EP1289722 - UNRESTRAINED PREFORM CARRIERS FOR A BLOW MOLDING MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 26.03.2004 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.03.2004 | Withdrawal of application | published on 12.05.2004 [2004/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Uniloy Milacron Inc. 10501 Highway M-52 Manchester, MI 45858 / US | [2003/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SALENBIEN, Leon, G. 17600 Tecumseh Road Dundee, MI 48131 / US | 02 /
BELIN, Michelle, M. 2046 Carriage Hill Toledo, OH 43606 / US | 03 /
POTTER, Terry, C. 3167 Chanson Valley Lambertville, MI 48144 / US | 04 /
HATAS, Peter, J. 5704 Summit Sylvania, OH 43560 / US | 05 /
POTTER, James 38476 Ann Arbor Trail Livonia, MI 48150 / US | 06 /
ZHAO, Liguo 2630 Alisdale Drive 202 Toledo, OH 43606 / US | 07 /
ROSENBECK, J., Scott 3425 Hawkins Road Jackson, MI 49201 / US | [2003/11] | Representative(s) | James, Anthony Christopher W.P., et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/11] | James, Anthony Christopher W.P., et al Carpmaels & Ransford 43 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 01941576.9 | 24.05.2001 | [2003/11] | WO2001US16744 | Priority number, date | US20000206881P | 24.05.2000 Original published format: US 206881 P | [2003/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0189790 | Date: | 29.11.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1289722 | Date: | 12.03.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.11.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 29.11.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B29C31/08, B29C49/64, B29C49/68 | [2003/11] | CPC: |
B29C49/4205 (EP);
B29C49/18 (US);
B29C49/28 (EP,US);
B29C49/42122 (EP);
B29C49/68 (EP,US);
B29C2049/4294 (EP);
B29C2949/0715 (EP);
B29C49/06 (EP);
B29C49/42081 (EP);
B29C49/42085 (EP);
B29C49/42119 (EP);
B29C49/4238 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/11] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM TRANSPORTIEREN VON VORFORMLINGEN FÜR EINE BLASFORMASCHINE | [2003/11] | English: | UNRESTRAINED PREFORM CARRIERS FOR A BLOW MOLDING MACHINE | [2003/11] | French: | PORTE-PREFORME LIBRES POUR MACHINES A SOUFFLER | [2003/11] | Entry into regional phase | 03.12.2002 | National basic fee paid | 03.12.2002 | Search fee paid | 03.12.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.12.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.12.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 03.12.2002 | Examination requested [2003/11] | 22.03.2004 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2004/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US3924998 (MOORE LAWRENCE A); | [X]US4214860 (ALBRECHT PETER [DE], et al); | [A]US4856978 (VOSS HERMANN [DE], et al); | [Y]US5137443 (MUNOZ OSCAR [CA], et al); | [Y]US5498152 (UNTERLANDER RICHARD M [CA], et al); | [A]US5591462 (DARLING DONALD T [US], et al) |