EP1343537 - PERMEABLE MEMBRANES HAVING HIGH TEMPERATURE CAPABILITIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 02.05.2008 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.06.2010 | Change - representative | published on 07.07.2010 [2010/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PECHINEY EMBALLAGE FLEXIBLE EUROPE 1, rue de l'Union 92843 Rueil Malmaison / FR | [2003/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOWEN, William, E. 920 Harding Street Oregon, WI 53575 / US | 02 /
STECKER, Michael 1715 E. Midway Road Appleton, WI 54915 / US | [2003/38] | Representative(s) | Hill, Justin John, et al Ipulse (IP) Ltd. Carrington House 126-130 Regent Street London W1B 5SE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/27] | Hill, Justin John, et al IPULSE 9-10 Savile Row London, W1S 3PF / GB | ||
Former [2004/16] | Hill, Justin John McDermott, Will & Emery, 7 Bishopsgate London EC2N 3AR / GB | ||
Former [2003/38] | Harris-Fox, Kathleen Dona, et al McDermott, Will & Emery 7 Bishopsgate London EC2N 3AR / GB | Application number, filing date | 01942180.9 | 12.06.2001 | [2003/38] | WO2001US18831 | Priority number, date | US20000594679 | 16.06.2000 Original published format: US 594679 | [2003/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0197869 | Date: | 27.12.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1343537 | Date: | 17.09.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.12.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 27.12.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A61L9/04, B65D81/18, B65D83/00, B65D85/00 | [2003/38] | CPC: |
A01M1/2061 (EP,US);
A61L9/03 (EP,US);
B32B27/32 (EP,US);
B32B3/266 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1352 (EP,US);
Y10T428/249985 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2843 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2848 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31725 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31746 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31757 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31786 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31797 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/38] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HOCHTEMPERATUR-VERTRAEGLICHE, PERMEABLE MEMBRANEN | [2003/38] | English: | PERMEABLE MEMBRANES HAVING HIGH TEMPERATURE CAPABILITIES | [2003/38] | French: | MEMBRANES PERMEABLES SUPPORTANT DE HAUTES TEMPERATURES | [2003/38] | Entry into regional phase | 16.01.2003 | National basic fee paid | 16.01.2003 | Search fee paid | 16.01.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.01.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.12.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 16.01.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.01.2003 | Examination requested [2003/38] | 29.04.2008 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2008/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US4254910 (MARTIN JAMES P); | [Y]US4511520 (BOWEN WILLIAM E [US]); | [X]US5686126 (NOEL DAVID C [US], et al); | [Y]US5714107 (LEVY RUTH LISA [US], et al); | [Y]US5804264 (BOWEN WILLIAM EDMUND [US]) |