
FI
FR
GR
IT
LI
LU
MC
NL
PT
SE
TR
UNILEVER N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | |||
Former [2003/09] | For:CY
GB
IE
UNILEVER PLC Unilever House, Blackfriars London EC4P 4BQ / GB | ||
For:AT
BE
CH
DE
DK
ES
FI
FR
GR
IT
LU
MC
NL
PT
SE
TR
UNILEVER N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | |||
Former [2003/06] | For all designated states UNILEVER PLC Unilever House, Blackfriars London EC4P 4BQ / GB | ||
For all designated states UNILEVER N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CARSON, Robert George, Unilever Research US Inc 45 River Road Edgewater, NJ 07020 / US | 02 /
PATEL, Krupa 5602 Hanna Road Edison, NJ 08817 / US | 03 /
PILLAI, Sreekumar, c/o Unilever Research US Inc. 45 R iver Road Edgewater, NJ 07020 / US | 04 /
GRANGER, Stewart Paton, Unilever Research Colworth Colworth House, Sharnbrook Bedford, Bedfordshire MK44 1LQ / GB | [2003/06] | Representative(s) | Acham, Nicholas Clive, et al Unilever Patent Group Colworth House Sharnbrook Bedford MK44 1LQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/30] | Acham, Nicholas Clive, et al Unilever Patent Group Colworth House Sharnbrook Bedford MK44 1LQ / GB | ||
Former [2006/03] | Acham, Nicholas Clive, et al Unilever Patent Group Colworth House Sharnbrook Bedford MK44 1LQ / GB | ||
Former [2005/10] | Acham, Nicholas Clive Unilever PLC Intellectual Property Group Patent Department Unilever Colworth Sharnbrook Bedford MK44 1LQ / GB | ||
Former [2003/06] | Elliott, Peter William Unilever PLC Patent Department, Colworth House Sharnbrook Bedford MK44 1LQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 01940394.8 | 03.05.2001 | [2003/06] | WO2001EP04992 | Priority number, date | US20000202602P | 09.05.2000 Original published format: US 202602 P | [2003/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0185126 | Date: | 15.11.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/46] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1280510 | Date: | 05.02.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.11.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1280510 | Date: | 28.01.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.06.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A61K8/35, A61Q17/00, A61Q19/00, A61Q19/08 | [2008/39] | CPC: |
A61K8/35 (EP,US);
A61Q17/00 (EP,US);
A61Q19/00 (EP,US);
A61Q19/08 (EP,US);
A61K2800/70 (EP,US);
A61K2800/75 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2003/06] | A61K7/48 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/06] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PULEGON ENTHALTENDE KOSMETISCHE HAUTPFLEGEZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN | [2003/06] | English: | COSMETIC SKIN CARE COMPOSITIONS CONTAINING PULEGONE | [2003/06] | French: | COMPOSITIONS DE SOINS DE BEAUTE CONTENANT PULEGONE | [2008/39] |
Former [2003/06] | COMPOSITIONS DE SOINS DE BEAUTE A BASE DE PULEGONE | Entry into regional phase | 29.10.2002 | National basic fee paid | 29.10.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.10.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.11.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 29.10.2002 | Examination requested [2003/06] | 02.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.11.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.06.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.09.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.12.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 10.12.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.10.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 28.01.2009 | BE | 28.01.2009 | CY | 28.01.2009 | DK | 28.01.2009 | FI | 28.01.2009 | IT | 28.01.2009 | NL | 28.01.2009 | TR | 28.01.2009 | SE | 28.04.2009 | GR | 29.04.2009 | IE | 03.05.2009 | LU | 03.05.2009 | ES | 09.05.2009 | CH | 31.05.2009 | LI | 31.05.2009 | MC | 31.05.2009 | PT | 29.06.2009 | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/21] | AT | 28.01.2009 | |
BE | 28.01.2009 | ||
DK | 28.01.2009 | ||
FI | 28.01.2009 | ||
IT | 28.01.2009 | ||
NL | 28.01.2009 | ||
SE | 28.04.2009 | ||
