EP1249080 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR FACILITATING QUICK PAGING CHANNEL DEMODULATION IN A WIRELESS COMMUNICATIONS SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.12.2011 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.12.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.01.2012 [2012/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states QUALCOMM INCORPORATED 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | [2002/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ABRISHAMKAR, Farrokh 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121 / US | 02 /
ROH, Mark 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121 / US | [2002/42] | Representative(s) | Wagner, Karl H. Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Wagner, Karl H. Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2002/42] | Wagner, Karl H., Dipl.-Ing. Wagner & Geyer, Patentanwälte, Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01942837.4 | 12.01.2001 | [2002/42] | WO2001US00939 | Priority number, date | US20000176478P | 17.01.2000 Original published format: US 176478 P | US20000696160 | 23.10.2000 Original published format: US 696160 | [2002/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0154432 | Date: | 26.07.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/30] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1249080 | Date: | 16.10.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.07.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.01.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H04B1/707 | [2002/42] | CPC: |
H04W68/00 (EP,KR,US);
H04B1/7073 (KR);
H04B1/70751 (EP,US);
H04B1/7077 (EP,US);
H04B1/709 (KR);
H04B2201/70702 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/42] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUM ERMÖGLICHEN EINER SCHNELLEN PAGING-KANALDEMODULATION IN EINEM DRAHTLOSEN ÜBERTRAGUNGSSYSTEM | [2002/42] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR FACILITATING QUICK PAGING CHANNEL DEMODULATION IN A WIRELESS COMMUNICATIONS SYSTEM | [2002/42] | French: | SYSTEME ET PROCEDES EFFICACES FACILITANT UNE DEMODULATION DE VOIE D'APPEL UNILATERAL RAPIDE VIA UN ORGANE DE RECHERCHE EFFICACE NON CONNECTE DANS UN SYSTEME DE TELECOMMUNICATIONS SANS FIL | [2002/42] | Entry into regional phase | 16.07.2002 | National basic fee paid | 16.07.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.07.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.08.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 16.07.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.07.2002 | Examination requested [2002/42] | 14.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.08.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.06.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.12.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.08.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/03] | 02.09.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2012/03] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.03.2006 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 05.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 08.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 07.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 07.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2011 | 11   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DA]WO9943180 (QUALCOMM INC [US]) [DA] 1,15,24,25,27,28 * page 4, line 1 - line 32 * * page 6, line 5 - page 14, line 4; figures 1,3,4; claims 1-23 *; | [A]WO9922352 (ROCKWELL SEMICONDUCTOR SYS INC [US]) [A] 1,15,24,25,27,28 * page 1, line 34 - page 5, line 15 * * page 14, line 17 - page 16, line 7; figures 10,15 * * page 19, line 5 - page 20, line 25; figure 11; claims 4-16 * | [A] - SARKAR S ET AL, "Common-channel soft handoff in cdma2000. The paging channel", RAWCON 99. 1999 IEEE RADIO AND WIRELESS CONFERENCE, DENVER, CO, USA, 1-4 AUG. 1999, IEEE Transactions on Microwave Theory and Techniques, June 2000, IEEE, USA, vol. 48, no. 6, ISSN 0018-9480, pages 938 - 950, XP002168323 [A] 1,15,24,25,27,28 * paragraphs [0002] , [0003] , [0007] - [0010]; figures 9,20 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/22.846720 | [A] - SARKAR S ET AL, "Soft handoff on the quick paging channel", SEAMLESS INTERCONNECTION FOR UNIVERSAL SERVICES. GLOBAL TELECOMMUNICATIONS CONFERENCE. GLOBECOM'99. (CAT. NO.99CH37042), SEAMLESS INTERCONECTION FOR UNIVERSAL SERVICES. GLOBAL TELECOMMUNICATIONS CONFERENCE. GLOBECOM'99, RIO DE JANEIREO, BRAZIL, 5-9 D, 1999, Piscataway, NJ, USA, IEEE, USA, ISBN 0-7803-5796-5, pages 2794 - 2798 vol.5, XP002168324 [A] 1,15,24,25,27,28 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] - [0003] * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/GLOCOM.1999.831806 |