EP1250481 - TEXTURIZED FABRICS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.12.2004 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.12.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.02.2005 [2005/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states American Fiber & Finishing S.C., Inc. 2802 Fair Avenue, P.O. Box 379 Newberry, SC 29108 / US | [2002/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HUTTO, Alonzo, H., Jr. 1416 Chapman Drive Newberry, SC 29108 / US | 02 /
KEENER, Phillip, R. 317 Oxen Bridge Way Chapin, SC 29026 / US | [2002/43] | Representative(s) | Bunke, Holger Prinz & Partner GbR Rundfunkplatz 2 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/43] | Bunke, Holger, Dr.rer.nat. Dipl.-Chem. Prinz & Partner GbR Manzingerweg 7 81241 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01942685.7 | 18.01.2001 | [2002/43] | WO2001US01761 | Priority number, date | US20000489290 | 21.01.2000 Original published format: US 489290 | [2002/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0153579 | Date: | 26.07.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1250481 | Date: | 23.10.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.07.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 26.07.2001 | Classification | IPC: | D03D9/00, D03D15/04 | [2002/43] | CPC: |
D03D9/00 (EP);
D03D15/567 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/43] | Title | German: | TEXTURIERTE GEWEBE | [2002/43] | English: | TEXTURIZED FABRICS | [2002/43] | French: | MATIERES TEXTILES TEXTUREES | [2002/43] | Entry into regional phase | 31.07.2002 | National basic fee paid | 31.07.2002 | Search fee paid | 31.07.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.07.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.08.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 31.07.2002 | Examination requested [2002/43] | 03.08.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/06] | 07.09.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2005/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2004 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US4925726 (WHETSTONE JAMES H [US]); | [Y]US5043208 (WHETSTONE JAMES H [US]); | [Y]US4654254 (GERRY ELISABETH H [US], et al) |