EP1292328 - CHIMERIC HUMAN PAPILLOMAVIRUS (HPV) L1 MOLECULES AND USES THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.12.2008 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.12.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.01.2009 [2009/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MedImmune, LLC One MedImmune Way Gaithersburg, MD 20878 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/42] | For all designated states MedImmune, LLC One MedImmune Way Gaithersburg MD 20878 / US | ||
Former [2008/07] | For all designated states MEDIMMUNE, INC. One MedImmune Way Gaithersburg, MD 20878 / US | ||
Former [2004/21] | For all designated states MedImmune, Inc. One MedImmune Way Gaithersburg, MD 20878 / US | ||
Former [2003/12] | For all designated states MEDIMMUNE, INC. 35 West Watkins Mill Road Gaithersburg, MD 20878 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WILSON, Susan 2300 Twin Valley Lane Silver Spring, MD 20906 / US | 02 /
WHITE, Wendy 10717 Wayfarer Road Germantown, MD 20876 / US | 03 /
SUZICH, JoAnn, A. 122 Chestnut Avenue Washington Grove, MD 20880 / US | 04 /
MULLIKIN, Brian 13232 Mnaor Drive South Mt. Airy, MD 21771 / US | [2003/12] | Representative(s) | Louis Pöhlau Lohrentz Patentanwälte Postfach 30 55 90014 Nürnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/12] | LOUIS, PÖHLAU, LOHRENTZ & SEGETH Postfach 3055 90014 Nürnberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 01942170.0 | 12.06.2001 | [2003/12] | WO2001US18774 | Priority number, date | US20000212839P | 21.06.2000 Original published format: US 212839 P | [2003/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0197840 | Date: | 27.12.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1292328 | Date: | 19.03.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.12.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1292328 | Date: | 13.02.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 27.12.2001 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.12.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C12N7/00, C12N15/37, C07K1/00, C07K14/025, C12P21/06, C12Q1/70, A61K38/16, A61K39/12, A61K39/00, G01N33/53 | [2005/04] | CPC: |
C07K14/005 (EP,US);
A61P31/12 (EP);
C07K16/084 (EP,US);
C12N7/00 (EP,US);
A61K2039/505 (EP,US);
A61K2039/5256 (EP,US);
A61K2039/5258 (EP,US);
A61K39/00 (EP,US);
C07K2319/00 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2003/12] | A61K39/12, A61K39/00, C12P21/06, C12N7/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/12] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | CHIMÄRE HUMANE PAPILLOMAVIRUS (HPV) L1 MOLEKÜLE UND DEREN VERWENDUNGEN | [2007/35] | English: | CHIMERIC HUMAN PAPILLOMAVIRUS (HPV) L1 MOLECULES AND USES THEREFOR | [2003/12] | French: | MOLECULES DE PAPILLOMAVIRUS HUMAIN CHIMERIQUE (HPV) L1 ET UTILISATION DE CES DERNIERES | [2003/12] |
Former [2003/12] | CHIMÄRE HUMANES PAPILLOMAVIRUS (HPV) L1 MOLEKÜLE UND DEREN VERWENDUNGEN(03.01.02) | Entry into regional phase | 08.01.2003 | National basic fee paid | 08.01.2003 | Search fee paid | 08.01.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.01.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.01.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 08.01.2003 | Examination requested [2003/12] | 22.02.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.08.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.09.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.03.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.08.2006 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 18.09.2006 | 16.08.2006 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 18.09.2006 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 18.06.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 20.06.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.08.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.12.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 17.12.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP07024862.0 / EP1947174 | Opposition(s) | 14.11.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9704076 (MERCK & CO INC [US], et al); | [X]WO9823635 (UNIV QUEENSLAND [AU], et al) [X] 1-4,7,8,10-15,18-39,42,44-54 * page 13, line 4 - line 23 *; | [E]WO0035479 (MERCK & CO INC [US], et al) [E] 1,2,7,10-13,19,29 * abstract * * claims 1-4,7,15-17,22,23 ** page 9, line 8 - line 13 *; | [X] - LUDMERER S W ET AL, "TWO AMINO ACID RESIDUES CONFER TYPE SPECIFICITY TO A NEUTRALIZING, CONFORMATIONALLY DEPENDENT EPITOPE ON HUMAN PAPILLOMAVRIRUS TYPE 11", JOURNAL OF VIROLOGY, THE AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR MICROBIOLOGY, US, (199607), vol. 70, no. 7, ISSN 0022-538X, pages 4791 - 4794, XP001005581 [X] 1-4,7,8,10-16,18-39,41,42,44-54 * abstract * * page 4791, column L, paragraph 2 - paragraph 3; figure 1 * * page 4793, column L, paragraph 2 - paragraph 3 * * page 4793, column R, paragraph LAST * | [X] - CHACKERIAN B ET AL, "Induction of autoantibodies to mouse CCR5 with recombinant papillomavirus particles.", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. 2 MAR 1999, (19990302), vol. 96, no. 5, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 2373 - 2378, XP002305308 [X] 1-4,7,8,10-16,18-39,41,42,44-54 * abstract * * page 2373, column R, paragraph 2 * * page 2374, column R, paragraph 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.96.5.2373 | [PX] - LIU W J ET AL, "Papillomavirus virus-like particles for the delivery of multiple cytotoxic T cell epitopes.", VIROLOGY. 1 AUG 2000, (20000801), vol. 273, no. 2, ISSN 0042-6822, pages 374 - 382, XP002305309 [PX] 1-4,7,8,10-16,18-39,41,42,44-54 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/viro.2000.0435 | [A] - NIELAND J D ET AL, "Chimeric papillomavirus virus-like particles induce a murine self-antigen-specific protective and therapeutic antitumor immune response.", JOURNAL OF CELLULAR BIOCHEMISTRY. 1 MAY 1999, (19990501), vol. 73, no. 2, ISSN 0730-2312, pages 145 - 152, XP002305310 [A] 1-4,7,8,10-16,18-39,41,42,44-54 * abstract * * page 150, column R - page 151, column R * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/(SICI)1097-4644(19990501)73:2<145::AID-JCB1>3.0.CO;2-5 | [A] - CHEN Y ET AL, "Mutant canine oral papillomavirus L1 capsid proteins which form virus-like particles but lack native conformational epitopes.", THE JOURNAL OF GENERAL VIROLOGY. SEP 1998, (199809), vol. 79 ( Pt 9), ISSN 0022-1317, pages 2137 - 2146, XP002305312 [A] * abstract * | [A] - BREITBURD F ET AL, "Human papillomavirus vaccines.", SEMINARS IN CANCER BIOLOGY. DEC 1999, (199912), vol. 9, no. 6, ISSN 1044-579X, pages 431 - 445, XP002305313 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/scbi.1999.0147 | International search | [Y]US5618536 (LOWY DOUGLAS R [US], et al); | [Y]US5855891 (LOWY DOUGLAS R [US], et al); | [Y]US6066324 (GISSMANN LUTZ [US], et al); | [Y] - ZHANG ET AL., "HPV6b virus like particles are potent immunogens without adjuvant in man", VACCINE, (2000), vol. 18, pages 1051 - 1058, XP002947364 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0264-410X(99)00351-5 |