EP1248773 - WORKING UP A MIXTURE COMPRISING ALKENE AND OXYGEN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.03.2006 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 07.01.2009 [2009/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | [2008/31] |
Former [2002/42] | For all designated states BASF AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TELES, Joaquim, Henrique Reiherstrasse 29 a 67166 Otterstadt / DE | 02 /
REHFINGER, Alwin Rosenstrasse 10 67112 Mutterstadt / DE | 03 /
BASSLER, Peter Maria-Mandel-Strasse 18 68519 Viernheim / DE | 04 /
RIEBER, Norbert Liebfrauenstrasse 1 c 68259 Mannheim / DE | 05 /
HEFNER, Werner In der Teichgewann 20 68623 Lampertheim / DE | 06 /
BERG, Anne Catershoflaan 109f 2170 Merksem / BE | 07 /
RUDOLF, Peter Rautenthalermühle 12 68526 Ladenburg / DE | [2002/42] | Representative(s) | Isenbruck, Günter, et al Patentanwälte Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler PartG mbB Eastsite One Seckenheimer Landstrasse 4 68163 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/42] | Isenbruck, Günter, Dr., et al Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Bardehle-Pagenberg-Dost-Altenburg-Geissler-Isenbruck Theodor-Heuss-Anlage 12 68165 Mannheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 01942361.5 | 12.01.2001 | [2002/42] | WO2001EP00347 | Priority number, date | DE20001001401 | 14.01.2000 Original published format: DE 10001401 | [2002/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0151475 | Date: | 19.07.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1248773 | Date: | 16.10.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.07.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1248773 | Date: | 25.05.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.07.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C07D301/12, C07D301/32 | [2002/42] | CPC: |
C07D301/12 (EP,US);
C07D301/32 (KR);
Y02P20/582 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/42] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUFARBEITUNG VON MISCHUNGEN AUS ALKENEN UND SAUERSTOFF | [2002/42] | English: | WORKING UP A MIXTURE COMPRISING ALKENE AND OXYGEN | [2002/42] | French: | TRAITEMENT D'UN MELANGE COMPRENANT DE L'ALKENE ET DE L'OXYGENE | [2002/42] | Entry into regional phase | 30.07.2002 | National basic fee paid | 30.07.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.07.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.08.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 30.07.2002 | Examination requested [2002/42] | 20.08.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.12.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.06.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.09.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.10.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.03.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 01.03.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.02.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 25.05.2005 | CH | 25.05.2005 | CY | 25.05.2005 | FI | 25.05.2005 | LI | 25.05.2005 | TR | 25.05.2005 | DK | 25.08.2005 | GR | 25.08.2005 | SE | 25.08.2005 | PT | 27.10.2005 | IE | 12.01.2006 | LU | 31.01.2006 | MC | 31.01.2006 | [2009/02] |
Former [2007/10] | AT | 25.05.2005 | |
CH | 25.05.2005 | ||
FI | 25.05.2005 | ||
LI | 25.05.2005 | ||
TR | 25.05.2005 | ||
DK | 25.08.2005 | ||
GR | 25.08.2005 | ||
SE | 25.08.2005 | ||
PT | 27.10.2005 | ||
IE | 12.01.2006 | ||
LU | 31.01.2006 | ||
MC | 31.01.2006 | ||
Former [2006/51] | AT | 25.05.2005 | |
CH | 25.05.2005 | ||
FI | 25.05.2005 | ||
LI | 25.05.2005 | ||
TR | 25.05.2005 | ||
DK | 25.08.2005 | ||
GR | 25.08.2005 | ||
SE | 25.08.2005 | ||
PT | 27.10.2005 | ||
IE | 12.01.2006 | ||
MC | 31.01.2006 | ||
Former [2006/48] | AT | 25.05.2005 | |
CH | 25.05.2005 | ||
FI | 25.05.2005 | ||
LI | 25.05.2005 | ||
DK | 25.08.2005 | ||
GR | 25.08.2005 | ||
SE | 25.08.2005 | ||
PT | 27.10.2005 | ||
IE | 12.01.2006 | ||
MC | 31.01.2006 | ||
Former [2006/44] | AT | 25.05.2005 | |
CH | 25.05.2005 | ||
FI | 25.05.2005 | ||
LI | 25.05.2005 | ||
DK | 25.08.2005 | ||
GR | 25.08.2005 | ||
SE | 25.08.2005 | ||
PT | 27.10.2005 | ||
MC | 31.01.2006 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 25.05.2005 | |
CH | 25.05.2005 | ||
FI | 25.05.2005 | ||
LI | 25.05.2005 | ||
DK | 25.08.2005 | ||
GR | 25.08.2005 | ||
SE | 25.08.2005 | ||
PT | 27.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 25.05.2005 | |
FI | 25.05.2005 | ||
DK | 25.08.2005 | ||
SE | 25.08.2005 | ||
Former [2005/52] | FI | 25.05.2005 | |
SE | 25.08.2005 | ||
Former [2005/50] | SE | 25.08.2005 | Cited in | International search | [X]FR1487588 (YAWATA CHEMICAL INDUSTRY CO) [X] 1-4 * page 4, column R, paragraph 5; example - *; | [A]US4734273 (HASKELL WESTON W [US]) [A] 8* example - *; | [X]EP0261264 (UNION CARBIDE CORP [US]) [X] 1-10 * page 9, line 50 - line 51; figures 3,5 * * page 5, line 21 * * page 10, line 18 - line 20 *; | [X]US4939286 (BRAZDIL JAMES F [US], et al) [X] 1-4 * column 4, lines 3-7,38-40 * * column 5, paragraph 1 *; | [X]US5117012 (STAVINOHA JR JEROME L [US], et al) [X] 1-5 * figure .; claim 7 *; | [X]US5463090 (RODRIGUEZ CARMEN L [US], et al) [X] 1-10 * column 4, lines 59-63; figure 1 * * column 9, line 43 - line 65 * |