EP1394097 - MAN CONVEYOR CONTROLLER, AND MAN CONVEYOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.10.2018 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.11.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.11.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.09.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2019 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 05.06.2019 [2019/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | [2006/18] |
Former [2004/10] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
IWATA, Akio c/o Mitsubishi Denki Kabushiki Kaisha 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | 02 /
HIRASAWA, Katumi c/o Eihou Giken Co., Ltd. 15-2, Aza Shindehigashi Kamo Chiakicho Ichinomiya-shi Aichi 491-0801 / JP | [2017/51] |
Former [2004/10] | 01 /
IWATA, Akio, c/o Mitsubishi Denki Kabushiki Kaisha 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | ||
02 /
HIRASAWA, Katumi, c/o Eihou Giken Co., Ltd. 15-2, Aza Shindehigashi, Kamo, Chiakicho Ichinomiya-shi, Aichi 491-0801 / JP | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2017/51] |
Former [2004/10] | HOFFMANN - EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01941256.8 | 26.06.2001 | [2004/10] | WO2001JP05459 | Priority number, date | JP20010012784 | 22.01.2001 Original published format: JP 2001012784 | [2004/10] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02057174 | Date: | 25.07.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1394097 | Date: | 03.03.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.07.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1394097 | Date: | 20.12.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 25.07.2002 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.02.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B66B25/00 | [2004/10] | CPC: |
B66B25/00 (EP,KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2017/51] |
Former [2004/10] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | STEUERUNG FÜR PERSONENBEFÖRDERUNGSEINRICHTUNG UND PERSONENBEFÖRDERUNGSEINRICHTUNG | [2004/10] | English: | MAN CONVEYOR CONTROLLER, AND MAN CONVEYOR | [2004/10] | French: | UNITE DE COMMANDE POUR TAPIS ROULANT DE TRANSPORT DE PERSONNES, ET TAPIS ROULANT DE TRANSPORT DE PERSONNES | [2004/10] | Entry into regional phase | 18.09.2002 | Translation filed | 18.09.2002 | National basic fee paid | 18.09.2002 | Search fee paid | 18.09.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.09.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.09.2002 | Examination requested [2004/10] | 26.03.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.07.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.12.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.02.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.05.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.08.2017 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 24.08.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 24.08.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.11.2017 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 14.11.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.03.2008 | Opposition(s) | 21.09.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 19.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 10.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 10.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 16.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 17 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 26.06.2018 | FR | 30.06.2018 | [2019/23] |
Former [2019/21] | GB | 26.06.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB2175761 (OTIS ELEVATOR CO) [X] 1-10 * page 1, line 68 - line 90; figure 1 *; | [A]DE3617620 (OTIS ELEVATOR CO [US]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [X]US4748394 (WATANABE EIKI [JP]) [X] 1-10 * column 2 - column 3; figure 1 *; | [A]JPH0382394 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [A] 1-10* abstract *; | [A]DE4313424 (O & K ROLLTREPPEN GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [X]WO9818711 (OTIS ELEVATOR CO [US]) [X] 1-10 * figure 2 *; | [X]JP2000229776 (HITACHI LTD, et al) [X] 1-10 * abstract * | International search | [X]JPH0986849 (HITACHI LTD); | [X]JP2000229776 (HITACHI LTD, et al); | [Y]JPH0382394 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP); | [Y]JPS6069278U ; | [A]JPS61291390 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) |