GR | 29.04.2009 | ||
IE | 03.05.2009 | ||
LU | 03.05.2009 | ||
ES | 09.05.2009 | ||
CH | 31.05.2009 | ||
LI | 31.05.2009 | ||
MC | 31.05.2009 | ||
PT | 29.06.2009 | ||
Former [2011/14] | AT | 28.01.2009 | |
BE | 28.01.2009 | ||
DK | 28.01.2009 | ||
FI | 28.01.2009 | ||
IT | 28.01.2009 | ||
NL | 28.01.2009 | ||
SE | 28.04.2009 | ||
GR | 29.04.2009 | ||
IE | 03.05.2009 | ||
ES | 09.05.2009 | ||
CH | 31.05.2009 | ||
LI | 31.05.2009 | ||
MC | 31.05.2009 | ||
PT | 29.06.2009 | ||
Former [2010/47] | AT | 28.01.2009 | |
BE | 28.01.2009 | ||
DK | 28.01.2009 | ||
FI | 28.01.2009 | ||
NL | 28.01.2009 | ||
SE | 28.04.2009 | ||
GR | 29.04.2009 | ||
IE | 03.05.2009 | ||
ES | 09.05.2009 | ||
CH | 31.05.2009 | ||
LI | 31.05.2009 | ||
MC | 31.05.2009 | ||
PT | 29.06.2009 | ||
Former [2010/21] | AT | 28.01.2009 | |
BE | 28.01.2009 | ||
DK | 28.01.2009 | ||
FI | 28.01.2009 | ||
NL | 28.01.2009 | ||
SE | 28.04.2009 | ||
IE | 03.05.2009 | ||
ES | 09.05.2009 | ||
CH | 31.05.2009 | ||
LI | 31.05.2009 | ||
MC | 31.05.2009 | ||
PT | 29.06.2009 | ||
Former [2010/08] | AT | 28.01.2009 | |
BE | 28.01.2009 | ||
DK | 28.01.2009 | ||
FI | 28.01.2009 | ||
NL | 28.01.2009 | ||
SE | 28.04.2009 | ||
ES | 09.05.2009 | ||
CH | 31.05.2009 | ||
LI | 31.05.2009 | ||
MC | 31.05.2009 | ||
PT | 29.06.2009 | ||
Former [2010/04] | AT | 28.01.2009 | |
BE | 28.01.2009 | ||
DK | 28.01.2009 | ||
FI | 28.01.2009 | ||
NL | 28.01.2009 | ||
SE | 28.04.2009 | ||
ES | 09.05.2009 | ||
MC | 31.05.2009 | ||
PT | 29.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/46] | AT | 28.01.2009 | |
BE | 28.01.2009 | ||
DK | 28.01.2009 | ||
FI | 28.01.2009 | ||
NL | 28.01.2009 | ||
SE | 28.04.2009 | ||
ES | 09.05.2009 | ||
PT | 29.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/43] | AT | 28.01.2009 | |
BE | 28.01.2009 | ||
FI | 28.01.2009 | ||
NL | 28.01.2009 | ||
SE | 28.04.2009 | ||
ES | 09.05.2009 | ||
PT | 29.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/40] | AT | 28.01.2009 | |
FI | 28.01.2009 | ||
NL | 28.01.2009 | ||
SE | 28.04.2009 | ||
ES | 09.05.2009 | ||
PT | 29.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/37] | FI | 28.01.2009 | |
NL | 28.01.2009 | ||
SE | 28.04.2009 | ||
ES | 09.05.2009 | ||
PT | 29.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/34] | NL | 28.01.2009 | |
ES | 09.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/33] | ES | 09.05.2009 | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9800168 (NOVARTIS CONSUMER HEALTH SA [CH], et al) [X] 1-13 * page 8, paragraph 6 - page 9, paragraph 2; claim - * * page 6, line 6 - line 7 * * page 8, paragraph 4 *; | [Y]US5807568 (CODY SHARON L [US], et al) [Y] 5-13* column 6, line 3 - line 29; claims 1,10,11 *; | [Y] - P. CORNWELL ET AL., "The routes of penetration of ions and 5-fluorouracil across huan skin and the mechanisms of action of terpene skin penetration enhancers", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19931101), vol. 119, no. 18, Database accession no. 188425, XP002190596 [Y] 5-13 * abstract * | [ ] - INT. J. PHARM., (1993), vol. 94, no. 1-3, pages 189 - 194 | [Y] - A. WILLIAMS ET AL., "The enhancement index concept applied to terpene penetration enhancers for human skin and model lipophilic (estradiol) and hydrophilic (5-fluorouracil) drugs", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19911118), vol. 115, no. 20, Database accession no. 214660, XP002190597 [Y] 5-13 * abstract * | [ ] - INT. J. PHARM., (1991), vol. 74, no. 2-3, pages 157 - 168 | [Y] - B. BARRY, "Lipid-protein-partitioning theory of skin penetration enhancement", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19910812), vol. 115, no. 6, Database accession no. 57062, XP002190598 [Y] 5-13 * abstract * | [ ] - J. CONTROLLED RELEASE, (1991), vol. 15, no. 3, pages 237 - 248 | [Y] - A. WILLIAMS ET AL., "Terpenes and the lipid-protein-patritioning theory of skin penetration enhancement", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19910422), vol. 114, no. 16, Database accession no. 150029, XP002190599 [Y] 5-13 * abstract * | [ ] - PHARM. RES., (1991), vol. 8, no. 1, pages 17 - 24 |