EP1298093 - WATER TREATING METHOD, WATER TREATING APPARATUS, AND HYDROPONIC SYSTEM USING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.09.2006 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.11.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 31.12.2008 [2009/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SANYO ELECTRIC CO., LTD. 5-5, Keihanhondori 2-chome Moriguchi-shi, Osaka-fu 570-8677 / JP | [2005/44] |
Former [2003/14] | For all designated states Sanyo Electric Co., Ltd. 5-5, Keihanhondori 2-chome Moriguchi-shi, Osaka-fu 570-8677 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KONDO, Yasuhito 5-4-13, Asahi,Oizumimachi, Ora-gun Gunma 370-0514 / JP | 02 /
SHIMIZU, Yasuhiko 630-2, Nakano, Oramachi, Ora-gun Gunma 370-0603 / JP | 03 /
ISEKI, Masahiro 503-9, Araicho Ota-shi, Gunma 373-0852 / JP | [2003/30] |
Former [2003/14] | 01 /
KONDO, Yasuhito 2-2-6-302, Izumi, Oizumimachi, Ora-gun Gunma 370-0531 / JP | ||
02 /
SHIMIZU, Yasuhiko 630-2, Nakano, Oramachi, Ora-gun Gunma 370-0603 / JP | |||
03 /
ISEKI, Masahiro 503-9, Araicho Ota-shi, Gunma 373-0852 / JP | Representative(s) | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Partnerschaft mbB von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten Postfach 26 01 62 80058 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/14] | Glawe, Delfs, Moll & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 26 01 62 80058 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01941199.0 | 25.06.2001 | [2003/14] | WO2001JP05386 | Priority number, date | JP20000191731 | 26.06.2000 Original published format: JP 2000191731 | JP20000332849 | 31.10.2000 Original published format: JP 2000332849 | [2003/14] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0200554 | Date: | 03.01.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1298093 | Date: | 02.04.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.01.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1298093 | Date: | 02.11.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 03.01.2002 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.03.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C02F1/46, C02F1/48, C02F1/467, A61L2/03 | [2004/19] | CPC: |
C02F1/467 (EP,US);
A61L2/035 (EP,US);
C02F1/4604 (EP,US);
C02F1/4691 (EP,US);
C02F2303/04 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2003/14] | C02F1/46, C02F1/48, A01G31/00 | Designated contracting states | DK, FR, GB, NL, SE [2004/21] |
Former [2003/14] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON WASSER UND ANWENDUNG IN EINEM HYDROPONISCHEN SYSTEM | [2005/15] | English: | WATER TREATING METHOD, WATER TREATING APPARATUS, AND HYDROPONIC SYSTEM USING THE SAME | [2003/14] | French: | PROCEDE DE TRAITEMENT D'EAU, APPAREIL DE TRAITEMENT D'EAU ET SYSTEME HYDROPONIQUE UTILISANT CE DERNIER | [2003/14] |
Former [2003/14] | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON WASSER IN EINEM HYDROPONISCHEN SYSTEM | Entry into regional phase | 22.02.2002 | Translation filed | 22.02.2002 | National basic fee paid | 22.02.2002 | Search fee paid | 28.06.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.06.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.06.2002 | Examination requested [2003/14] | 11.11.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.02.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.05.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.09.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 01.09.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.08.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 02.11.2005 | DK | 02.02.2006 | SE | 02.02.2006 | [2009/01] |
Former [2006/35] | DK | 02.02.2006 | |
SE | 02.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/27] | SE | 02.02.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4062754 (EIBL VOLKER) [A] 1-4 * column 1, lines 42-56 ** column 2, lines 14-25; figure 1 *; | [A]EP0001285 (REIS AUGUST K [DE]) [A] 1-4 * page 2, line 32 - page 3, line 11 * * page 8, lines 1-16 * * page 9, line 28 - page 10, line 11; figures 1,2 * | International search | [A]JPH10180259 (SANDEN CORP); | [A]JPH09234459 (SANDEN CORP); | [A]US5770037 (GOTO NOBUTAKA [JP], et al); | [A]JPH044822 (OGATA HARUKI) |